This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/10/2019 at 07:54:53 (UTC).

Slingshot Printing LLC v. HP Inc.

Case Summary

On 06/11/2019 Slingshot Printing LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against HP Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Alan D Albright. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:19-CV-00362

  • Filing Date:

    06/11/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Alan D Albright

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Slingshot Printing LLC

Defendant

HP Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Raymond W Mort, III

Attorney at The Mort Law Firm, PLLC

100 Congress Ave, Suite 2000

Austin, TX 78701

Michael A. Siem

Attorney at Goldberg Segalla LLP

711 Third Avenue - Suite 1900

New York, NY 10017

Ronald M. Daignault

Attorney at Goldberg Segalla LLP

711 Third Avenue - Suite 1900

New York, NY 10017

Richard Juang

Attorney at Goldberg Segalla LLP

8000 Maryland Avenue, Suite 640

St. Louis, MO 63105

Chandran B. Iyer

Attorney at Goldberg Segalla LLP

711 Third Avenue - Suite 1900

New York, NY 10017

Defendant Attorney

Barry K. Shelton

Attorney at Shelton Coburn LLP

311 Rr 620 S, Suite 205

Austin, TX 78734-4775

 

Court Documents

14 #1

Proposed Order

#14

(#14) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by HP Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Shelton, Barry) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

#13

(#13) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Barry K. Shelton on behalf of HP Inc.. Attorney Barry K. Shelton added to party HP Inc.(pty:dft) (Shelton, Barry) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

#12

(#12) ORDER GRANTING #8 #9 #10 #11 Motions to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorneys Ronald M. Daignault, Chandran B. Iyer, Michael A. Siem, Richard Juang for Slingshot Printing LLC. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorneys hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (lad) (Entered: 06/21/2019)

1 #13

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #12

Exhibit

1 #11

Exhibit

1 #10

Exhibit

1 #9

Exhibit

1 #8

Exhibit

1 #7

Exhibit

1 #6

Exhibit

1 #5

Exhibit

1 #4

Exhibit

1 #3

Exhibit

1 #2

Exhibit

1 #1

Exhibit

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-12217953), filed by Slingshot Printing LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Civil Cover Sheet)(Mort, Raymond) (Entered: 06/11/2019)

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/02/2019
  • Reset Deadlines: HP Inc. answer due 8/22/2019. (lad) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Text Order GRANTING #14 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer entered by Judge Alan D Albright. Came on for consideration Defendant's Motion. Noting that it is unopposed, the Court GRANTS the Motion. Defendant shall have until August 22, 2019, to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (sb) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by HP Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Shelton, Barry) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Barry K. Shelton on behalf of HP Inc.. Attorney Barry K. Shelton added to party HP Inc.(pty:dft) (Shelton, Barry) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) ORDER GRANTING #8 #9 #10 #11 Motions to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorneys Ronald M. Daignault, Chandran B. Iyer, Michael A. Siem, Richard Juang for Slingshot Printing LLC. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorneys hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (lad) (Entered: 06/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Raymond W Mort, III ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-12249077) by on behalf of Slingshot Printing LLC. (Mort, Raymond) (Entered: 06/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Raymond W Mort, III ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-12249065) by on behalf of Slingshot Printing LLC. (Mort, Raymond) (Entered: 06/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Raymond W Mort, III ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-12249056) by on behalf of Slingshot Printing LLC. (Mort, Raymond) (Entered: 06/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Raymond W Mort, III ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-12249033) by on behalf of Slingshot Printing LLC. (Mort, Raymond) (Entered: 06/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Slingshot Printing LLC. HP Inc. served on 6/17/2019, answer due 7/8/2019. (Mort, Raymond) (Entered: 06/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Letters to Attorneys Ronald Daignault, Chandran Iyer, Michael Siem, and Richard Juang re: non-admitted status. (lt) (Entered: 06/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Summons Issued as to HP Inc. (lt) (Entered: 06/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Report on Patent/Trademark sent to U.S. Patent and Trademark Office with copy of complaint. (lt) (Entered: 06/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Slingshot Printing LLC. (lt) (Entered: 06/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • Case assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (lt) (Entered: 06/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Slingshot Printing LLC. (Mort, Raymond) (Entered: 06/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Slingshot Printing LLC. (Mort, Raymond) (Entered: 06/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-12217953), filed by Slingshot Printing LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Civil Cover Sheet)(Mort, Raymond) (Entered: 06/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Slingshot Printing LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where HP, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael A. Siem

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Richard Juang