This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/26/2021 at 08:22:38 (UTC).

Slowinski v. Strivectin Operating Company, Inc.,

Case Summary

On 01/25/2021 Slowinski filed a Property - Personal Property Fraud lawsuit against Strivectin Operating Company, Inc . This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Steven C. Seeger. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00406

  • Filing Date:

    01/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Fraud

  • Courthouse:

    Illinois Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Steven C. Seeger

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Christine Slowinski

Defendant

Strivectin Operating Company, Inc.,

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

David B. Levin

Attorney at Law Offices of Todd M. Friedman, P.C.

111 W. Jackson Blvd., Suite 1700

Chicago, IL 60604

Steven Gene Perry

Attorney at Law Offices Of Todd M. Friedman, P.c.

111 W. Jackson Blvd., Suite 1700

Chicago, IL 60604

Todd M Friedman

Attorney at Law Offices of Todd M. Friedman

21550 Oxnard St., Suite 780

Woodland Hills, CA 91367

Defendant Attorney

Jon K. Stromsta

Attorney at Enterprise Law Group LLP

150 S. Wacker Dr., Suite 1600

Chicago, IL 60606

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) MOTION by Defendant Strivectin Operating Company, Inc., for extension of time to file answer (unopposed) (Stromsta, Jon) (Entered: 03/25/2021)

#7

(#7) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Strivectin Operating Company, Inc., by Jon K. Stromsta (Stromsta, Jon) (Entered: 03/25/2021)

#6

(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Christine Slowinski. Strivectin Operating Company, Inc., waiver sent on 2/2/2021, answer due 4/5/2021. (Perry, Steven) (Entered: 02/02/2021)

#5

(#5) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Steven C. Seeger: An initial status report is due by April 13, 2021. Counsel must read the Standing Order entitled "Initial Status Conferences and Joint Initial Status Reports" on the Court's website. The parties must confer as required by Rule 26(f) about the nature, scope, and duration of discovery. The parties must submit two documents to the Court. First, the parties must file the Joint Initial Status Report under Rule 26(f) on the docket. A Word version of the Joint Initial Status Report is available on the Court's website. All parties must participate in the preparation and filing of the Joint Initial Status Report. The Court requires a joint report, so a filing by one side or the other is not sufficient. Second, the parties must email a Word version of a proposed Scheduling Order under Rule 16(b) to the Court's proposed order inbox. Lead counsel for the parties must participate in filing the initial status report. Plaintiff must serve this Order on all other parties. If the defendant has not been served with process, plaintiff's counsel must contact the Courtroom Deputy at jessica_j_ramos@ilnd.uscourts.gov to reschedule the initial status report deadline. Plaintiff should not file the Joint Initial Status Report before the defendant(s) has been served with process. The parties must discuss settlement in good faith and make a serious attempt to resolve this case amicably. All counsel of record must read and comply with this Court's Standing Orders on its webpage. Please pay special attention to the Standing Orders about Depositions and Discovery. Mailed notice. (jjr, ) (Entered: 01/26/2021)

#4

(#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Christine Slowinski by David B. Levin (Levin, David) (Entered: 01/25/2021)

#3

(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Christine Slowinski by Steven Gene Perry (Perry, Steven) (Entered: 01/25/2021)

#2

(#2) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Christine Slowinski by Todd M Friedman (Friedman, Todd) (Entered: 01/25/2021)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Christine Slowinski; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-17857568. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Friedman, Todd) (Entered: 01/25/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION by Defendant Strivectin Operating Company, Inc., for extension of time to file answer (unopposed) (Stromsta, Jon) (Entered: 03/25/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Strivectin Operating Company, Inc., by Jon K. Stromsta (Stromsta, Jon) (Entered: 03/25/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Christine Slowinski. Strivectin Operating Company, Inc., waiver sent on 2/2/2021, answer due 4/5/2021. (Perry, Steven) (Entered: 02/02/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Steven C. Seeger: An initial status report is due by April 13, 2021. Counsel must read the Standing Order entitled "Initial Status Conferences and Joint Initial Status Reports" on the Court's website. The parties must confer as required by Rule 26(f) about the nature, scope, and duration of discovery. The parties must submit two documents to the Court. First, the parties must file the Joint Initial Status Report under Rule 26(f) on the docket. A Word version of the Joint Initial Status Report is available on the Court's website. All parties must participate in the preparation and filing of the Joint Initial Status Report. The Court requires a joint report, so a filing by one side or the other is not sufficient. Second, the parties must email a Word version of a proposed Scheduling Order under Rule 16(b) to the Court's proposed order inbox. Lead counsel for the parties must participate in filing the initial status report. Plaintiff must serve this Order on all other parties. If the defendant has not been served with process, plaintiff's counsel must contact the Courtroom Deputy at jessica_j_ramos@ilnd.uscourts.gov to reschedule the initial status report deadline. Plaintiff should not file the Joint Initial Status Report before the defendant(s) has been served with process. The parties must discuss settlement in good faith and make a serious attempt to resolve this case amicably. All counsel of record must read and comply with this Court's Standing Orders on its webpage. Please pay special attention to the Standing Orders about Depositions and Discovery. Mailed notice. (jjr, ) (Entered: 01/26/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Steven C. Seeger. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sheila M. Finnegan. Case assignment: Random assignment. (jmk, ) (Entered: 01/25/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Christine Slowinski by David B. Levin (Levin, David) (Entered: 01/25/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Christine Slowinski by Steven Gene Perry (Perry, Steven) (Entered: 01/25/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Christine Slowinski by Todd M Friedman (Friedman, Todd) (Entered: 01/25/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Christine Slowinski; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-17857568. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Friedman, Todd) (Entered: 01/25/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Strivectin Operating Company, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jon K. Stromsta(Designation Retained)