This case was last updated from PACER on 02/14/2020 at 08:04:03 (UTC).

SMEAL v. CLARK EQUIPMENT COMPANY et al

Case Summary

On 12/16/2019 SMEAL filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against CLARK EQUIPMENT COMPANY. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is JOSHUA D. WOLSON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:19-CV-05950

  • Filing Date:

    12/16/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pennsylvania Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

JOSHUA D. WOLSON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PATRICIA ELIZABETH SMEAL

Defendants and Cross Defendants

CLARK EQUIPMENT COMPANY

NACCO MATERIAL HANDLING GROUP

Defendant and Cross Claimant

NACCO MATERIAL HANDLING GROUP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JAMES C. LONG, JR.

Attorney at BELLUCK & FOX

546 Fifth Avenue

New York, NY 10036

Defendant and Cross Claimant Attorney

BRIAN P. CORCORAN

Attorney at REILLY JANICZEK MCDEVITT

One South Penn Sq Ste 410

Philadelphia, PA 19107

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) Arbitration Certification that case exceeds the sum of $150,000.00 exclusive of interest and costs or relief other than monetary damages is sought (LONG, JAMES) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by NACCO MATERIAL HANDLING GROUP from COURT OF COMMON PLEAS PHILADELPHIA COUNTY, PENNSYLVANIA, case number 191100138. CERTIFICATION. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number PPE208473)(bw, ) (Main Document 1 replaced on 12/18/2019) (bw, ). FILING FEE VOIDED, RESUBMITTED ON 1/2/2020. Modified on 1/3/2020 (sg, ). (Entered: 12/18/2019)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by JAMES C. LONG, JR on behalf of PATRICIA ELIZABETH SMEAL (LONG, JAMES) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

#5

(#5) ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses, Reply to Cross Claims, CROSSCLAIM against CLARK EQUIPMENT COMPANY by NACCO MATERIAL HANDLING GROUP. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(CORCORAN, BRIAN) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

#2

(#2) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 Identifying Corporate Parent HYSTER-YALE MATERIALS HANDLING, INC. for NACCO MATERIAL HANDLING GROUP. by NACCO MATERIAL HANDLING GROUP.(bw, ) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

5 #1

Certificate of Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses, Reply to Cross Claims, CROSSCLAIM against CLARK EQUIPMENT COMPANY by NACCO MATERIAL HANDLING GROUP. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(CORCORAN, BRIAN) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Arbitration Certification that case exceeds the sum of $150,000.00 exclusive of interest and costs or relief other than monetary damages is sought (LONG, JAMES) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Appearance by JAMES C. LONG, JR on behalf of PATRICIA ELIZABETH SMEAL (LONG, JAMES) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • Case Eligible for Arbitration(bw, ) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 Identifying Corporate Parent HYSTER-YALE MATERIALS HANDLING, INC. for NACCO MATERIAL HANDLING GROUP. by NACCO MATERIAL HANDLING GROUP.(bw, ) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by NACCO MATERIAL HANDLING GROUP from COURT OF COMMON PLEAS PHILADELPHIA COUNTY, PENNSYLVANIA, case number 191100138. CERTIFICATION. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number PPE208473)(bw, ) (Main Document 1 replaced on 12/18/2019) (bw, ). FILING FEE VOIDED, RESUBMITTED ON 1/2/2020. Modified on 1/3/2020 (sg, ). (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.