This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/12/2020 at 11:02:27 (UTC).

Slyh, et al. v. Jones, et al.

Case Summary

On 04/17/2019 Slyh filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Jones. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Algenon L. Marbley, Chelsey M. Vascura and Sarah D. Morrison. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-01475

  • Filing Date:

    04/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Ohio Southern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Chelsey M. Vascura

Presiding Judges

Algenon L. Marbley

Sarah D. Morrison

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

United Recovery Worldwide, LLC

Capital City Recovery, LLC

Steven Slyh

United Recovery Worldwide, LLC doing business as Slyh and Associates

Defendants

Robert A. Flaugher

Abacus Research, Inc.

Rob Flaugher

The Jones Law Group, LLC

Eric A. Jones

Stephen Komorek

The Law Office of Eric A. Jones, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Rick Louis Brunner

Attorney at Brunner Quinn

35 North Fourth Street, Suite 200

Columbus, OH 43215-4801

Patrick M Quinn

Attorney at Brunner Quinn

35 North Fourth Street, Suite 200

Columbus, OH 43215

Defendant Attorneys

Ian N Friedman

Attorney at Friedman & Nemecek, L.L.C.

1360 East 9Th Street, Suite 650

Cleveland, OH 44114

Eric Franklin Long

1360 East 9Th Street, Suite 650

Cleveland, OH 44114

Steven G Janik

Attorney at Janik LLP

9200 South Hills Boulevard, Suite 300

Cleveland, OH 44147

Audrey K Bentz

Attorney at Janik L.L.P.

9200 South Hills Boulevard, Suite 300

Cleveland, OH 44147

 

Court Documents

#13

(#13) JUDGMENT entered pursuant to the Order signed by Judge Sarah D. Morrison on 7/8/19. (sem) (Entered: 07/08/2019)

#12

(#12) ORDER granting #10 Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand. This case is REMANDED to the Court of Common Pleas for Franklin County, Ohio. Signed by Judge Sarah D. Morrison on 7/8/19. (sem) (Entered: 07/08/2019)

#10

(#10) MOTION to Remand by Plaintiffs Capital City Recovery, LLC, Steven Slyh, United Recovery Worldwide, LLC. (Brunner, Rick) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

#8

(#8) NOTICE by Plaintiffs Capital City Recovery, LLC, Steven Slyh, United Recovery Worldwide, LLC re #7 Unopposed MOTION to Continue Preliminary Pretrial Conference Exhibits to Unopposed Motion to Continue Pretrial Conference (Brunner, Rick) (Entered: 05/14/2019)

#7

(#7) Unopposed MOTION to Continue Preliminary Pretrial Conference by Plaintiffs Capital City Recovery, LLC, Steven Slyh, United Recovery Worldwide, LLC. (Brunner, Rick) (Entered: 05/14/2019)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Hearing: Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 6/21/2019 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura. Please note: The Rule 26(f) Report for the Eastern Division has changed. Please ensure that you are using the correct form. (agm) (Entered: 05/10/2019)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Eric Franklin Long for Defendant Eric A. Jones (Long, Eric) (Entered: 05/02/2019)

#8

(#11) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Sarah D. Morrison for all further proceedings. Judge Algenon L. Marbley no longer assigned to case. Signed by Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 7/1/19. (jcw) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

#4

(#4) AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Steven Slyh, United Recovery Worldwide, LLC, Capital City Recovery, LLC. (jlk) (Entered: 04/19/2019)

#3

(#3) SUPPLEMENTAL COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Steven Slyh, United Recovery Worldwide, LLC, Capital City Recovery, LLC. (jlk) (Entered: 04/19/2019)

2 #1

Exhibit

#2

(#2) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Steven Slyh, United Recovery Worldwide, LLC, Capital City Recovery, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (jlk) (Entered: 04/19/2019)

1 #8

Exhibit Notice of Filing

1 #7

Exhibit Amended Complaint

1 #6

Exhibit Court Order

1 #2

Exhibit Original Complaint 1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Franklin County Court of Common Pleas, case number 18 CV 000583 ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-6887725), filed by Eric A. Jones. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Original Complaint 1, #3 Exhibit Original Complaint 2, #4 Exhibit Supplemental Complaint, #5 Exhibit Motion to Strike and Dismiss, #6 Exhibit Court Order, #7 Exhibit Amended Complaint, #8 Exhibit Notice of Filing) (Friedman, Ian) (Entered: 04/17/2019)

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) JUDGMENT entered pursuant to the Order signed by Judge Sarah D. Morrison on 7/8/19. (sem) (Entered: 07/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER granting #10 Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand. This case is REMANDED to the Court of Common Pleas for Franklin County, Ohio. Signed by Judge Sarah D. Morrison on 7/8/19. (sem) (Entered: 07/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Sarah D. Morrison for all further proceedings. Judge Algenon L. Marbley no longer assigned to case. Signed by Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 7/1/19. (jcw) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) MOTION to Remand by Plaintiffs Capital City Recovery, LLC, Steven Slyh, United Recovery Worldwide, LLC. (Brunner, Rick) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTATION ORDER granting #7 Motion to Continue. Preliminary Pretrial Conference RE-SET for 8/15/2019 at 11:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura. By Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 5/16/2019. (agm) (Entered: 05/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE by Plaintiffs Capital City Recovery, LLC, Steven Slyh, United Recovery Worldwide, LLC re #7 Unopposed MOTION to Continue Preliminary Pretrial Conference Exhibits to Unopposed Motion to Continue Pretrial Conference (Brunner, Rick) (Entered: 05/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Unopposed MOTION to Continue Preliminary Pretrial Conference by Plaintiffs Capital City Recovery, LLC, Steven Slyh, United Recovery Worldwide, LLC. (Brunner, Rick) (Entered: 05/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Hearing: Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 6/21/2019 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura. Please note: The Rule 26(f) Report for the Eastern Division has changed. Please ensure that you are using the correct form. (agm) (Entered: 05/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Eric Franklin Long for Defendant Eric A. Jones (Long, Eric) (Entered: 05/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Steven Slyh, United Recovery Worldwide, LLC, Capital City Recovery, LLC. (jlk) (Entered: 04/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) SUPPLEMENTAL COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Steven Slyh, United Recovery Worldwide, LLC, Capital City Recovery, LLC. (jlk) (Entered: 04/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Steven Slyh, United Recovery Worldwide, LLC, Capital City Recovery, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (jlk) (Entered: 04/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Franklin County Court of Common Pleas, case number 18 CV 000583 ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-6887725), filed by Eric A. Jones. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Original Complaint 1, #3 Exhibit Original Complaint 2, #4 Exhibit Supplemental Complaint, #5 Exhibit Motion to Strike and Dismiss, #6 Exhibit Court Order, #7 Exhibit Amended Complaint, #8 Exhibit Notice of Filing) (Friedman, Ian) (Entered: 04/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Rick Louis Brunner

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Patrick M Quinn