This case was last updated from PACER on 11/18/2019 at 08:21:57 (UTC).

SmartBank v. Cartron et al (PLR2)

Case Summary

On 09/19/2019 SmartBank filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Cartron PLR2. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Pamela L Reeves and Christopher H Steger. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-00062

  • Filing Date:

    09/19/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Tennessee Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Pamela L Reeves

Referral Judge

Christopher H Steger

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SmartBank

Defendants

Charis Witt Cartron

Michael B. Cartron

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Grayson Chambers

Attorney at Chambliss, Bahner & Stophel, PC

605 Chestnut Street, Suite 1700

Chattanooga, TN 37450

Jeffrey William Maddux

Attorney at Chambliss, Bahner & Stophel, PC

605 Chestnut Street, Suite 1700

Chattanooga, TN 37450

Stephen D Barham

Attorney at Chambliss, Bahner & Stophel, PC

605 Chestnut Street, Suite 1700

Chattanooga, TN 37450

Defendant Attorney

Jeremiah M Hodges

Attorney at Hodge Trial Lawyers

320 Clinton Avenue East

Huntsville, AL 35802-1692

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Jeremiah M Hodges on behalf of All Defendants (Hodges, Jeremiah) (Entered: 11/08/2019)

#9

(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by SmartBank. (Maddux, Jeffrey) (Entered: 10/07/2019)

#8

(#8) Administrative Notice to Counsel re #7 Summons Returned Executed as to USA : requirements due by 10/15/2019. (AML) (Entered: 10/07/2019)

#7

(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by SmartBank. Charis Witt Cartron served on 9/27/2019; Michael B. Cartron served on 9/27/2019. (Maddux, Jeffrey) (Entered: 10/04/2019)

#6

(#6) Certificate of Corporate Interest by SmartBank identifying Corporate Parent SmartFinancial, Inc. for SmartBank. (Maddux, Jeffrey) (Entered: 09/20/2019)

5 #1

Other Summons Issued

#5

(#5) Summons Issued as to Charis Witt Cartron, Michael B. Cartron. (Attachments: #1 Other Summons Issued)(CNC) (Entered: 09/20/2019)

#4

(#4) Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 9/20/19. (CNC) (Entered: 09/20/2019)

#3

(#3) Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 9/20/19. (CNC) (Entered: 09/20/2019)

#2

(#2) Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 9/20/19. (CNC) (Entered: 09/20/2019)

1 #13

Other Civil Case Cover Sheet

1 #12

Summons

1 #11

Summons

1 #10

Exhibit J

1 #9

Exhibit I

1 #8

Exhibit H

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Jeremiah M Hodges on behalf of All Defendants (Hodges, Jeremiah) (Entered: 11/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by SmartBank. (Maddux, Jeffrey) (Entered: 10/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Administrative Notice to Counsel re #7 Summons Returned Executed as to USA : requirements due by 10/15/2019. (AML) (Entered: 10/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by SmartBank. Charis Witt Cartron served on 9/27/2019; Michael B. Cartron served on 9/27/2019. (Maddux, Jeffrey) (Entered: 10/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Certificate of Corporate Interest by SmartBank identifying Corporate Parent SmartFinancial, Inc. for SmartBank. (Maddux, Jeffrey) (Entered: 09/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Summons Issued as to Charis Witt Cartron, Michael B. Cartron. (Attachments: #1 Other Summons Issued)(CNC) (Entered: 09/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • NOTICE OF FAILURE TO FILE Certificate of Corporate Interest as required by FRCP 7.1 by SmartBank. (CNC) (Entered: 09/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 9/20/19. (CNC) (Entered: 09/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 9/20/19. (CNC) (Entered: 09/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 9/20/19. (CNC) (Entered: 09/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • District Judge Pamela L Reeves and Magistrate Judge Christopher H Steger added. (CNC) (Entered: 09/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-4083314.), filed by SmartBank. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Summons, #12 Summons, #13 Other Civil Case Cover Sheet)(Maddux, Jeffrey) (Entered: 09/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.