This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/26/2022 at 07:28:28 (UTC).

SKY JTC Corporation v. BMW of North America, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 02/25/2022 SKY JTC Corporation filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against BMW of North America, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are John F. Walter and Maria A. Audero. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-01325

  • Filing Date:

    02/25/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John F. Walter

Referral Judge

Maria A. Audero

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SKY JTC Corporation

Defendant

BMW of North America, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

M Nicholas Nita

Attorney at Nita Law Firm

3055 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 450

Los Angeles, CA 90010

Defendant Attorneys

Karyn L Ihara

Attorney at Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard and Smith LLP

633 West 5Th Street Suite 4000

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Lisa R Weddle

Attorney at Morgan Lewis and Bockius LLP

300 South Grand Avenue 22Nd Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071-3132

Behrouz Shareghi Arani

Attorney at Morgan Lewis and Bockius LLP

300 South Grand Avenue 22Nd Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

 

Court Documents

#21

(#21) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123), #20 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Request for Substitution of Attorney. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak) (Entered: 04/21/2022)

#20

(#20) *Stricken* Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Lisa R Weddle counsel for Defendant BMW of North America, LLC. Lisa R. Weddle is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by defendant BMW Of North America, LLC. (Weddle, Lisa) Modified on 4/22/2022 (sr). (Entered: 04/20/2022)

#19

(#19) *Stricken* Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Behrouz Shareghi Arani counsel for Defendant BMW of North America, LLC. Behrouz Shareghi Arani is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by defendant BMW Of North America, LLC. (Shareghi Arani, Behrouz) Modified on 4/22/2022 (sr). (Entered: 04/20/2022)

17 #1

Proposed Order

17 #17

Main Document

#16

(#16) SCHEDULING AND CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. The purpose of this Order is to notify the parties and their counsel of the deadlines and the schedule that will govern this action. Pretrial Conference set for 1/13/2023 at 8:00 AM. Hearing on Motions in Limine; Disputed Jury Instructions set for 1/20/2023 at 8:00 AM. Jury Trial set for 1/31/2023 at 8:30 AM. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. (iv) (Entered: 03/25/2022)

#15

(#15) ORDER VACATING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE, REFERRAL TO PRIVATE MEDIATION, and DISMISSING ANY UNSERVED DOE DEFENDANTS by Judge John F. Walter. The Court has reviewed the parties' Joint Rule 26(f) Report and finds that a Scheduling Conference is not necessary. The hearing on April 4, 2022 is vacated and taken off calendar. A Scheduling and Case Management Order will issue. Any unserved DOE defendants are dismissedat this time.The Court, having considered the parties' Request: ADR Procedure Selection, the Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program, or the report submitted by the parties pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f) and Civil L.R. 26-1, hereby: ORDERS this case referred to: ADR PROCEDURE NO. 3: (Private mediation). The ADR proceeding is to be completed no later than: September 12, 2022. The Joint Report re: Results of Settlement Conference due on: September 16, 2022. (iv) (Entered: 03/25/2022)

#14

(#14) JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 3-5 days, filed by Defendant BMW of North America, LLC.. (Shareghi Arani, Behrouz) (Entered: 03/21/2022)

#13

(#13) DECLARATION of Behrouz Shareghi Arani Lead Counsel filed by Defendant BMW of North America, LLC. (Shareghi Arani, Behrouz) (Entered: 03/03/2022)

4 #5

Exhibit E

4 #4

Exhibit D

4 #4

Main Document

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Behrouz Shareghi Arani on behalf of Defendant BMW of North America, LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company (Shareghi Arani, Behrouz) (Entered: 02/25/2022)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant BMW of North America, LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company. (Shareghi Arani, Behrouz) (Entered: 02/25/2022)

1 #3

Exhibit C - Dismissal of Defendant South Bay BMW

1 #2

Exhibit B - Answer to Complaint

1 #1

Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint

1 #1

Main Document

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) Text Entry Order STRIKING Notices of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel #19 and #20 for the reason stated in the Clerk's Notice of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents #21 . Counsel wishing to substitute in shall file a Request for Substitution of Counsel WITH a declaration as REQUIRED by the Court's Scheduling and Case Management Order. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (sr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 04/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123), #20 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Request for Substitution of Attorney. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak) (Entered: 04/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) *Stricken* Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Lisa R Weddle counsel for Defendant BMW of North America, LLC. Lisa R. Weddle is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by defendant BMW Of North America, LLC. (Weddle, Lisa) Modified on 4/22/2022 (sr). (Entered: 04/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) *Stricken* Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Behrouz Shareghi Arani counsel for Defendant BMW of North America, LLC. Behrouz Shareghi Arani is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by defendant BMW Of North America, LLC. (Shareghi Arani, Behrouz) Modified on 4/22/2022 (sr). (Entered: 04/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) Text Entry Order DENYING REQUEST TO SUBSTITUTE ATTORNEY #17 . The Request does not satisfy paragraph 3(c) of the Court's Scheduling and Case Management Order.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (sr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 04/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) REQUEST TO SUBSTITUTE ATTORNEY Eric Y. Kizirian, Esq. in place of attorney Lisa R. Weddie and Behrouz S. Arani filed by Defendant BMW of North America, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Attorney Karyn L Ihara added to party BMW of North America, LLC(pty:dft)) (Ihara, Karyn) (Entered: 04/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) SCHEDULING AND CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. The purpose of this Order is to notify the parties and their counsel of the deadlines and the schedule that will govern this action. Pretrial Conference set for 1/13/2023 at 8:00 AM. Hearing on Motions in Limine; Disputed Jury Instructions set for 1/20/2023 at 8:00 AM. Jury Trial set for 1/31/2023 at 8:30 AM. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. (iv) (Entered: 03/25/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ORDER VACATING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE, REFERRAL TO PRIVATE MEDIATION, and DISMISSING ANY UNSERVED DOE DEFENDANTS by Judge John F. Walter. The Court has reviewed the parties' Joint Rule 26(f) Report and finds that a Scheduling Conference is not necessary. The hearing on April 4, 2022 is vacated and taken off calendar. A Scheduling and Case Management Order will issue. Any unserved DOE defendants are dismissedat this time.The Court, having considered the parties' Request: ADR Procedure Selection, the Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program, or the report submitted by the parties pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f) and Civil L.R. 26-1, hereby: ORDERS this case referred to: ADR PROCEDURE NO. 3: (Private mediation). The ADR proceeding is to be completed no later than: September 12, 2022. The Joint Report re: Results of Settlement Conference due on: September 16, 2022. (iv) (Entered: 03/25/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 3-5 days, filed by Defendant BMW of North America, LLC.. (Shareghi Arani, Behrouz) (Entered: 03/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) DECLARATION of Behrouz Shareghi Arani Lead Counsel filed by Defendant BMW of North America, LLC. (Shareghi Arani, Behrouz) (Entered: 03/03/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 03/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car) (Entered: 03/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John F. Walter and Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero. (car) (Entered: 03/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNON-CONFORMED COPY OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL filed by Plaintiff SKY JTC Corporation pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) as to McKenna Motors Torrance, Inc. Without prejudice. Submitted with Attachment 3 Exhibit C to Notice of Removal #1 (car) (Entered: 03/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Defendant BMW of North America, LLC. Filed in State Court on 10/20/2021 Submitted with Attachment 2 Exhibit B to Notice of Removal #1 (car) (Entered: 03/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants BMW of North America, LLC, Does 1 through 20, inclusive, McKenna Motors Torrance, Inc. Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiff SKY JTC Corporation. Filed in State Court on 9/27/2021 Submitted with Attachment 1 Exhibit A to Notice of Removal #1 (car) (Entered: 03/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT and Certification of Interested Parties filed by Defendant BMW of North America, LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company identifying BMW AG as Corporate Parent. (Shareghi Arani, Behrouz) (Entered: 02/25/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) DECLARATION of Behrouz Shareghi Arani re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 filed by Defendant BMW of North America, LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Shareghi Arani, Behrouz) (Entered: 02/25/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Behrouz Shareghi Arani on behalf of Defendant BMW of North America, LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company (Shareghi Arani, Behrouz) (Entered: 02/25/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant BMW of North America, LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company. (Shareghi Arani, Behrouz) (Entered: 02/25/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles County Superior Court, case number 21STCV35501 Receipt No: ACACDC-32856228 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant BMW of North America, LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Answer to Complaint, #3 Exhibit C - Dismissal of Defendant South Bay BMW) (Attorney Behrouz Shareghi Arani added to party BMW of North America, LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company(pty:dft))(Shareghi Arani, Behrouz) (Entered: 02/25/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SKY JTC CORPORATION A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where BMW OF NORTH AMERICA, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Karyn L Ihara

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Behrouz Shareghi Arani