This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/10/2021 at 08:52:18 (UTC).

Smart v. Wal-Mart, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 03/11/2021 Smart filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Wal-Mart, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Reed C. O'Connor. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-CV-00423

  • Filing Date:

    03/11/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Reed C. O'Connor

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Sarah Smart

Defendants

Wal-Mart, Inc.

Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.

Wal-Mart Stores Texas LLC

Wal-Mart Stores Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

William Ayrl Forteith

Attorney at Bailey & Galyen PC

4131 N Central Expressway, Suite 860

Dallas, TX 75204

Defendant Attorneys

Stacy Hoffman Bruce

Attorney at Cobb Martinez Woodward PLLC

1700 Pacific Ave, Suite 3100

Dallas, TX 75201

Bevan A Rhine

Attorney at Cobb Martinez Woodward PLLC

1700 Pacific Ave, Suite 3100

Dallas, TX 75201

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) SCHEDULING ORDER: This case is set for trial on this Court's four-week docket beginning May 9, 2022 before Judge Reed C. O'Connor. Joinder of Parties due by 7/5/2021. Amended Pleadings due by 7/5/2021. Motions due by 1/10/2022. Deadline for mediation is on or before 11/10/2021. Discovery due by 12/10/2021. Pretrial Order due by 4/14/2022. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 5/4/2021) (pef) (Entered: 05/04/2021)

#13

(#13) Joint STATUS REPORT Conference Report filed by Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC. (Bruce, Stacy) (Entered: 05/03/2021)

#12

(#12) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Bevan A Rhine for Stacy Hoffman Bruce on behalf of Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC, Wal-Mart Stores, Inc., Wal-Mart, Inc.. (Rhine, Bevan) (Entered: 04/23/2021)

#11

(#11) AMENDED DOCUMENT by Sarah Smart. Plaintiff's First Amended Certificate of Interested Parties. (Forteith, William) (Entered: 04/23/2021)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Plaintiff's Initial Disclosures filed by Sarah Smart (Forteith, William) (Entered: 04/23/2021)

#9

(#9) AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Sarah Smart. (One or more defendant(s) is no longer named.) Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Forteith, William) (Entered: 04/22/2021)

#8

(#8) AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Sarah Smart. Summons(es) not requested at this time. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Forteith, William) (Entered: 04/22/2021)

#7

(#7) ORDER REQUIRING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND REPORT FOR CONTENTS OF SCHEDULING ORDER: The Joint Report shall be filed on or before May 3, 2021. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 4/5/2021) (pef) (Entered: 04/05/2021)

#6

(#6) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc., Wal-Mart, Inc.. (Rhine, Bevan) (Entered: 04/02/2021)

#5

(#5) ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,, with Jury Demand filed by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc., Wal-Mart, Inc.. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Attorneys are further reminded that, if necessary, they must comply with Local Rule 83.10(a) within 14 days or risk the possible dismissal of this case without prejudice or without further notice.Attorney Bevan A Rhine added to party Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Bevan A Rhine added to party Wal-Mart, Inc.(pty:dft) (Rhine, Bevan) (Entered: 04/02/2021)

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to Wal-Mart Stores, Inc., Wal-Mart, Inc. (pef) (Entered: 03/11/2021)

#3

(#3) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. File to: Judge O'Connor. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. Attorneys are further reminded that, if necessary, they must comply with Local Rule 83.10(a) within 14 days or risk the possible dismissal of this case without prejudice or without further notice. (pef) (Entered: 03/11/2021)

#2

(#2) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Sarah Smart. (Forteith, William) (Entered: 03/11/2021)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Wal-Mart, Inc., Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. filed by Sarah Smart. (Filing fee $402; Receipt number 0539-11684424) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Forteith, William) Modified docket text on 3/11/2021 (pef). (Entered: 03/11/2021)

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) SCHEDULING ORDER: This case is set for trial on this Court's four-week docket beginning May 9, 2022 before Judge Reed C. O'Connor. Joinder of Parties due by 7/5/2021. Amended Pleadings due by 7/5/2021. Motions due by 1/10/2022. Deadline for mediation is on or before 11/10/2021. Discovery due by 12/10/2021. Pretrial Order due by 4/14/2022. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 5/4/2021) (pef) (Entered: 05/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Joint STATUS REPORT Conference Report filed by Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC. (Bruce, Stacy) (Entered: 05/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAMENDED CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Sarah Smart. (See document #11 for image) (pef) (Entered: 04/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Bevan A Rhine for Stacy Hoffman Bruce on behalf of Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC, Wal-Mart Stores, Inc., Wal-Mart, Inc.. (Rhine, Bevan) (Entered: 04/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) AMENDED DOCUMENT by Sarah Smart. Plaintiff's First Amended Certificate of Interested Parties. (Forteith, William) (Entered: 04/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Plaintiff's Initial Disclosures filed by Sarah Smart (Forteith, William) (Entered: 04/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Sarah Smart. (One or more defendant(s) is no longer named.) Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Forteith, William) (Entered: 04/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Sarah Smart. Summons(es) not requested at this time. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Forteith, William) (Entered: 04/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER REQUIRING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND REPORT FOR CONTENTS OF SCHEDULING ORDER: The Joint Report shall be filed on or before May 3, 2021. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 4/5/2021) (pef) (Entered: 04/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc., Wal-Mart, Inc.. (Rhine, Bevan) (Entered: 04/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,, with Jury Demand filed by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc., Wal-Mart, Inc.. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Attorneys are further reminded that, if necessary, they must comply with Local Rule 83.10(a) within 14 days or risk the possible dismissal of this case without prejudice or without further notice.Attorney Bevan A Rhine added to party Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Bevan A Rhine added to party Wal-Mart, Inc.(pty:dft) (Rhine, Bevan) (Entered: 04/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to Wal-Mart Stores, Inc., Wal-Mart, Inc. (pef) (Entered: 03/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. File to: Judge O'Connor. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. Attorneys are further reminded that, if necessary, they must comply with Local Rule 83.10(a) within 14 days or risk the possible dismissal of this case without prejudice or without further notice. (pef) (Entered: 03/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Sarah Smart. (Forteith, William) (Entered: 03/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Wal-Mart, Inc., Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. filed by Sarah Smart. (Filing fee $402; Receipt number 0539-11684424) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Forteith, William) Modified docket text on 3/11/2021 (pef). (Entered: 03/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Wal-Mart is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer William Ayrl Forteith(Designation Retained)