This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/24/2020 at 09:39:44 (UTC).

Smage et al v. L. Bartels Consulting Group

Case Summary

On 09/25/2020 Smage filed an Other lawsuit against L Bartels Consulting Group. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Laurel Beeler. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-MC-80168

  • Filing Date:

    09/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Laurel Beeler

 

Party Details

Petitioners

Sarah Whitmore Smage

Phillip Smage

Respondent

L. Bartels Consulting Group

Intervenor

Zero Motorcycles, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Bijan Esfandiari

Attorney at Baum Hedlund Aristei and Goldman, P.C.

10940 Wilshire Blvd, 17Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90024

Intervenor Attorney

Jerome Phillip Doctors

Attorney at Lynberg and Watkins

1150 S. Olive Street, Suite 1800

Los Angeles, CA 90015

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Exhibits 1 and 2

1 #2

Exhibits 3, 4, and 5

1 #3

Receipt

#2

2 #1

Standing Order

#3

3 #1

Exhibit A

3 #2

Exhibit B

3 #3

Proposed Order

#4

#5

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Order by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler granting #3 Motion to Intervene.(ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2020) (Entered: 11/06/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #3 MOTION to Intervene ) Plaintiffs' NON-Opposition to Motion to Intervene filed byPhillip Smage, Sarah Whitmore Smage. (Esfandiari, Bijan) (Filed on 10/28/2020) (Entered: 10/28/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION to Intervene filed by Zero Motorcycles, Inc.. Responses due by 11/9/2020. Replies due by 11/16/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Proposed Order)(Doctors, Jerome) (Filed on 10/26/2020) (Entered: 10/26/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ORDER. In the attached order, the court addresses its procedures for discovery disputes. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order)(lblc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2020) (Entered: 10/05/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) MOTION to Compel Compliance with Subpoena in a Foreign Civil Action filed by Phillip Smage, Sarah Whitmore Smage. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1 and 2, #2 Exhibits 3, 4, and 5, #3 Receipt)(wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2020) (Entered: 10/05/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Zero Motorcycles, Inc. is a litigant