This case was last updated from PACER on 09/20/2021 at 09:34:12 (UTC).

Slaughter et al v. The Charter Oak Fire Insurance Company et al

Case Summary

On 07/22/2021 Slaughter filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against The Charter Oak Fire Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Middle District. The Judge overseeing this case is Matthew W. Brann. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-CV-01284

  • Filing Date:

    07/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Matthew W. Brann

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Derek Slaughter

Gabriel Campana

City of Williamsport

Defendants

The Charter Oak Fire Insurance Company

Brit Insurance Services USA, Inc. d/b/a Brit Global Specialty USA

Steven Helm

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jill Elaine Nagy

Attorney at Summers Nagy Law Offices

200 Spring Ridge Drive, Suite 202

Wyomissing, PA 19610

Sean E. Summers

Attorney at Summers Nagy Law Offices

35 South Duke Street

York, PA 17401

Defendant Attorneys

Alan S. Miller

Attorney at Houston Harbaugh, P.C.

Three Gateway Center, 401 Liberty Ave

Pittsburgh, PA 15222

Nancy E. Zangrilli

Attorney at Stewart Smith

300 Conshohocken State Road, Suite 670

West Conshohocken, PA 19428

Michael Zicolello

Attorney at SCHEMERY & ZICOLELLO

333 Market St.

Williamsport, PA 17701

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that #6 Motion to Extend Time is granted; Defendants shall respond to the Complaint on/before 8/25/2021. Signed by Chief Judge Matthew W. Brann on 8/4/2021 (lg) (Entered: 08/04/2021)

8 #2

Exhibit(s) B - BPF-PK-101170-01 for policy period 1/1/2016 to 1/1/2017

8 #1

Exhibit(s) A - BPF-PK-101170-02 for policy period 1/1/2017 to 1/1/2018

#8

(#8) ANSWER to Complaint (attached as Exhibit to Notice of Removal) by Brit Insurance Services USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A - BPF-PK-101170-02 for policy period 1/1/2017 to 1/1/2018, #2 Exhibit(s) B - BPF-PK-101170-01 for policy period 1/1/2016 to 1/1/2017)(Zangrilli, Nancy) (Entered: 07/29/2021)

#7

(#7) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by The Charter Oak Fire Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent The Charter Oak Fire Insurance Company is 100% owned by the Travelers Indemnity Company, which is 100% owned by Travelers Insurance Group Holdings, Inc. which is 100% owned by Travelers Property Casualty Corp. which is 100% owned by The Travelers Companies, Inc. for The Charter Oak Fire Insurance Company. (Miller, Alan) (Entered: 07/29/2021)

6 #1

Proposed Order

#6

(#6) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to to Respond to the ComplaintJoint by The Charter Oak Fire Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Miller, Alan) (Entered: 07/29/2021)

#5

(#5) Letter to Counsel Re: Case Assignment and Procedures. (See Letter for further details.) Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 7/27/2021. (jr) (Entered: 07/27/2021)

#4

(#4) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Brit Insurance Services USA, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Brit Insurance USA Holdings, Inc. for Brit Insurance Services USA, Inc.. (Zangrilli, Nancy) (Entered: 07/22/2021)

1 #5

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #4

Exhibit 4 of 4

1 #3

Exhibit 3 of 4

1 #2

Exhibit 2 of 4

1 #1

Exhibit 1 of 4

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by The Charter Oak Fire Insurance Company from Lycoming County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2021-605. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 5643402), filed by The Charter Oak Fire Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 of 4, #2 Exhibit 2 of 4, #3 Exhibit 3 of 4, #4 Exhibit 4 of 4, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(nr) (Entered: 07/22/2021)

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ANSWER to Petition for Removal Answer and Defenses to Plaintiffs' Complaint by The Charter Oak Fire Insurance Company.(Miller, Alan) (Entered: 08/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that #6 Motion to Extend Time is granted; Defendants shall respond to the Complaint on/before 8/25/2021. Signed by Chief Judge Matthew W. Brann on 8/4/2021 (lg) (Entered: 08/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ANSWER to Complaint (attached as Exhibit to Notice of Removal) by Brit Insurance Services USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A - BPF-PK-101170-02 for policy period 1/1/2017 to 1/1/2018, #2 Exhibit(s) B - BPF-PK-101170-01 for policy period 1/1/2016 to 1/1/2017)(Zangrilli, Nancy) (Entered: 07/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by The Charter Oak Fire Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent The Charter Oak Fire Insurance Company is 100% owned by the Travelers Indemnity Company, which is 100% owned by Travelers Insurance Group Holdings, Inc. which is 100% owned by Travelers Property Casualty Corp. which is 100% owned by The Travelers Companies, Inc. for The Charter Oak Fire Insurance Company. (Miller, Alan) (Entered: 07/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to to Respond to the ComplaintJoint by The Charter Oak Fire Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Miller, Alan) (Entered: 07/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Letter to Counsel Re: Case Assignment and Procedures. (See Letter for further details.) Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 7/27/2021. (jr) (Entered: 07/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Brit Insurance Services USA, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Brit Insurance USA Holdings, Inc. for Brit Insurance Services USA, Inc.. (Zangrilli, Nancy) (Entered: 07/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE by Brit Insurance Services USA, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal, - Notice of Consent to the Removal (Zangrilli, Nancy) (Entered: 07/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Sean E. Summers on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Summers, Sean) (Entered: 07/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by The Charter Oak Fire Insurance Company from Lycoming County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2021-605. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 5643402), filed by The Charter Oak Fire Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 of 4, #2 Exhibit 2 of 4, #3 Exhibit 3 of 4, #4 Exhibit 4 of 4, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(nr) (Entered: 07/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Charter Oak Fire Ins Co is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Nancy E. Zangrilli Esq.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Alan S. Miller

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael Zicolello