This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/02/2019 at 07:23:10 (UTC).

SM 10000 Property, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company et al v. Allianz Global Risks US Insurance Company, an Illinois corporation

Case Summary

On 06/03/2019 SM 10000 Property, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Allianz Global Risks US Insurance Company, an Illinois corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Kandis A. Westmore and Phyllis J. Hamilton. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-03054

  • Filing Date:

    06/03/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Courthouse:

    California Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Kandis A. Westmore

Phyllis J. Hamilton

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

SM 10000 Property, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company

Swinerton Builders, Inc., a California Corporation

Defendant

Allianz Global Risks US Insurance Company, an Illinois corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Linda Diane Kornfeld

Attorney at Blank Rome LLP

2029 Century Park East, 6Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Valentine Shade Hoy,

Attorney at Allen Matkins

600 W Broadway, 27Th Floor

San Diego, CA 92101

Defendant Attorneys

Dianne Jean Meconis

Attorney at Foran Glennon Palandech Ponzi & Rudloff PC

2000 Powell Street, Suite 900

Emeryville, CA 94608

Christopher Mark Henry Snow

Attorney at Foran Glennon Palandech Ponzi Rudloff, PC

222 N Lasalle Street, Suite 1400

Chicago, IL 60601

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) ORDER by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton granting #13 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Christopher M.H. Snow. (kcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2019) (Entered: 07/16/2019)

#13

(#13) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice as to Christopher M.H. Snow ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13514626.) filed by Allianz Global Risks US Insurance Company, an Illinois corporation. (Snow, Christopher) (Filed on 7/12/2019) Modified on 7/15/2019 (cpS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 07/12/2019)

#12

(#12) ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Joint Case Management Statement due by 9/5/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/12/2019 at 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 3, 3rd Floor. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 6/17/19. (kcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2019) (Entered: 06/17/2019)

#11

(#11) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore no longer assigned to case. Signed by the Clerk on 06/17/2019. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2019) (Entered: 06/17/2019)

#9

(#9) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Allianz Global Risks US Insurance Company, an Illinois corporation.. (Meconis, Dianne) (Filed on 6/14/2019) (Entered: 06/14/2019)

#8

(#8) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Allianz Global Risks US Insurance Company, an Illinois corporation (Meconis, Dianne) (Filed on 6/6/2019) (Entered: 06/06/2019)

#7

(#7) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Allianz Global Risks US Insurance Company, an Illinois corporation (Meconis, Dianne) (Filed on 6/6/2019) (Entered: 06/06/2019)

#6

(#6) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Allianz Global Risks US Insurance Company, an Illinois corporation re #2 Certificate of Interested Entities, #4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines, #1 Notice of Removal, KAW Standing Orders (Meconis, Dianne) (Filed on 6/4/2019) (Entered: 06/04/2019)

#5

(#5) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Allianz Global Risks US Insurance Company, an Illinois corporation identifying Corporate Parent Allianz of America, Inc., Other Affiliate Allianz SE for Allianz Global Risks US Insurance Company, an Illinois corporation. (Meconis, Dianne) (Filed on 6/4/2019) (Entered: 06/04/2019)

#4

(#4) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 8/27/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/3/2019 01:30 PM. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2019) (Entered: 06/04/2019)

#2

(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Allianz Global Risks US Insurance Company, an Illinois corporation (Meconis, Dianne) (Filed on 6/3/2019) (Entered: 06/03/2019)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of CA, County of San Francisco. Their case number is CGC-19-575667. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0971-13402197). Filed byAllianz Global Risks US Insurance Company, an Illinois corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Meconis, Dianne) (Filed on 6/3/2019) (Entered: 06/03/2019)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) ORDER by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton granting #13 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Christopher M.H. Snow. (kcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2019) (Entered: 07/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice as to Christopher M.H. Snow ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13514626.) filed by Allianz Global Risks US Insurance Company, an Illinois corporation. (Snow, Christopher) (Filed on 7/12/2019) Modified on 7/15/2019 (cpS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 07/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Joint Case Management Statement due by 9/5/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/12/2019 at 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 3, 3rd Floor. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 6/17/19. (kcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2019) (Entered: 06/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore no longer assigned to case. Signed by the Clerk on 06/17/2019. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2019) (Entered: 06/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • (#10) CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ivaS, COURTSTAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2019) (Entered: 06/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Allianz Global Risks US Insurance Company, an Illinois corporation.. (Meconis, Dianne) (Filed on 6/14/2019) (Entered: 06/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Allianz Global Risks US Insurance Company, an Illinois corporation (Meconis, Dianne) (Filed on 6/6/2019) (Entered: 06/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Allianz Global Risks US Insurance Company, an Illinois corporation (Meconis, Dianne) (Filed on 6/6/2019) (Entered: 06/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • #Electronic filing error. No title Page. Certificates/Proofs of Service e-filed separately and not as an attachment, require a title page. Please refer to Civil Local Rules 3-4 re first page requirement. Please re-file in its entirety. Re: #6 Certificate of Service, filed by Allianz Global Risks US Insurance Company, an Illinois corporation (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2019) (Entered: 06/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Allianz Global Risks US Insurance Company, an Illinois corporation re #2 Certificate of Interested Entities, #4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines, #1 Notice of Removal, KAW Standing Orders (Meconis, Dianne) (Filed on 6/4/2019) (Entered: 06/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Allianz Global Risks US Insurance Company, an Illinois corporation identifying Corporate Parent Allianz of America, Inc., Other Affiliate Allianz SE for Allianz Global Risks US Insurance Company, an Illinois corporation. (Meconis, Dianne) (Filed on 6/4/2019) (Entered: 06/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 8/27/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/3/2019 01:30 PM. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2019) (Entered: 06/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • #Electronic filing error. Filer did not add all parties when prompted. Re-file this document in its entirety and when prompted, enter all affiliates or corporate parents. Re: #2 C orporate Disclosure Statement filed by Allianz Global Risks US Insurance Company, an Illinois corporation (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2019) (Entered: 06/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • (#3) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 6/17/2019. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2019) (Entered: 06/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Allianz Global Risks US Insurance Company, an Illinois corporation (Meconis, Dianne) (Filed on 6/3/2019) (Entered: 06/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of CA, County of San Francisco. Their case number is CGC-19-575667. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0971-13402197). Filed byAllianz Global Risks US Insurance Company, an Illinois corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Meconis, Dianne) (Filed on 6/3/2019) (Entered: 06/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ALLIANZ GLOBAL RISKS US INSURANCE CO is a litigant

Latest cases where SM 10000 PROPERTY LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where SWINERTON BUILDERS INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Linda Diane Kornfeld