This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/22/2023 at 09:03:02 (UTC).

SLOSS v. AMAZON.COM SERVICES LLC et al

Case Summary

On 11/23/2022 SLOSS filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against AMAZON COM SERVICES LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Georgette Castner and Rukhsanah L. Singh. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:22-CV-06745

  • Filing Date:

    11/23/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Georgette Castner

Referral Judge

Rukhsanah L. Singh

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JOSEPH SLOSS

Defendants

AMAZON.COM SERVICES, LLC

JOHN/JANE DOES 1-10

ABC CORP. 1-10

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MARK ROBERT NATALE

Attorney at MALAMUT & ASSOCIATES LLC

457 Haddonfield Road, Suite 500

Cherry Hill, NJ 08002

Defendant Attorneys

KEITH J. ROSENBLATT

Attorney at LITTLER MENDELSON, P.C.

One Newark Center, 8Th Floor

Newark, NJ 07102

MARLIE P. BLAISE

Attorney at Littler Mendelson, P.C.

1085 Raymond Blvd, 8Th Floor

Newark, NJ 07102

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by AMAZON.COM SERVICES LLC from Superior Court of Mercer County, NJ, case number MER L 001836 22. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-13850118), filed by AMAZON.COM SERVICES LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal to NJ Superior Court, #3 Certificate of Service)(BLAISE, MARLIE) (Entered: 11/23/2022)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal to NJ Superior Court

1 #3

Certificate of Service

#2

(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by AMAZON.COM SERVICES LLC identifying Amazon.com, Inc. as Corporate Parent.. (BLAISE, MARLIE) (Entered: 11/23/2022)

#3

(#3) Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Amazon.com Services LLC.. (BLAISE, MARLIE) (Entered: 11/23/2022)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by MARLIE P. BLAISE on behalf of AMAZON.COM SERVICES LLC (BLAISE, MARLIE) (Entered: 11/23/2022)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by KEITH J. ROSENBLATT on behalf of AMAZON.COM SERVICES LLC (ROSENBLATT, KEITH) (Entered: 11/23/2022)

#6

(#6) ORDER SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Settlement Conference set for 1/31/2023 at 11:00 AM in Trenton - Courtroom 7W before Magistrate Judge Rukhsanah L. Singh. Signed by Magistrate Judge Rukhsanah L. Singh on 11/28/2022. (jdg) (Entered: 11/29/2022)

#7

(#7) STIPULATION AND ORDER extending Defendant's time to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint until 12/28/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 11/29/2022. (jdg) (Entered: 11/29/2022)

#8

(#8) Letter from Plaintiff's counsel, Mark Natale, Esquire re #6 Order, Set/Clear Flags, Set Hearings. (NATALE, MARK) (Entered: 11/29/2022)

#9

(#9) LETTER ORDER granting conversion of scheduling conference scheduled for 1/31/2023 to a Zoom conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Rukhsanah L. Singh on 11/30/2022. (mg) (Entered: 11/30/2022)

#10

(#10) ANSWER to Complaint by AMAZON.COM SERVICES, LLC.(BLAISE, MARLIE) (Entered: 12/14/2022)

#11

(#11) Joint Discovery Plan by AMAZON.COM SERVICES, LLC.(BLAISE, MARLIE) (Entered: 01/17/2023)

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Joint Discovery Plan by AMAZON.COM SERVICES, LLC.(BLAISE, MARLIE) (Entered: 01/17/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ANSWER to Complaint by AMAZON.COM SERVICES, LLC.(BLAISE, MARLIE) (Entered: 12/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) LETTER ORDER granting conversion of scheduling conference scheduled for 1/31/2023 to a Zoom conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Rukhsanah L. Singh on 11/30/2022. (mg) (Entered: 11/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Letter from Plaintiff's counsel, Mark Natale, Esquire re #6 Order, Set/Clear Flags, Set Hearings. (NATALE, MARK) (Entered: 11/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) STIPULATION AND ORDER extending Defendant's time to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint until 12/28/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 11/29/2022. (jdg) (Entered: 11/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Settlement Conference set for 1/31/2023 at 11:00 AM in Trenton - Courtroom 7W before Magistrate Judge Rukhsanah L. Singh. Signed by Magistrate Judge Rukhsanah L. Singh on 11/28/2022. (jdg) (Entered: 11/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk`s Text Order - The document #3 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by JOSEPH SLOSS has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 12/14/2022. (mlh) (Entered: 11/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • DocketJudge Georgette Castner and Magistrate Judge Rukhsanah L. Singh added. (mlh) (Entered: 11/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by KEITH J. ROSENBLATT on behalf of AMAZON.COM SERVICES LLC (ROSENBLATT, KEITH) (Entered: 11/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by MARLIE P. BLAISE on behalf of AMAZON.COM SERVICES LLC (BLAISE, MARLIE) (Entered: 11/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Amazon.com Services LLC.. (BLAISE, MARLIE) (Entered: 11/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by AMAZON.COM SERVICES LLC identifying Amazon.com, Inc. as Corporate Parent.. (BLAISE, MARLIE) (Entered: 11/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by AMAZON.COM SERVICES LLC from Superior Court of Mercer County, NJ, case number MER L 001836 22. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-13850118), filed by AMAZON.COM SERVICES LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal to NJ Superior Court, #3 Certificate of Service)(BLAISE, MARLIE) (Entered: 11/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Amazon.Com, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where ABC CORPORATIONS 1-100 is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Keith J. Rosenblatt Esq.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Marlie P. Blaise