This case was last updated from PACER on 09/15/2020 at 07:31:52 (UTC).

Sladeck v. Ford Motor Company et al

Case Summary

On 07/17/2020 Sladeck filed a Contract - Product Liability lawsuit against Ford Motor Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Bernard G. Skomal and William Q. Hayes. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-01364

  • Filing Date:

    07/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Southern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Bernard G. Skomal

Presiding Judge

William Q. Hayes

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Timothy Sladeck

Defendants

Ford Motor Company

Does 1 through 20

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

David Neal Barry

Attorney at The Barry Law Firm

11845 W. Olympic Blvd., Suite 1270

Los Angeles, CA 90064

Defendant Attorney

Matthew Millard Proudfoot

Attorney at Gates, Gonter, Guy, Proudfoot & Muench, LLP

38 Discovery, Suite 200

Irvine, CA 92618

 

Court Documents

#8

RESTRICTED

#6

(#6) NOTICE AND ORDER: (1) For Early Neutral Evaluation Conference, (2) Settling Rule 26 Compliance and Case Management Conference. Video Conference Early Neutral Evaluation set for 9/14/2020 at 01:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal. Case Management Conference set for 9/14/2020 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal. Joint Discovery Plan due 8/31/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal on 7/22/20.(jmo) (Entered: 07/22/2020)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Interested Parties by Ford Motor Company (Proudfoot, Matthew) (ag). (Entered: 07/17/2020)

#4

(#4) DECLARATION re #1 Notice of Removal, by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Proudfoot, Matthew) (ag). (Entered: 07/17/2020)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Millard Proudfoot on behalf of Ford Motor Company (Proudfoot, Matthew) (ag). (Entered: 07/17/2020)

#2

(#2) ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Ford Motor Company. (vxc) (dsn) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

1 #2

Exhibit

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand from Superior Court of the State of California, County of San Diego, case number 37-2020-00020075-CU-BC-NC. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ACASDC-14178511.), filed by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit)The new case number is 3:20-cv-1364-WQH-BGS. Judge William Q. Hayes and Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal are assigned to the case.(vxc) (dsn) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) JOINT DISCOVERY PLAN by Timothy Sladeck (Barry, David) (ag). (Entered: 08/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • Docket(#7) MINUTE ORDER: Due to a conflict in the Court's calendar, the Early Neutral Evaluation and Case Management Conference set for 9/14/2020 is CONTINUED to 9/28/2020 at 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal. Counsel for the parties will receive an invitation to the video conference no later than 9/24/2020. No other requirements or deadlines set in the Court's Order setting the ENE/CMC (ECF 6) are changed. (no document attached) (rxa) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE AND ORDER: (1) For Early Neutral Evaluation Conference, (2) Settling Rule 26 Compliance and Case Management Conference. Video Conference Early Neutral Evaluation set for 9/14/2020 at 01:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal. Case Management Conference set for 9/14/2020 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal. Joint Discovery Plan due 8/31/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal on 7/22/20.(jmo) (Entered: 07/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Interested Parties by Ford Motor Company (Proudfoot, Matthew) (ag). (Entered: 07/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) DECLARATION re #1 Notice of Removal, by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Proudfoot, Matthew) (ag). (Entered: 07/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Millard Proudfoot on behalf of Ford Motor Company (Proudfoot, Matthew) (ag). (Entered: 07/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Ford Motor Company. (vxc) (dsn) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand from Superior Court of the State of California, County of San Diego, case number 37-2020-00020075-CU-BC-NC. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ACASDC-14178511.), filed by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit)The new case number is 3:20-cv-1364-WQH-BGS. Judge William Q. Hayes and Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal are assigned to the case.(vxc) (dsn) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less