This case was last updated from PACER on 06/04/2021 at 09:48:04 (UTC).

Smart Path Connections, LLC v. Adtran, Inc.

Case Summary

On 04/05/2021 Smart Path Connections, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Adtran, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Alan D Albright. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:21-CV-00326

  • Filing Date:

    04/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Alan D Albright

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Smart Path Connections, LLC

Defendant

Adtran, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Nathan I. Cox

Attorney at Carter Arnett PLLC

8150 N Central Expy, Unit 500

Dallas, TX 75206

E. Leon Carter

Attorney at Carter Arnett PLLC

8150 N. Central Expressway, Suite 500

Dallas, TX 75206

Monica Litle

Attorney at Carter Arnett PLLC

8150 N Central Expressway, Suite 500

Dallas, TX 75206

Scott W. Breedlove

Attorney at Carter Arnett PLLC

8150 N. Central Expressway, Suite 500

Dallas, TX 75206

Joshua J. Bennett

Attorney at Carter Arnett PLLC

8150 N. Central Expressway, Suite 500

Dallas, TX 75206

Bradley David Liddle

Attorney at Carter Arnett PLLC

8150 N Central Expressway, Suite 500

Dallas, TX 75206

Defendant Attorney

Mark D. Strachan

Attorney at Bradley Arant Boult Cummings

1201 Elm Street, Suite 4400

Dallas, TX 75270

 

Court Documents

8 #1

Proposed Order

#8

(#8) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Adtran, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Strachan, Mark) (Entered: 04/29/2021)

#7

(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Smart Path Connections, LLC. Adtran, Inc. served on 4/8/2021, answer due 4/29/2021. (Liddle, Bradley) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

#6

(#6) Summons Issued as to Adtran, Inc.. (lad) (Entered: 04/07/2021)

#5

(#5) Certificate of Interested Parties and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Smart Path Connections, LLC. (Liddle, Bradley) (Entered: 04/06/2021)

#4

(#4) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Liddle, Bradley) (Main Document 4 replaced on 4/7/2021) (lad). (Entered: 04/06/2021)

#3

(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Smart Path Connections, LLC. (Liddle, Bradley) (Main Document 3 replaced on 4/7/2021) (lad). (Entered: 04/05/2021)

#2

(#2) Pro Hac Vice Letter to Seth Lindner. (lad) (Entered: 04/05/2021)

1 #5

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #4

Exhibit D

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-14661603), filed by Smart Path Connections, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Liddle, Bradley) (Entered: 04/05/2021)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Adtran, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Strachan, Mark) (Entered: 04/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Smart Path Connections, LLC. Adtran, Inc. served on 4/8/2021, answer due 4/29/2021. (Liddle, Bradley) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to Adtran, Inc.. (lad) (Entered: 04/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Certificate of Interested Parties and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Smart Path Connections, LLC. (Liddle, Bradley) (Entered: 04/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Liddle, Bradley) (Main Document 4 replaced on 4/7/2021) (lad). (Entered: 04/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (lad) (Entered: 04/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Smart Path Connections, LLC. (Liddle, Bradley) (Main Document 3 replaced on 4/7/2021) (lad). (Entered: 04/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Pro Hac Vice Letter to Seth Lindner. (lad) (Entered: 04/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketAll parties shall comply with the Standing Orders of Judge Alan D. Albright located at https://www.txwd.uscourts.gov/judges-information/standing-orders/. (lad) (Entered: 04/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-14661603), filed by Smart Path Connections, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Liddle, Bradley) (Entered: 04/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Adtran Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Mark Daniel Strachan