This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/09/2022 at 08:11:31 (UTC).

Skycoin Global Foundation Limited et al v. Stephens et al

Case Summary

On 02/08/2022 Skycoin Global Foundation Limited filed an Other - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act lawsuit against Stephens. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Sara L. Ellis. The case status is Pending - Other - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-00708

  • Filing Date:

    02/08/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Sara L. Ellis

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

SKYCOIN GLOBAL FOUNDATION LIMITED

SYMBOLIC ANALYTICS INC.

Brandon Smietana

Defendants

Bradford Stephens

Aaron Kunstman

Harrison Gevirtz

Ryan Eagle

Andrew Young

Far Ahead Marketing

Joel Cuthriell

Morgan Peck

Tristan Greene

Bryan Clark

Catherine Byerly

Steven Leonard

Josh Ogle

Joel Wayne Cuthriell

HaRRo

Joel

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Michael Charles Goode

111 West Washington Street,, Suite 1750

Chicago, IL 60602

Defendant Attorneys

Dean Dean Barakat

Attorney at Cole Sadkin, LLC

1652 West Belmont Ave., Suite 1

Chicago, IL 60657

Justin Alan Morello

Attorney at Morello Law, P.C.

3170 4Th Avenue, Suite 250

San Diego, CA 92103

 

Court Documents

#17

(#17) NOTICE of Motion by Justin Alan Morello for presentment of motion to dismiss/lack of jurisdiction, #15 before Honorable Sara L. Ellis on 4/12/2022 at 09:45 AM. (Morello, Justin) (Entered: 04/07/2022)

#16

(#16) STATUS Report Joint Initial by Skycoin Global Foundation Limited (Goode, Michael) (Entered: 04/05/2022)

15 #3

Exhibit A to the Declaration of Joshua Ogle

15 #2

Declaration of Joshua Ogle ISO 12(b)(2) Motion to Dismiss

15 #1

Points and Authorities ISO 12(b)(2) Motion to Dismiss

#15

(#15) MOTION by Defendant Far Ahead Marketing to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction (Attachments: #1 Points and Authorities ISO 12(b)(2) Motion to Dismiss, #2 Declaration of Joshua Ogle ISO 12(b)(2) Motion to Dismiss, #3 Exhibit A to the Declaration of Joshua Ogle)(Morello, Justin) (Entered: 04/01/2022)

14 #1

Notice of Filing

#14

(#14) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Catherine Byerly by Dean Dean Barakat (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing)(Barakat, Dean) (Entered: 03/31/2022)

#13

(#13) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-19294107. (Morello, Justin) (Entered: 03/29/2022)

#12

(#12) ANSWER to Complaint by Joel Wayne Cuthriell (exr, ) (Entered: 03/29/2022)

#11

(#11) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sara L. Ellis: The initial status conference in this matter is set for 4/12/2022 at 9:30 AM. The parties are directed to review the procedures and requirements for this conference on Judge Ellis' web site and to submit the required Initial Status Report by 4/5/2022. Attorneys/Parties should appear for the hearing by calling the Toll-Free Number: (866) 434-5269, Access Code: 8087837. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing (use toll free number). Please be sure to keep your phone on mute when you are not speaking. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Mailed notice (rj, ) (Entered: 03/21/2022)

#10

No Description Available

#9

No Description Available

#8

No Description Available

#7

No Description Available

4 #1

Notice of Filing

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) NOTICE of Motion by Justin Alan Morello for presentment of motion to dismiss/lack of jurisdiction, #15 before Honorable Sara L. Ellis on 4/12/2022 at 09:45 AM. (Morello, Justin) (Entered: 04/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) STATUS Report Joint Initial by Skycoin Global Foundation Limited (Goode, Michael) (Entered: 04/05/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • DocketALIAS Summons Issued as to Defendant Harrison Gevirtz. (ak, ) (Entered: 04/05/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) MOTION by Defendant Far Ahead Marketing to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction (Attachments: #1 Points and Authorities ISO 12(b)(2) Motion to Dismiss, #2 Declaration of Joshua Ogle ISO 12(b)(2) Motion to Dismiss, #3 Exhibit A to the Declaration of Joshua Ogle)(Morello, Justin) (Entered: 04/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Catherine Byerly by Dean Dean Barakat (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing)(Barakat, Dean) (Entered: 03/31/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-19294107. (Morello, Justin) (Entered: 03/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ANSWER to Complaint by Joel Wayne Cuthriell (exr, ) (Entered: 03/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/24/2022
  • DocketALIAS Summons Issued as to Defendant Aaron Kunstman. (ey, ) (Entered: 03/24/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Harrison Gevirtz (ak, ) (Entered: 03/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sara L. Ellis: The initial status conference in this matter is set for 4/12/2022 at 9:30 AM. The parties are directed to review the procedures and requirements for this conference on Judge Ellis' web site and to submit the required Initial Status Report by 4/5/2022. Attorneys/Parties should appear for the hearing by calling the Toll-Free Number: (866) 434-5269, Access Code: 8087837. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing (use toll free number). Please be sure to keep your phone on mute when you are not speaking. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Mailed notice (rj, ) (Entered: 03/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 03/10/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Joel Wayne Cuthriell (jmk, ) (Entered: 03/10/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Catherine Byerly, Ryan Eagle, Far Ahead Marketing, Tristan Greene, Aaron Kunstman, Steven Leonard, Josh Ogle, Morgan Peck, Bradford Stephens, Andrew Young (jmk, ) (Entered: 03/09/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) PAYMENT regarding #1 of Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-19225739. (Goode, Michael) (Entered: 03/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • Docket(#5) PAYMENT of Filing fee $ 402. (Goode, Michael) (Entered: 03/04/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Ryan Eagle by Dean Dean Barakat (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing)(Barakat, Dean) (Entered: 02/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Bradford Stephens by Dean Dean Barakat (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing)(Barakat, Dean) (Entered: 02/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: Case reassigned to the Honorable Sara L. Ellis for all further proceedings. Honorable Marvin E. Aspen no longer assigned to the case. Signed by the Executive Committee on 2/10/2022. (exr, ) (Entered: 02/10/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • DocketCLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (ak, ) (Entered: 02/09/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Marvin E. Aspen. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey Cole. FEE DUE, NO INFORMA PAUPERIS APPLICATION SUBMITTED. Case assignment: Random assignment. (ak, ) (Entered: 02/09/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Brandon Smietana, SYMBOLIC ANALYTICS INC., SKYCOIN GLOBAL FOUNDATION LIMITED; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 402. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Goode, Michael) (Entered: 02/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less