This case was last updated from PACER on 08/31/2021 at 10:17:07 (UTC).

Smart Mobile Technologies LLC v. Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd. et al

Case Summary

On 07/02/2021 Smart Mobile Technologies LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Samsung Electronics Co Ltd. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Alan D Albright. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:21-CV-00701

  • Filing Date:

    07/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Alan D Albright

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Smart Mobile Technologies LLC

Defendants

Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd.

Samsung Electronics America, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Craig D. Cherry

Attorney at Steckler Wayne Cochran Cherry, PLLC

8416 Old Mcgregor Rd.

Waco, TX 76712

Greer N. Shaw

Attorney at Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro LLP

301 North Lake Ave., Ste. 920

Pasadena, CA 91101

Philip J. Graves

Attorney at Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro LLP

301 North Lake Ave., Ste. 920

Pasadena, CA 91101

Defendant Attorney

David M. Hoffman

Attorney at Fish & Richardson P.C.

111 Congress Avenue, Suite 810

Austin, TX 78701

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Smart Mobile Technologies LLC as to Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd.. Waiver sent on 8/12/2021, answer due 10/12/2021. (Graves, Philip) (Entered: 08/16/2021)

#10

(#10) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Smart Mobile Technologies LLC. Samsung Electronics America, Inc. served on 8/6/2021, answer due 8/27/2021. (Cherry, Craig) (Entered: 08/13/2021)

#9

(#9) STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Move, Answer, or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd.. (Hoffman, David) (Entered: 08/13/2021)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by David M. Hoffman on behalf of Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd. . Attorney David M. Hoffman added to party Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney David M. Hoffman added to party Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd. (pty:dft) (Hoffman, David) (Entered: 08/13/2021)

#7

(#7) Summons Issued as to Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd.. (lad) (Entered: 07/06/2021)

#6

(#6) JS44 (Civil Cover Sheet) submitted by Smart Mobile Technologies LLC. (Cherry, Craig) (Entered: 07/06/2021)

#5

(#5) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Smart Mobile Technologies LLC. (Cherry, Craig) (Main Document 5 replaced on 7/6/2021) (lad). (Entered: 07/06/2021)

4 #1

Exhibit Attachment A

#4

(#4) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Attachment A)(Cherry, Craig) (Main Document 4 replaced on 7/6/2021) (lad). (Entered: 07/02/2021)

3 #1

Exhibit Attachment A

#3

(#3) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Craig D. Cherry for Greer N. Shaw ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-14979897) by on behalf of Smart Mobile Technologies LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Attachment A)(Cherry, Craig) (Main Document 3 replaced on 7/6/2021) (lad). (Entered: 07/02/2021)

2 #1

Exhibit Attachment A

#2

(#2) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Craig D. Cherry for Philip J. Graves ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-14979885) by on behalf of Smart Mobile Technologies LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Attachment A)(Cherry, Craig) (Main Document 2 replaced on 7/6/2021) (lad). (Entered: 07/02/2021)

1 #12

Exhibit L - US9756168

1 #9

Exhibit I - US9084291

1 #8

Exhibit H - US9049119

1 #2

Exhibit B - US8472936

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-14979858), filed by Smart Mobile Technologies LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - US8442501, #2 Exhibit B - US8472936, #3 Exhibit C - US8472937, #4 Exhibit D - US8761739, #5 Exhibit E - US8824434, #6 Exhibit F - US8842653, #7 Exhibit G - US9019946, #8 Exhibit H - US9049119, #9 Exhibit I - US9084291, #10 Exhibit J - US9191083, #11 Exhibit K - US9614943, #12 Exhibit L - US9756168)(Cherry, Craig) (Entered: 07/02/2021)

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Smart Mobile Technologies LLC as to Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd.. Waiver sent on 8/12/2021, answer due 10/12/2021. (Graves, Philip) (Entered: 08/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Smart Mobile Technologies LLC. Samsung Electronics America, Inc. served on 8/6/2021, answer due 8/27/2021. (Cherry, Craig) (Entered: 08/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Move, Answer, or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd.. (Hoffman, David) (Entered: 08/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by David M. Hoffman on behalf of Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd. . Attorney David M. Hoffman added to party Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney David M. Hoffman added to party Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd. (pty:dft) (Hoffman, David) (Entered: 08/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketText Order GRANTING #3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Greer N. Shaw for Smart Mobile Technologies LLC. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mm6) (Entered: 07/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketText Order GRANTING #2 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Philip J. Graves for Smart Mobile Technologies LLC. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mm6) (Entered: 07/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Summons Issued as to Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd.. (lad) (Entered: 07/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) JS44 (Civil Cover Sheet) submitted by Smart Mobile Technologies LLC. (Cherry, Craig) (Entered: 07/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketAll parties shall comply with the Standing Orders located at https://www.txwd.uscourts.gov/judges-information/standing-orders/. Please complete, flatten and efile a JS44 Civil Cover Sheet.(lad) (Entered: 07/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Smart Mobile Technologies LLC. (Cherry, Craig) (Main Document 5 replaced on 7/6/2021) (lad). (Entered: 07/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (lad) (Entered: 07/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Attachment A)(Cherry, Craig) (Main Document 4 replaced on 7/6/2021) (lad). (Entered: 07/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Craig D. Cherry for Greer N. Shaw ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-14979897) by on behalf of Smart Mobile Technologies LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Attachment A)(Cherry, Craig) (Main Document 3 replaced on 7/6/2021) (lad). (Entered: 07/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Craig D. Cherry for Philip J. Graves ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-14979885) by on behalf of Smart Mobile Technologies LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Attachment A)(Cherry, Craig) (Main Document 2 replaced on 7/6/2021) (lad). (Entered: 07/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-14979858), filed by Smart Mobile Technologies LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - US8442501, #2 Exhibit B - US8472936, #3 Exhibit C - US8472937, #4 Exhibit D - US8761739, #5 Exhibit E - US8824434, #6 Exhibit F - US8842653, #7 Exhibit G - US9019946, #8 Exhibit H - US9049119, #9 Exhibit I - US9084291, #10 Exhibit J - US9191083, #11 Exhibit K - US9614943, #12 Exhibit L - US9756168)(Cherry, Craig) (Entered: 07/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Samsung Electronics America, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Greer Novalis Shaw(Designation Retained)

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Philip Graves(Designation Retained)

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Craig D. Cherry