This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/20/2022 at 06:18:49 (UTC).

Smartmatic USA Corp. et al v. Lindell et al

Case Summary

On January 18, 2022, Smartmatic USA Corp., Smartmatic International Holding B.V., and SGO Corporation Limited (collectively, “Smartmatic” or “Plaintiffs”), represented by Christopher K. Larus, Emily J. Tremblay, and William E. Manske of Robins Kaplan LLP, Joel E. Connolly, Maura L. Patton, Michael E. Bloom, and Nicole Wrigley of Benesch Friedlander Coplan & Aronoff, filed a personal injury lawsuit against Michael J. Lindell and My Pillow, Inc. d/b/a MyPillow (collectively, “Defendants”), represented by Andrew D. Parker and Ryan Malone of Parker Daniels Kibort LLC, Douglas A. Daniels and Heath Novosad of Daniels & Tredennick PLLC, Nathan Lewin of Lewin & Lewin, LLP, and William F. Mohrman of Mohrman, Kaardal & Erickson, P.A., seeking declaratory and injunctive relief along with damages for Defendant’s alleged defamation and deceptive trade practices. This case was filed in the U.S. District Court for the District of Minnesota, with Judges Wilhelmina M. Wright and John F. Docherty presiding.

In the complaint, Plaintiffs asserted, “Crazy like a fox. Mike Lindell knows exactly what he is doing, and it is dangerous. Mr. Lindell knows Joe Biden and Kamala Harris won the 2020 election for President and Vice President of the United States. He knows the election was not rigged, fixed, or stolen. He knows voting machines did not switch votes from former President Trump to now President Biden.”

Plaintiffs further claimed, “These facts do not matter to Mr. Lindell because he knows he can sell. Mr. Lindell knows he can sell xenophobia. He knows he can sell conspiracy theory. He knows he can sell a preconceived story about voting machines stealing democracy by stealing votes from a president who is incredibly popular with millions of Americans. And, of course, Mr. Lindell—‘the MyPillow Guy’—knows he needs to sell pillows to keep and increase his fortune.”

Plaintiffs also alleged, “Mr. Lindell saw a once-in-a-lifetime opportunity following the 2020 U.S. election. President Trump lost the election. That is, and was, undeniable. Mr. Lindell told people that Smartmatic stole the 2020 U.S. election. He told people that Smartmatic’s election technology, hardware, and software were hacked by China and other foreign countries. He told people that Smartmatic election technology, hardware, and software were developed for the sole purpose of stealing foreign elections by switching votes.”

Plaintiffs then alleged, “Mr. Lindell intentionally stoked the fires of xenophobia and party-divide for the noble purpose of selling his pillows. The MyPillow brand was, and is, a ubiquitous feature of Mr. Lindell’s media appearances. The MyPillow logo is everywhere. Promo codes for ordering from MyPillow are conveniently and strategically placed during his appearances. It is time to end Mr. Lindell’s campaign. Smartmatic had no role in the 2020 U.S. election outside of providing some technology, support, and services to Los Angeles County.”

Plaintiffs also claimed, “Mr. Lindell sees fit to perpetuate a lie about the company because he wants to be seen as a champion of a deceptive message that still sells. But enough is enough. The country will sleep better at night knowing the judicial system holds people like Mr. Lindell accountable for spreading disinformation that deceives and harms others.”

Plaintiffs listed two claims for relief, including claims for the alleged defamatory statements and violation of Minnesota Deceptive Trade Practices Act. 

In the prayer for relief, Plaintiffs requested a judgement granting declaratory and injunctive relief. Plaintiffs also requested an award for compensatory, actual, consequential, punitive and special damages along with pre- and post-judgment interest.

This is a summary of a legal complaint. All statements, claims, and allegations listed herein reflect the position of the plaintiff only and do not represent the position of UniCourt. Additionally, this case summary may not reflect the current position of the parties to this litigation or the current status of this case. To view the latest case updates and court documents, please sign up for a UniCourt account.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    0:22-CV-00098

  • Filing Date:

    01/18/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Assault/Battery/Defamation

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Wilhelmina M. Wright

Referral Judge

John F. Docherty

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Smartmatic USA Corp.

Smartmatic International Holding B.V.

SGO Corporation Limited

Defendants

Michael J. Lindell

My Pillow, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

William E. Manske

Attorney at Robins Kaplan LLP

800 Lasalle Ave Ste 2800

Mpls, MN 55402-2015

Michael Elliot Bloom

Attorney at Benesch Friedlander Coplan & Aronoff

71 S. Wacker Dr., Ste 1600

Chicago, IL 60606

Christopher K Larus

Attorney at Robins Kaplan LLP

800 Lasalle Ave Ste 2800

Mpls, MN 55402-2015

Emily Jean Tremblay

Attorney at Robins Kaplan LLP

800 Lasalle Ave, Ste 2800

Minneapolis, MN 55402

Joel Erik Connolly

Attorney at Benesch Friedlander Coplan & Aronoff

71 S. Wacker Drive, Ste 16Th Fl.

Chicago, IL 60606

Maura Levine-Patton

Attorney at Benesch Friedlander Coplan & Aronoff LLP

71 South Wacker Drive, Suite 1600

Chicago, IL 60606

Nicole Wrigley

Attorney at Benesch Friedlander Coplan & Aronoff

71 S. Wacker Drive, 16Th Fl.

Chicago, IL 60606

Defendant Attorneys

Andrew D Parker

Attorney at Parker Daniels Kibort LLC

123 North 3Rd Street, Suite 888

Minneapolis, MN 55401

William F Mohrman

Attorney at Mohrman, Kaardal & Erickson, P.A.

150 South Fifth Street, Suite 3100

Mpls, MN 55402

Douglas A. Daniels

Attorney at Daniels & Tredennick PLLC

6363 Woodway, Suite 700

Houston, TX 77057

Heath Novosad

Attorney at Daniels & Tredennick, PLLC

6363 Woodway Dr., Suite 700

Houston, TX 77057

Nathan Lewin

Attorney at Lewin & Lewin, LLP

888 17Th Street Nw, 4Th Floor

Washington, DC 20006

Ryan Malone

Attorney at Parker Daniels Kibort LLC

123 N. 3Rd Street, Ste 888

Minneapolis, MN 55401

 

Court Documents

#52

(#52) ORDER denying #18 Motion to Dismiss/General; denying #23 Motion to Dismiss/General (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright on 9/19/2022. (DAC) (Entered: 09/19/2022)

#51

(#51) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright: Motion Hearing held on 5/26/2022 re #23 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by My Pillow, Inc., #18 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Michael J. Lindell. (Court Reporter Lori Simpson) (RJE) (Entered: 05/31/2022)

50 #2

Exhibit B - Dominion v. Byrne MTD Order

50 #1

Exhibit A - Coomer v. Trump MTD Order

50 #50

Main Document

#48

(#48) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Michael E. Bloom. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-9503508 filed by SGO Corporation Limited, Smartmatic International Holding B.V., Smartmatic USA Corp.. (Manske, William) (Entered: 05/10/2022)

47 #47

Main Document

#23

(#45) AMENDED NOTICE of Hearing on Motion: #23 MOTION to Dismiss/General : Motion Hearing set for 5/26/2022 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 7A (STP) before Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright. (Parker, Andrew) (Entered: 04/21/2022)

#18

(#44) DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR-WILL REFILE. AMENDED NOTICE of Hearing on Motion: #18 MOTION to Dismiss/General : Motion Hearing set for 5/26/2022 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 7A (STP) before Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright. (Parker, Andrew) Modified text on 4/21/2022 (MKB). (Entered: 04/21/2022)

1 #139

Exhibit(s) 138

1 #127

Exhibit(s) 126

1 #112

Exhibit(s) 111

1 #98

Exhibit(s) 97

1 #89

Exhibit(s) 88

1 #80

Exhibit(s) 79

1 #78

Exhibit(s) 77

1 #60

Exhibit(s) 59

1 #11

Exhibit(s) 10

179 More Documents Available
View All Documents

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#52) ORDER denying #18 Motion to Dismiss/General; denying #23 Motion to Dismiss/General (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright on 9/19/2022. (DAC) (Entered: 09/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#51) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright: Motion Hearing held on 5/26/2022 re #23 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by My Pillow, Inc., #18 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Michael J. Lindell. (Court Reporter Lori Simpson) (RJE) (Entered: 05/31/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#50) LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by SGO Corporation Limited, Smartmatic International Holding B.V., Smartmatic USA Corp. to Notify Court of Supplemental Authority. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Coomer v. Trump MTD Order, #2 Exhibit B - Dominion v. Byrne MTD Order)(Bloom, Michael) (Entered: 05/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#49) (Text-Only) ORDER granting #48 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Michael Elliot Bloom for SGO Corporation Limited, Smartmatic International Holding B.V. and Smartmatic USA Corp. Approved by Magistrate Judge John F. Docherty on 5/11/2022. (KMO) (Entered: 05/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#48) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Michael E. Bloom. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-9503508 filed by SGO Corporation Limited, Smartmatic International Holding B.V., Smartmatic USA Corp.. (Manske, William) (Entered: 05/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#47) REPLY re #23 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Michael J. Lindell, My Pillow, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Parker, Andrew) (Entered: 04/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#46) AMENDED NOTICE of Hearing on Motion: #18 MOTION to Dismiss/General : Motion Hearing set for 5/26/2022 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 7A (STP) before Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright. (Parker, Andrew) (Entered: 04/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#45) AMENDED NOTICE of Hearing on Motion: #23 MOTION to Dismiss/General : Motion Hearing set for 5/26/2022 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 7A (STP) before Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright. (Parker, Andrew) (Entered: 04/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#44) DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR-WILL REFILE. AMENDED NOTICE of Hearing on Motion: #18 MOTION to Dismiss/General : Motion Hearing set for 5/26/2022 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 7A (STP) before Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright. (Parker, Andrew) Modified text on 4/21/2022 (MKB). (Entered: 04/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#43) TEXT-ONLY ORDER: Defendants Michael J. Lindell and My Pillow, Inc.'s #42 letter requesting an extension of the word count for their consolidated reply to #41 Plaintiffs' response in opposition to Defendants' motion to dismiss is GRANTED. Defendants' reply brief must be limited to 5,734 or fewer words. Ordered by Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright on 4/19/2022. (RJE) (Entered: 04/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
32 More Docket Entries
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney J. Erik Connolly. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-9273734 filed by SGO Corporation Limited, Smartmatic International Holding B.V., Smartmatic USA Corp.. (Manske, William) (Entered: 01/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Nicole E. Wrigley. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-9273721 filed by SGO Corporation Limited, Smartmatic International Holding B.V., Smartmatic USA Corp.. (Manske, William) (Entered: 01/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • Docket(#8) (Text-Only) NOTICE - Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright's Practice Pointers are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's #website. All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including Judge Wright's deviations from the Local Rules with respect to motion scheduling and briefing deadlines. (RJE) (Entered: 01/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary reported for Plaintiff Smartmatic USA Corp.. (Manske, William) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary reported for Plaintiff Smartmatic International Holding B.V.. (Manske, William) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Plaintiff SGO Corporation Limited. (Manske, William) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • Docket(#4) (Text-Only): Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing J. Erik Connolly, Nicole E. Wrigley, Maura T. Levine-Patton as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #www.mnd.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms#. (MMP) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Michael J. Lindell, My Pillow, Inc. (MMP) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • Docket(#2) (Text-Only) CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright per 3rd 4th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge John F. Docherty. Please use case number 22-cv-98 (WMW/JFD). (MMP) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Michael J. Lindell, My Pillow, Inc. (filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMNDC-9270476) filed by Smartmatic USA Corp., SGO Corporation Limited, Smartmatic International Holding B.V.. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit(s) 1, #3 Exhibit(s) 2, #4 Exhibit(s) 3, #5 Exhibit(s) 4, #6 Exhibit(s) 5, #7 Exhibit(s) 6, #8 Exhibit(s) 7, #9 Exhibit(s) 8, #10 Exhibit(s) 9, #11 Exhibit(s) 10, #12 Exhibit(s) 11, #13 Exhibit(s) 12, #14 Exhibit(s) 13, #15 Exhibit(s) 14, #16 Exhibit(s) 15, #17 Exhibit(s) 16, #18 Exhibit(s) 17, #19 Exhibit(s) 18, #20 Exhibit(s) 19, #21 Exhibit(s) 20, #22 Exhibit(s) 21, #23 Exhibit(s) 22, #24 Exhibit(s) 23, #25 Exhibit(s) 24, #26 Exhibit(s) 25, #27 Exhibit(s) 26, #28 Exhibit(s) 27, #29 Exhibit(s) 28, #30 Exhibit(s) 29, #31 Exhibit(s) 30, #32 Exhibit(s) 31, #33 Exhibit(s) 32, #34 Exhibit(s) 33, #35 Exhibit(s) 34, #36 Exhibit(s) 35, #37 Exhibit(s) 36, #38 Exhibit(s) 37, #39 Exhibit(s) 38, #40 Exhibit(s) 39, #41 Exhibit(s) 40, #42 Exhibit(s) 41, #43 Exhibit(s) 42, #44 Exhibit(s) 43, #45 Exhibit(s) 44, #46 Exhibit(s) 45, #47 Exhibit(s) 46, #48 Exhibit(s) 47, #49 Exhibit(s) 48, #50 Exhibit(s) 49, #51 Exhibit(s) 50, #52 Exhibit(s) 51, #53 Exhibit(s) 52, #54 Exhibit(s) 53, #55 Exhibit(s) 54, #56 Exhibit(s) 55, #57 Exhibit(s) 56, #58 Exhibit(s) 57, #59 Exhibit(s) 58, #60 Exhibit(s) 59, #61 Exhibit(s) 60, #62 Exhibit(s) 61, #63 Exhibit(s) 62, #64 Exhibit(s) 63, #65 Exhibit(s) 64, #66 Exhibit(s) 65, #67 Exhibit(s) 66, #68 Exhibit(s) 67, #69 Exhibit(s) 68, #70 Exhibit(s) 69, #71 Exhibit(s) 70, #72 Exhibit(s) 71, #73 Exhibit(s) 72, #74 Exhibit(s) 73, #75 Exhibit(s) 74, #76 Exhibit(s) 75, #77 Exhibit(s) 76, #78 Exhibit(s) 77, #79 Exhibit(s) 78, #80 Exhibit(s) 79, #81 Exhibit(s) 80, #82 Exhibit(s) 81, #83 Exhibit(s) 82, #84 Exhibit(s) 83, #85 Exhibit(s) 84, #86 Exhibit(s) 85, #87 Exhibit(s) 86, #88 Exhibit(s) 87, #89 Exhibit(s) 88, #90 Exhibit(s) 89, #91 Exhibit(s) 90, #92 Exhibit(s) 91, #93 Exhibit(s) 92, #94 Exhibit(s) 93, #95 Exhibit(s) 94, #96 Exhibit(s) 95, #97 Exhibit(s) 96, #98 Exhibit(s) 97, #99 Exhibit(s) 98, #100 Exhibit(s) 99, #101 Exhibit(s) 100, #102 Exhibit(s) 101, #103 Exhibit(s) 102, #104 Exhibit(s) 103, #105 Exhibit(s) 104, #106 Exhibit(s) 105, #107 Exhibit(s) 106, #108 Exhibit(s) 107, #109 Exhibit(s) 108, #110 Exhibit(s) 109, #111 Exhibit(s) 110, #112 Exhibit(s) 111, #113 Exhibit(s) 112, #114 Exhibit(s) 113, #115 Exhibit(s) 114, #116 Exhibit(s) 115, #117 Exhibit(s) 116, #118 Exhibit(s) 117, #119 Exhibit(s) 118, #120 Exhibit(s) 119, #121 Exhibit(s) 120, #122 Exhibit(s) 121, #123 Exhibit(s) 122, #124 Exhibit(s) 123, #125 Exhibit(s) 124, #126 Exhibit(s) 125, #127 Exhibit(s) 126, #128 Exhibit(s) 127, #129 Exhibit(s) 128, #130 Exhibit(s) 129, #131 Exhibit(s) 130, #132 Exhibit(s) 131, #133 Exhibit(s) 132, #134 Exhibit(s) 133, #135 Exhibit(s) 134, #136 Exhibit(s) 135, #137 Exhibit(s) 136, #138 Exhibit(s) 137, #139 Exhibit(s) 138, #140 Exhibit(s) 139, #141 Exhibit(s) 140, #142 Exhibit(s) 141, #143 Exhibit(s) 142, #144 Civil Cover Sheet) (Manske, William) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SMARTMATIC INTERNATIONAL HOLDING B.V. is a litigant

Latest cases where SGO Corporation Limited is a litigant

Latest cases where MY PILLOW, INC. is a litigant