This case was last updated from PACER on 10/13/2019 at 07:32:49 (UTC).

Skywalker Holdings, LLC v. Red Rock Sourcing, LLC

Case Summary

On 08/14/2019 Skywalker Holdings, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Red Rock Sourcing, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Nevada District. The Judges overseeing this case are Cam Ferenbach and Gloria M. Navarro. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-01401

  • Filing Date:

    08/14/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Nevada District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Cam Ferenbach

Presiding Judge

Gloria M. Navarro

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

SKYWALKER HOLDINGS, LLC, a Utah limited liability company

Skywalker Holdings, LLC

Defendants

RED ROCK SOURCING, LLC, a Nevada limited liability company, and DOES 1-10

Red Rock Sourcing, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Bryce K. Kunimoto

Attorney at Holland & Hart

9555 Hillwood Drive, Second Floor

Las Vegas, NV 89134

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Exhibit Exhibit A

1 #3

Exhibit Exhibit C

#2

(#2) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by SKYWALKER HOLDINGS, LLC, a Utah limited liability company. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Kunimoto, Bryce) (Entered: 08/14/2019)

1 #2

Exhibit Exhibit B

#5

(#5) AO 120 - REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent or trademark. E-mailed to the US Patent and Trademark Office. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (JQC) (Entered: 08/15/2019)

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to Red Rock Sourcing, LLC re #1 Complaint. (JQC) (Entered: 08/15/2019)

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet

#3

(#3) PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued; filed by Plaintiff SKYWALKER Holdings, LLC. (Kunimoto, Bryce) (Entered: 08/14/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-5664814) by SKYWALKER HOLDINGS, LLC, a Utah limited liability company. Proof of service due by 11/12/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Summons)(Kunimoto, Bryce) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 08/14/2019)

1 #5

Summons

5 #1

Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/19/2019
  • (#7) CLERK'S NOTICE that this case is randomly reassigned to Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro for all further proceedings. All further documents must bear the correct case number 2:19-cv-01401-GMN-VCF. (no image attached) (DKJ) (Entered: 08/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • (#6) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 8/19/2019. The Honorable Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey is no longer assigned to this case. Pursuant to General Order No. 2011-03, IT IS ORDERED that this action is referred to the Clerk for random reassignment to one of the designated patent pilot program judges for all further proceedings. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CS) (Entered: 08/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) AO 120 - REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent or trademark. E-mailed to the US Patent and Trademark Office. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (JQC) (Entered: 08/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Summons Issued as to Red Rock Sourcing, LLC re #1 Complaint. (JQC) (Entered: 08/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • Case randomly assigned to Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey and Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. Nature of Suit: 830 Patent Case (JQC) (Entered: 08/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued; filed by Plaintiff SKYWALKER Holdings, LLC. (Kunimoto, Bryce) (Entered: 08/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by SKYWALKER HOLDINGS, LLC, a Utah limited liability company. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Kunimoto, Bryce) (Entered: 08/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-5664814) by SKYWALKER HOLDINGS, LLC, a Utah limited liability company. Proof of service due by 11/12/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Summons)(Kunimoto, Bryce) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 08/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.