This case was last updated from PACER on 02/03/2020 at 08:14:53 (UTC).

Slowik et al v. Lambert et al

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 Slowik filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Lambert. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Debra C Poplin and Clifton L Corker. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-00501

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Tennessee Eastern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Debra C Poplin

Presiding Judge

Clifton L Corker

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

T. S.

Valerie Slowik

Ryan Slowik

A. S.

Defendants

Keith Lambert

Shelli Lambert

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Gregory Brown

Attorney at Lowe, Yeager and Brown

900 South Gay Street, Suite 2102

Knoxville, TN 37902

William Scott Hickerson

Attorney at Lowe, Yeager and Brown

900 South Gay Street, Suite 2102

Knoxville, TN 37902

Christopher C Field

Attorney at Lowe, Yeager and Brown

900 South Gay Street, Suite 2102

Knoxville, TN 37902

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) SUPPLEMENT to #1 Complaint Civil Action Cover Sheet by Ryan Slowik, Valerie Slowik. (Brown, Gregory) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

#7

(#7) SUPPLEMENT to #1 Complaint Summons (Proposed) to Shelli Lambert by Ryan Slowik, Valerie Slowik. (Brown, Gregory) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

#10

(#10) AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants., filed by Ryan Slowik, Valerie Slowik.(Brown, Gregory) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

#8

(#8) SUPPLEMENT to #1 Complaint Summons (Proposed) to Keith Lambert by Ryan Slowik, Valerie Slowik. (Brown, Gregory) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

#2

(#2) Administrative Notice to Gregory Brown: Cover sheet not included. Please file a Civil Cover Sheet. Requirements due by 12/11/2019. (JBR) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#3

(#3) Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Clifton L Corker on 12/6/19. (JBR) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#4

(#4) Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Clifton L Corker on 12/6/19. (JBR) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#5

(#5) Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Clifton L Corker on 12/6/19. (JBR) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT and Demand for Jury Trial against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-4147761.), filed by Ryan Slowik, T. S., A. S., Valerie Slowik.(Brown, Gregory) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

#9

(#9) Summons Issued as to Keith Lambert, Shelli Lambert. (Attachments: #1 Summons Shelli Lambert)(ABF) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

9 #1

Summons Shelli Lambert

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants., filed by Ryan Slowik, Valerie Slowik.(Brown, Gregory) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Summons Issued as to Keith Lambert, Shelli Lambert. (Attachments: #1 Summons Shelli Lambert)(ABF) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUPPLEMENT to #1 Complaint Summons (Proposed) to Keith Lambert by Ryan Slowik, Valerie Slowik. (Brown, Gregory) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUPPLEMENT to #1 Complaint Summons (Proposed) to Shelli Lambert by Ryan Slowik, Valerie Slowik. (Brown, Gregory) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUPPLEMENT to #1 Complaint Civil Action Cover Sheet by Ryan Slowik, Valerie Slowik. (Brown, Gregory) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Clifton L Corker on 12/6/19. (JBR) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Clifton L Corker on 12/6/19. (JBR) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Clifton L Corker on 12/6/19. (JBR) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketNo summons received with initiating documents. Therefore, summons not issued as to Keith Lambert, Shelli Lambert. (JBR) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Administrative Notice to Gregory Brown: Cover sheet not included. Please file a Civil Cover Sheet. Requirements due by 12/11/2019. (JBR) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketDistrict Judge Clifton L Corker and Magistrate Judge Debra C Poplin added. (JBR) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT and Demand for Jury Trial against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-4147761.), filed by Ryan Slowik, T. S., A. S., Valerie Slowik.(Brown, Gregory) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.