This case was last updated from PACER on 06/04/2021 at 09:16:58 (UTC).

Smart Path Connections, LLC v. Juniper Networks, Inc.

Case Summary

On April 5, 2021, Smart Path Connections, LLC (“Smart Path” or “Plaintiff”), represented by Bradley David Liddle of Carter Arnett PLLC filed an intellectual property lawsuit against Juniper Networks, Inc. (“Juniper” or “Defendant”), seeking permanent injunction and damages for alleged infringement of various patented technologies owned by Plaintiff. This case was filed in the U.S. District Court for the Western District of Texas with Judge Alan D. Albright presiding.

In its complaint, Plaintiff alleged that Defendant has infringed one or more claims under United States Patent No. 7,386,010 entitled “Multiprotocol media conversion,” (the “’010 Patent”), 7,463,580 entitled “Resource sharing among network tunnels” (the “’580 Patent”), 7,551,599 entitled “Layer-3 network routing with RPR layer-2 visibility” (the “’599 Patent”) 7,697,525 entitled “Forwarding multicast traffic over link aggregation ports” (the “’525 Patent”) and 7,961,755 entitled  (the “’755 Patent”) (collectively “The Asserted Patents” owned by Plaintiff.)

The Plaintiff further alleged that “Defendant, without authorization or license from Plaintiff, has been and is directly infringing the ’010 Patent, either literally or equivalently, as infringement is defined by 35 U.S.C. § 271, including through making, using (including for testing purposes), importing, selling and offering for sale telecommunications equipment that infringes one or more claims of the ’010 Patent. Defendant develops, designs, manufactures, and distributes telecommunications equipment that infringes one or more claims of the ’010 Patent.”

The Plaintiff even further alleged that “Defendant further provides services that practice methods that infringe one or more claims of the Patent. Defendant is thus liable for direct infringement pursuant to 35 U.S.C. § 271. Exemplary infringing instrumentalities include Juniper Networks MX5 Universal Routing Platform, and all other substantially similar products.”

The Plaintiff also alleged that “Plaintiff names this exemplary infringing instrumentality to serve as notice of Defendant’s infringing acts, but Smart Path reserves the right to name additional infringing products, known to or learned by Smart Path or revealed during discovery, and include them in the definition of Accused Products.”

The Plaintiff similarly alleged that “Defendant, without authorization or license from Plaintiff, has been and is directly infringing the Patent, either literally or equivalently, as infringement is defined by 35 U.S.C. § 271, including through making, using (including for testing purposes), importing, selling and offering for sale telecommunications equipment that infringes one or more claims of the Patent. Defendant develops, designs, manufactures, and distributes telecommunications equipment that infringes one or more claims of the ’580 Patent. Defendant further provides services that practice methods that infringe one or more claims of the Patent.”

There are five claims for relief laid down by the Plaintiff. The first claim is for alleged infringement of U.S. Patent 7,386,010. The second claim is for alleged infringement of U.S. Patent 7,463,580. The third claim is for alleged infringement of U.S. Patent 7,551,599. The fourth claim is for alleged infringement of U.S. Patent 7,697,525. The fifth claim is for alleged infringement of U.S. Patent 7,961,755.

In its prayer for relief, the Plaintiff has requested the court to determine that Defendant has infringed one or more claims of the asserted patents and that such infringement was wilful, award damages together with prejudgment and post-judgment interest and costs, and an ongoing royalty for continued infringement. Plaintiff further requested the court to permanently enjoin the Defendant from infringing the asserted patents and also grant costs of litigation. 

 

This case summary may not reflect the current position of the parties to this litigation or the status of this case. Sign up to view the latest case updates and court documents.

 





Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:21-CV-00328

  • Filing Date:

    04/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Alan D Albright

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Smart Path Connections, LLC

Defendant

Juniper Networks, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Bradley David Liddle

Attorney at Carter Arnett PLLC

8150 N Central Expressway, Suite 500

Dallas, TX 75206

Nathan I. Cox

Attorney at Carter Arnett PLLC

8150 N Central Expy, Unit 500

Dallas, TX 75206

E. Leon Carter

Attorney at Carter Arnett PLLC

8150 N. Central Expressway, Suite 500

Dallas, TX 75206

Monica Litle

Attorney at Carter Arnett PLLC

8150 N Central Expressway, Suite 500

Dallas, TX 75206

Scott W. Breedlove

Attorney at Carter Arnett PLLC

8150 N. Central Expressway, Suite 500

Dallas, TX 75206

Joshua J. Bennett

Attorney at Carter Arnett PLLC

8150 N. Central Expressway, Suite 500

Dallas, TX 75206

Defendant Attorneys

Alan M. Fisch

Attorney at Fisch Sigler LLP

5301 Wisconsin Ave Nw, Fourth Floor

Washington, DC 20015

R. William Sigler

Attorney at Fisch Sigler LLP

5301 Wisconsin Ave Nw, Fourth Floor

Washington, DC 20015

Jeffrey M. Saltman

Attorney at Fisch Sigler LLP

5301 Wisconsin Avenue Nw, Fourth Floor

Washington, DC 20015

Adam Auchter Allgood

Attorney at Fisch Sigler LLP

5301 Wisconsin Avenue Nw, Fourth Floor

Washington, DC 20015

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #13 Amended Complaint, by Juniper Networks, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Saltman, Jeffrey) (Entered: 06/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) AMENDED COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against Juniper Networks, Inc. amending, filed by Smart Path Connections, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Liddle, Bradley) (Entered: 05/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketText Order GRANTING #11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Jeffrey M. Saltman for Juniper Networks, Inc. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mm6) (Entered: 05/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketText Order GRANTING #10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney R. William Sigler for Juniper Networks, Inc. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mm6) (Entered: 05/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketText Order GRANTING #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Alan M. Fisch for Juniper Networks, Inc. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mm6) (Entered: 05/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Juniper Networks, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Allgood, Adam) (Entered: 04/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Adam Auchter Allgood on behalf of Jeffrey M. Saltman ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-14736712) by on behalf of Juniper Networks, Inc.. (Allgood, Adam) (Entered: 04/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Adam Auchter Allgood on behalf of R. William Sigler ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-14736689) by on behalf of Juniper Networks, Inc.. (Allgood, Adam) (Entered: 04/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Adam Auchter Allgood on behalf of Alan M. Fisch ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-14736657) by on behalf of Juniper Networks, Inc.. (Allgood, Adam) (Entered: 04/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Adam Auchter Allgood on behalf of Juniper Networks, Inc.. Attorney Adam Auchter Allgood added to party Juniper Networks, Inc.(pty:dft) (Allgood, Adam) (Entered: 04/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Smart Path Connections, LLC. Juniper Networks, Inc. served on 4/8/2021, answer due 4/29/2021. (Liddle, Bradley) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to Juniper Networks, Inc.. (lad) (Entered: 04/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Certificate of Interested Parties and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Smart Path Connections, LLC. (Liddle, Bradley) (Entered: 04/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Liddle, Bradley) (Main Document 4 replaced on 4/7/2021) (lad). (Entered: 04/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketAll parties shall comply with the Standing Orders of Judge Alan D. Albright located at https://www.txwd.uscourts.gov/judges-information/standing-orders/. (lad) (Entered: 04/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Pro Hac Vice Letter to Seth Lindner. (lad) (Entered: 04/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (lad) (Entered: 04/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Smart Path Connections, LLC. (Liddle, Bradley) (Main Document 2 replaced on 4/7/2021) (lad). (Entered: 04/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-14662032), filed by Smart Path Connections, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Liddle, Bradley) (Entered: 04/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Juniper Networks, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jeffrey M Saltman

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Roy William Sigler

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Alan Michael Fisch