This case was last updated from PACER on 02/10/2020 at 08:22:49 (UTC).

SMEAL v. CLARK EQUIPMENT COMPANY et al

Case Summary

On 12/12/2019 SMEAL filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against CLARK EQUIPMENT COMPANY. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are JEFFREY L. SCHMEHL and EDUARDO C. ROBRENO. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:19-CV-05853

  • Filing Date:

    12/12/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pennsylvania Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

JEFFREY L. SCHMEHL

EDUARDO C. ROBRENO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PATRICIA ELIZABETH SMEAL

Defendants, Cross Defendants and Cross Claimants

CLARK EQUIPMENT COMPANY

NACCO MATERIAL HANDLING GROUP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JAMES C. LONG, JR.

Attorney at BELLUCK & FOX

546 Fifth Avenue

New York, NY 10036

Defendant, Cross Defendant and Cross Claimant Attorneys

TIMOTHY D. RAU

Attorney at MARSHALL DENNEHY WARNER COLEMAN & GOGGIN

2000 Market St Suite 2300

Philadelphia, PA 19103

BRIAN P. CORCORAN

One South Penn Sq Ste 410

Philadelphia, PA 19107

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by TIMOTHY D. RAU on behalf of CLARK EQUIPMENT COMPANY (RAU, TIMOTHY) (Entered: 12/26/2019)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by BRIAN P. CORCORAN on behalf of NACCO MATERIAL HANDLING GROUP with Jury Demand and Certificate of Service (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(CORCORAN, BRIAN) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

#8

(#8) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by CLARK EQUIPMENT COMPANY.(RAU, TIMOTHY) (Entered: 12/26/2019)

#4

(#4) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Hyster-Yale Materials Handling, Inc. with Certificate of Service by NACCO MATERIAL HANDLING GROUP. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(CORCORAN, BRIAN) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

4 #1

Certificate of Service

#7

(#7) ANSWER to #3 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim , CROSSCLAIM against CLARK EQUIPMENT COMPANY by CLARK EQUIPMENT COMPANY.(RAU, TIMOTHY) (Entered: 12/26/2019)

#3

(#3) ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses, Reply to Cross Claims, CROSSCLAIM against CLARK EQUIPMENT COMPANY by NACCO MATERIAL HANDLING GROUP. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(CORCORAN, BRIAN) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

2 #1

Certificate of Service

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by CLARK EQUIPMENT COMPANY from Court of Common Pleas of Phila. County, PA, Certification, Certificate of Service, case number 191100138. (Filing fee $400.00 receipt number PPE208199)(kw, ) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

3 #1

Certificate of Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by CLARK EQUIPMENT COMPANY.(RAU, TIMOTHY) (Entered: 12/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ANSWER to #3 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim , CROSSCLAIM against CLARK EQUIPMENT COMPANY by CLARK EQUIPMENT COMPANY.(RAU, TIMOTHY) (Entered: 12/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Appearance by TIMOTHY D. RAU on behalf of CLARK EQUIPMENT COMPANY (RAU, TIMOTHY) (Entered: 12/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • (#5) Original Record together with certified copy of docket entries received from Court of Common Pleas of Philadelphia County. (nd, ) (Entered: 12/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Hyster-Yale Materials Handling, Inc. with Certificate of Service by NACCO MATERIAL HANDLING GROUP. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(CORCORAN, BRIAN) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses, Reply to Cross Claims, CROSSCLAIM against CLARK EQUIPMENT COMPANY by NACCO MATERIAL HANDLING GROUP. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(CORCORAN, BRIAN) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Appearance by BRIAN P. CORCORAN on behalf of NACCO MATERIAL HANDLING GROUP with Jury Demand and Certificate of Service (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(CORCORAN, BRIAN) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by CLARK EQUIPMENT COMPANY from Court of Common Pleas of Phila. County, PA, Certification, Certificate of Service, case number 191100138. (Filing fee $400.00 receipt number PPE208199)(kw, ) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.