This case was last updated from PACER on 11/22/2020 at 20:05:25 (UTC).

Smartmatic USA Corp. v. Figueroa et al

Case Summary

On 03/07/2019 Smartmatic USA Corp filed an Other - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act lawsuit against Figueroa. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Michigan Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Phillip J. Green and Paul L. Maloney. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-00175

  • Filing Date:

    03/07/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Michigan Western District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Phillip J. Green

Presiding Judge

Paul L. Maloney

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Smartmatic USA Corp.

Defendants

Zachary Figueroa

DOES 1-20

Unknown Parties

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

C. Enrico Schaefer

Attorney at Traverse Legal PLC

810 Cottageview Dr., Ste. G-20

Traverse City, MI 49684

Karl Stephen Kronenberger

Attorney at Kronenberger Rosenfeld, LLP

150 Post St., Ste. 520

San Francisco, CA 94108

Defendant Attorney

George Williams G. Furtado

Attorney at Rhoades McKee P.C.

300 Riverfront Plaza Bldg., 55 Campau Ave., Nw

Grand Rapids, MI 49503

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL of case filed by plaintiff Smartmatic USA Corp. (Kronenberger, Karl) (Entered: 08/30/2019)

#11

(#11) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL of case filed by plaintiff Smartmatic USA Corp. (Kronenberger, Karl) (Entered: 08/29/2019)

#10

(#10) ORDER granting #9 motion for extension of time to answer; deadline for defendant Zachary Figueroa to file his response extended to 8/22/2019; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, acr) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

9 #1

Proposed Order Granting Second Joint Motion to Extend Time for Defendant to Resp

#9

(#9) JOINT MOTION for extension of time to file answer re #1 by plaintiff Smartmatic USA Corp.; (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Second Joint Motion to Extend Time for Defendant to Respond to Complaint) (Kronenberger, Karl) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

#8

(#8) ORDER granting #7 motion for extension of time to answer; deadline for defendant Zachary Figueroa to file his response extended to 7/22/2019; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, acr) (Entered: 06/18/2019)

#7

(#7) JOINT MOTION for extension of time to file answer re #1 Complaint by defendant Zachary Figueroa; (Furtado, George) (Entered: 06/17/2019)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS returned executed; Zachary Figueroa served on 5/25/2019, answer due 6/17/2019 (Kronenberger, Karl) (Entered: 05/28/2019)

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF IMPENDING DISMISSAL for failure to serve; verified Petition Regarding Service of Process to be submitted by 6/5/2019 or the case will be dismissed; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, acr) (Entered: 05/14/2019)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendant Zachary Figueroa (ns) (Entered: 03/11/2019)

#3

(#3) NOTICE that this case has been assigned Paul L. Maloney (ns) (Entered: 03/11/2019)

#2

(#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Smartmatic USA Corp. identifying Corporate Parent Smartmatic International Holding B.V., Corporate Parent SGO Corporation Limited, Corporate Parent SGO Corporation S.A. for Smartmatic USA Corp. (Schaefer, C.) (Entered: 03/07/2019)

1 #1

Summons Summons

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Smartmatic USA Corp. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (Schaefer, C.) (Entered: 03/07/2019)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL of case filed by plaintiff Smartmatic USA Corp. (Kronenberger, Karl) (Entered: 08/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL of case filed by plaintiff Smartmatic USA Corp. (Kronenberger, Karl) (Entered: 08/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER granting #9 motion for extension of time to answer; deadline for defendant Zachary Figueroa to file his response extended to 8/22/2019; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, acr) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) JOINT MOTION for extension of time to file answer re #1 by plaintiff Smartmatic USA Corp.; (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Second Joint Motion to Extend Time for Defendant to Respond to Complaint) (Kronenberger, Karl) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER granting #7 motion for extension of time to answer; deadline for defendant Zachary Figueroa to file his response extended to 7/22/2019; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, acr) (Entered: 06/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) JOINT MOTION for extension of time to file answer re #1 Complaint by defendant Zachary Figueroa; (Furtado, George) (Entered: 06/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • Docket(NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of George Williams G. Furtado on behalf of defendant Zachary Figueroa (Furtado, George) (Entered: 06/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS returned executed; Zachary Figueroa served on 5/25/2019, answer due 6/17/2019 (Kronenberger, Karl) (Entered: 05/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF IMPENDING DISMISSAL for failure to serve; verified Petition Regarding Service of Process to be submitted by 6/5/2019 or the case will be dismissed; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, acr) (Entered: 05/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • Docket(NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Karl Stephen Kronenberger on behalf of plaintiff Smartmatic USA Corp. (Kronenberger, Karl) (Entered: 03/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendant Zachary Figueroa (ns) (Entered: 03/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE that this case has been assigned Paul L. Maloney (ns) (Entered: 03/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Smartmatic USA Corp. identifying Corporate Parent Smartmatic International Holding B.V., Corporate Parent SGO Corporation Limited, Corporate Parent SGO Corporation S.A. for Smartmatic USA Corp. (Schaefer, C.) (Entered: 03/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFILING FEE PAID re #1 by plaintiff Smartmatic USA Corp. in the amount of $400, receipt number 0646-4380741 (Schaefer, C.) (Entered: 03/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Smartmatic USA Corp. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (Schaefer, C.) (Entered: 03/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less