This case was last updated from PACER on 10/22/2019 at 08:23:23 (UTC).

SMALIS et al v. CITY OF PITTSBURGH et al

Case Summary

On 08/23/2019 SMALIS filed a Property - Eminent Domain lawsuit against CITY OF PITTSBURGH. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Maureen P. Kelly. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-01066

  • Filing Date:

    08/23/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Eminent Domain

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pennsylvania Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Maureen P. Kelly

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

LIPSOSS CORP CONSTRUCTORS

ANASTASIOS ERNEST SMALIS

Pittsburgh, PA 15217

Defendants

DEPT OF BUILDING INSPECTIONS

DEPT OF PUBLIC WORKS

CITY OF PITTSBURGH

DUQUESNE DLC

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) Filing fee: $400, receipt number 24668059108 (jm) (Entered: 10/21/2019)

8 #2

Envelope

8 #1

Proposed Order

#8

(#8) MOTION to Withdraw Complaint Against Defendants Duquesne Light Company and US Occupation Safety/Health (OSHA) as Additional Defendants by LIPSOSS CORP CONSTRUCTORS, ANASTASIOS ERNEST SMALIS. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Envelope) (cjo) (Entered: 09/19/2019)

#7

(#7) ORDER OF COURT denying #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this case is DISMISSED and the Clerk of Court is to mark this CASE ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED until such time as Plaintiffs pay the requisite filing fee. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly on 09/13/2019. A copy of this Notice and Order have been mailed to Plaintiff's address of record. (tjw) (Entered: 09/13/2019)

6 #28

Exhibit 26

6 #27

Exhibit 25

6 #26

Exhibit 24

6 #25

Exhibit 23

6 #24

Exhibit 22

6 #23

Exhibit 20

6 #22

Exhibit 19

6 #21

Exhibit 18

6 #20

Exhibit 17

6 #19

Exhibit 16

1 #2

Motion for Permission to Remove Civil Action

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by ANASTASIOS ERNEST SMALIS. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Motion for Permission to Remove Civil Action) (jjg) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

39 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Filing fee: $400, receipt number 24668059108 (jm) (Entered: 10/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MOTION to Withdraw Complaint Against Defendants Duquesne Light Company and US Occupation Safety/Health (OSHA) as Additional Defendants by LIPSOSS CORP CONSTRUCTORS, ANASTASIOS ERNEST SMALIS. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Envelope) (cjo) (Entered: 09/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER OF COURT denying #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this case is DISMISSED and the Clerk of Court is to mark this CASE ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED until such time as Plaintiffs pay the requisite filing fee. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly on 09/13/2019. A copy of this Notice and Order have been mailed to Plaintiff's address of record. (tjw) (Entered: 09/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MOTION to Remand, MOTION for permission to add US Occupation Safety/Health (OSHA) as an additional defendant by LIPSOSS CORP CONSTRUCTORS, ANASTASIOS ERNEST SMALIS. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A1, #3 Exhibit A2, #4 Exhibit 1, #5 Exhibit 2, #6 Exhibit 3, #7 Exhibit 4, #8 Exhibit 5, #9 Exhibit 6, #10 Exhibit 7, #11 Exhibit 8, #12 Exhibit 9, #13 Exhibit 10, #14 Exhibit 11, #15 Exhibit 12, #16 Exhibit 13, #17 Exhibit 14, #18 Exhibit 15, #19 Exhibit 16, #20 Exhibit 17, #21 Exhibit 18, #22 Exhibit 19, #23 Exhibit 20, #24 Exhibit 22, #25 Exhibit 23, #26 Exhibit 24, #27 Exhibit 25, #28 Exhibit 26, #29 Exhibit 27, #30 Exhibit 28, #31 Exhibit 29) (ma) (Entered: 09/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed by ANASTASIOS ERNEST SMALIS, LIPSOSS CORP CONSTRUCTORS. DEPT OF PUBLIC WORKS served on 8/27/2019, answer due 9/17/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (nll) Modified text on 9/5/2019. (nll) (Entered: 09/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed by ANASTASIOS ERNEST SMALIS, LIPSOSS CORP CONSTRUCTORS. CITY OF PITTSBURGH, DEPT OF BUILDING INSPECTIONS served on 8/27/2019, answer due 9/17/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (nll) Modified text on 9/5/2019. (nll) (Entered: 09/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed by ANASTASIOS ERNEST SMALIS, LIPSOSS CORP CONSTRUCTORS; Duquesne served on 8/27/19. Answer Due: 9/17/2019 (sdp) Modified text on 9/3/2019. (cel) (Entered: 08/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed by ANASTASIOS ERNEST SMALIS, LIPSOSS CORP CONSTRUCTORS; City of Pittsburgh served on 8/27/19. Answer due 9/17/2019 (sdp) Modified text on 9/3/2019. (cel) (Entered: 08/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by ANASTASIOS ERNEST SMALIS. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Motion for Permission to Remove Civil Action) (jjg) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less