This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/20/2021 at 09:14:34 (UTC).

Sloat v. Turner

Case Summary

On 09/21/2021 Sloat filed a Personal Injury - Marine lawsuit against Turner. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Hawaii District. The Judges overseeing this case are DERRICK K. WATSON and KENNETH J. MANSFIELD. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00395

  • Filing Date:

    09/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Marine

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

DERRICK K. WATSON

Referral Judge

KENNETH J. MANSFIELD

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Bernadette Sloat

James Sloat

Defendants

Chris B. Turner

Napali Riders, Inc. In Personam doing business as Na Pali Riders

M/V Sea Biscuit, O.N. HA-1603-CP

John Does 1-5

Jane Does 1-5

Doe Partnerships 1-5

Doe Corporations 1-5

Doe Associates 1-5

Doe Governmental Agencies 1-5

Other Entities 1-5

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Susan L. Marshall

4265 Halenani Street

Lihue, HI 96766

Defendant Attorneys

Normand R. Lezy

Attorney at Cox, Wootton, Lerner, Griffin & Hansen LLP

841 Bishop Street, Suite 1099

Honolulu, HI 96813

Michael J. Nakano

Attorney at Cox, Wootton, Lerner, Griffin & Hansen LLP

841 Bishop Street, Suite 1099

Honolulu, HI 96813

Shawn L.M. Benton

Attorney at Cox, Wootton, Lerner, Griffin & Hansen LLP

841 Bishop Street, Suite 1099

Honolulu, HI 96813

 

Court Documents

#18

(#18) Defendant Christopher B. Turner and Defendant Napali Riders, Inc.'s Scheduling Conference Statement; Certificate of Service . (Lezy, Normand) Modified on 11/17/2021 (eta). (Entered: 11/15/2021)

#17

(#17) Plaintiffs Bernadette Sloat and James Sloat's Scheduling Conference Statement; Certificate of Service . (Marshall, Susan) Modified on 11/17/2021 (eta). (Entered: 11/15/2021)

#16

(#16) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Napali Riders, Inc., Chris B. Turner (Requests for Answers to Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents to Plaintiffs) (Lezy, Normand) (Entered: 11/10/2021)

#15

(#15) STIPULATED QUALIFIED HEALTH INFORMATION PROTECTIVE ORDER; EXHIBIT A - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD on 11/3/2021. (eta) (Entered: 11/03/2021)

#14

(#14) REPORT of Planning Meeting . (Marshall, Susan) (Entered: 11/01/2021)

#12

(#12) NOTICE of Appearance by Michael J. Nakano on behalf of Napali Riders, Inc., Chris B. Turner on behalf of Napali Riders, Inc., Chris B. Turner. (Nakano, Michael) (Entered: 10/19/2021)

#11

(#11) NOTICE of Appearance by Shawn L.M. Benton on behalf of Napali Riders, Inc., Chris B. Turner on behalf of Napali Riders, Inc., Chris B. Turner. (Benton, Shawn) (Entered: 10/19/2021)

#10

(#10) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Napali Riders, Inc.. (Lezy, Normand) (Entered: 10/15/2021)

#9

(#9) Defendant Christopher B. Turner's and Defendant Napali Riders, Inc.'s ANSWER to #1 Complaint; Certificate of Service by Napali Riders, Inc., Chris B. Turner.(Lezy, Normand) Modified on 10/18/2021 (eta). (Entered: 10/14/2021)

#8

(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by James Sloat, Bernadette Sloat. M/V Sea Biscuit, O.N. HA-1603-CP served on 9/24/2021. (Marshall, Susan) (Entered: 09/28/2021)

#7

(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by James Sloat, Bernadette Sloat. Napali Riders, Inc. served on 9/24/2021. (Marshall, Susan) (Entered: 09/28/2021)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by James Sloat, Bernadette Sloat. Chris B. Turner served on 9/24/2021. (Marshall, Susan) (Entered: 09/28/2021)

5 #1

AO 398 Notice of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons

4 #1

Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosures

#4

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Main Document

#1

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) Defendant Christopher B. Turner and Defendant Napali Riders, Inc.'s Scheduling Conference Statement; Certificate of Service . (Lezy, Normand) Modified on 11/17/2021 (eta). (Entered: 11/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Plaintiffs Bernadette Sloat and James Sloat's Scheduling Conference Statement; Certificate of Service . (Marshall, Susan) Modified on 11/17/2021 (eta). (Entered: 11/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Napali Riders, Inc., Chris B. Turner (Requests for Answers to Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents to Plaintiffs) (Lezy, Normand) (Entered: 11/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) STIPULATED QUALIFIED HEALTH INFORMATION PROTECTIVE ORDER; EXHIBIT A - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD on 11/3/2021. (eta) (Entered: 11/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) REPORT of Planning Meeting . (Marshall, Susan) (Entered: 11/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) EO: The #4 Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 11/22/2021 at 9:30 a.m. will be held by telephone.In accordance with the United States District Court for the District of Hawaii's latest Temporary General Order Regarding District of Hawaii Response to COVID-19 Emergency and the Order Authorizing the Use of Telephonic and Video Hearings, due to the ongoing COVID-19 pandemic and public health emergency, including the anticipated long term need to maintain certain social distancing and other measures intended to protect the public, court employees, and counsel from being exposed to the COVID-19 virus, while at the same time regulating civil matters in a manner consistent with equity and fairness, the hearing will be held telephonically. Parties are to participate via telephone through our AT&T Service. Call-in information for this conference is below. Parties must connect to the conference at least five (5) minutes prior to the scheduled start time of the hearing.Dial in number is 1-877-848-7030Access Code is 2123668 (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD)(bbb) (Entered: 10/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE of Appearance by Michael J. Nakano on behalf of Napali Riders, Inc., Chris B. Turner on behalf of Napali Riders, Inc., Chris B. Turner. (Nakano, Michael) (Entered: 10/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Appearance by Shawn L.M. Benton on behalf of Napali Riders, Inc., Chris B. Turner on behalf of Napali Riders, Inc., Chris B. Turner. (Benton, Shawn) (Entered: 10/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Napali Riders, Inc.. (Lezy, Normand) (Entered: 10/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Defendant Christopher B. Turner's and Defendant Napali Riders, Inc.'s ANSWER to #1 Complaint; Certificate of Service by Napali Riders, Inc., Chris B. Turner.(Lezy, Normand) Modified on 10/18/2021 (eta). (Entered: 10/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by James Sloat, Bernadette Sloat. M/V Sea Biscuit, O.N. HA-1603-CP served on 9/24/2021. (Marshall, Susan) (Entered: 09/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by James Sloat, Bernadette Sloat. Napali Riders, Inc. served on 9/24/2021. (Marshall, Susan) (Entered: 09/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by James Sloat, Bernadette Sloat. Chris B. Turner served on 9/24/2021. (Marshall, Susan) (Entered: 09/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet ~ Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Attachments: #1 AO 398 Notice of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons, #2 AO 399 Waiver of Service of Summons)(emt, ) (Entered: 09/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:30AM on 11/22/2021 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 9/21/2021. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosures) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. (emt, ) (Entered: 09/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (emt, ) (Entered: 09/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 21-00395 DKW-KJM on all further pleadings. (emt, ) (Entered: 09/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0975-2582847.), filed by Bernadette Sloat. (Attachments: #1 Main Document (Proposed) Summons , #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Marshall, Susan) Modified on 9/22/2021 (emt, ). (Entered: 09/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Shawn L.M. Benton

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael J. Nakano