This case was last updated from PACER on 07/25/2020 at 16:40:48 (UTC).

Smart Lock, LLC v. LockState, Inc.

Case Summary

On 05/25/2020 Smart Lock, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against LockState, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Colorado District. The Judge overseeing this case is Nina Y. Wang. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-01479

  • Filing Date:

    05/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Colorado District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Nina Y. Wang

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Smart Lock, LLC

Defendant

LockState, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Hao Ni

Attorney at Ni Wang & Massand, PLLC

8140 Walnut Hill Lane, Suite 500

Dallas, TX 75231

Defendant Attorney

Carolyn Valerie Juarez

Attorney at Neugeboren O'Dowd P.C.

1227 Spruce Street, Suite 200

Boulder, CO 80302

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #1 Complaint, and Continue the Scheduling Conference by Defendant LockState, Inc.. (Juarez, Carolyn) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

#9

(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Smart Lock, LLC. LockState, Inc. served on 6/26/2020, answer due 7/17/2020. (Ni, Hao) (Entered: 06/30/2020)

#8

(#8) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING/PLANNING CONFERENCE AND SETTING DEADLINE FOR FILING OF CONSENT/NONCONSENT FORM by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 6/1/2020. A Scheduling Conference is set for 8/12/2020 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang via telephone conference. All participants shall use the following dial-in information: 888-363-4749, Access Code: 5738976. The Proposed Scheduling Order is due 8/5/2020. The parties shall complete and file the Consent/Nonconsent Form by 7/29/2020. (bwilk, ) (Entered: 06/01/2020)

7 #1

Magistrate Judge Consent Form

#7

(#7) SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (alave, ) (Entered: 05/26/2020)

#5

(#5) Report re Patent/Trademark: Report on the filing of an action emailed (NEF) to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (alave, ) (Main Document 5 replaced on 6/16/2020) to convert to non-fillable PDF (alave, ). (Entered: 05/26/2020)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS REQUEST as to LockState, Inc. by Plaintiff Smart Lock, LLC. (Ni, Hao) (Entered: 05/25/2020)

#3

(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Ni, Hao) (Entered: 05/25/2020)

#2

(#2) NOTICE AO120 by Plaintiff Smart Lock, LLC (Ni, Hao) (Entered: 05/25/2020)

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit A-1

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against LockState, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-7308635)Attorney Hao Ni added to party Smart Lock, LLC(pty:pla), filed by Smart Lock, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit A-1, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ni, Hao) (Entered: 05/25/2020)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond. Defendant LockState, Inc. shall answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint by 8/17/2020. Furthermore, the Telephonic Scheduling Conference is RESET for 10/15/2020 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang, with the Proposed Scheduling Order due 10/8/2020. The Parties shall use the dial-in information as previously ordered. The Consent Form REMAINS DUE 7/29/2020. By Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 7/17/2020. Text Only Entry(nywlc2, ) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #1 Complaint, and Continue the Scheduling Conference by Defendant LockState, Inc.. (Juarez, Carolyn) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Smart Lock, LLC. LockState, Inc. served on 6/26/2020, answer due 7/17/2020. (Ni, Hao) (Entered: 06/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING/PLANNING CONFERENCE AND SETTING DEADLINE FOR FILING OF CONSENT/NONCONSENT FORM by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 6/1/2020. A Scheduling Conference is set for 8/12/2020 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang via telephone conference. All participants shall use the following dial-in information: 888-363-4749, Access Code: 5738976. The Proposed Scheduling Order is due 8/5/2020. The parties shall complete and file the Consent/Nonconsent Form by 7/29/2020. (bwilk, ) (Entered: 06/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (alave, ) (Entered: 05/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2020
  • Docket(#6) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Text Only Entry. (alave, ) (Entered: 05/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Report re Patent/Trademark: Report on the filing of an action emailed (NEF) to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (alave, ) (Main Document 5 replaced on 6/16/2020) to convert to non-fillable PDF (alave, ). (Entered: 05/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS REQUEST as to LockState, Inc. by Plaintiff Smart Lock, LLC. (Ni, Hao) (Entered: 05/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Ni, Hao) (Entered: 05/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE AO120 by Plaintiff Smart Lock, LLC (Ni, Hao) (Entered: 05/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against LockState, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-7308635)Attorney Hao Ni added to party Smart Lock, LLC(pty:pla), filed by Smart Lock, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit A-1, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ni, Hao) (Entered: 05/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less