This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/16/2019 at 05:22:42 (UTC).

Slaven et al v. Kenjaev

Case Summary

On 03/20/2019 Slaven filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Kenjaev. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Michigan Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Mona K. Majzoub, Mark A. Goldsmith and David R. Grand. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-10825

  • Filing Date:

    03/20/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Mark A. Goldsmith

Referral Judges

Mona K. Majzoub

David R. Grand

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

David Slaven

Kendra Slaven

Defendants

Erkin Kenjaev

INTERLAND, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Darren K. Legato

Attorney at Hewson & Van Hellemont, P.C.

25900 Greenfield Road, Suite 650

Oak Park, MI 48073

Phillip S. Serafini

Attorney at Serafini, Michalowski,

44444 Mound Rd., Suite 100

Sterling Heights, MI 48314

Defendant Attorney

Kevin J. Plagens

Attorney at Kopka, Pinkus, Dolin & Eads

33533 W. Twelve Mile Road, Suite 350

Farmington Hills, MI 48331

 

Court Documents

#22

#21

#20

#19

#18

#17

#16

#15

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #5

Exhibit D-Correspondence to Plaintiff's Counsel

1 #4

Exhibit C-Proof of Service of Plaintiff's Complaint

1 #3

Exhibit B-Plaintiff's Amended Complaint

1 #2

Exhibit A-Plaintiff's Complaint

1 #1

Index of Exhibits

#1

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) ANSWER to Amended Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand by All Defendants. (Plagens, Kevin) (Entered: 06/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Kevin J. Plagens appearing on behalf of INTERLAND, INC. (Plagens, Kevin) (Entered: 06/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • Set Deadlines/Hearings: Jury Trial set for 4/20/2020 08:30 AM before District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith (Corrects Case Management Order, setting trial as a bench trial) (Sandusky, K) (Entered: 05/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) SUMMONS Issued for *INTERLAND, INC.* (DWor) (Entered: 05/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • REQUEST for SUMMONS for INTERLAND, INC.. (Serafini, Phillip) (Entered: 05/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) AMENDED COMPLAINT (SECOND) filed by All Plaintiffs against All Defendants. NEW PARTIES ADDED. (Serafini, Phillip) (Entered: 05/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) STIPULATED ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS LEAVE TO FILE 2ND AMENDED COMPLAINT. Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (Sandusky, K) (Entered: 05/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) NOTICE TO APPEAR: Settlement Conference set for 1/9/2020 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge David R. Grand (EBut) (Entered: 05/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) ORDER REFERRING OTHER MATTERS to Magistrate Judge Grand : Settlement Conference to be scheduled within the 30-day period before the deadline for the Joint Final Pretrial Order. Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (Sandusky, K) (Entered: 04/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 10/23/2019, Dispositive Motion Cut-off set for 11/6/2019, Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/30/2020 at 01:30 PM before District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith, and Bench Trial set for 4/20/2020 at 08:30 AM before District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (Refer to image for additional dates) (Sandusky, K) (Entered: 04/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 04/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ANSWER to Complaint by All Defendants. (Plagens, Kevin) (Entered: 04/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Kevin J. Plagens appearing on behalf of All Defendants (Plagens, Kevin) (Entered: 04/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MEMORANDUM re #3 Order, #1 Notice of Removal,, Affidavit of Service by Erkin Kenjaev (Plagens, Kevin) (Entered: 04/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MEMORANDUM re #4 Order, #1 Notice of Removal,, Plaintiff's Amended Complaint by Erkin Kenjaev (Plagens, Kevin) (Entered: 04/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MEMORANDUM re #3 Order, #1 Notice of Removal,, Summons and Complaint by Erkin Kenjaev (Plagens, Kevin) (Entered: 04/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER Regarding Certification Requirements. Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (EKar) (Entered: 04/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ORDER Regarding Removal. Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (EKar) (Entered: 04/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) ORDER of DISQUALIFICATION and REASSIGNING CASE from Magistrate Judge Mona K. Majzoub to Magistrate Judge David R. Grand. (SSch) (Entered: 03/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (DPer) (Entered: 03/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by All Defendants from Wayne County Circuit Court, case number 18-015703-NI. Receipt No: 0645-7161284 - Fee: $ 400 [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A-Plaintiff's Complaint, #3 Exhibit B-Plaintiff's Amended Complaint, #4 Exhibit C-Proof of Service of Plaintiff's Complaint, #5 Exhibit D-Correspondence to Plaintiff's Counsel) (Plagens, Kevin) (Entered: 03/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BSW INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kevin J. Plagens