This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/12/2020 at 14:53:10 (UTC).

Skullcandy v. Sterling

Case Summary

On 06/20/2019 Skullcandy filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against Sterling. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Utah District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Cecilia M. Romero and Ted Stewart. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-00424

  • Filing Date:

    06/20/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Cecilia M. Romero

Presiding Judge

Ted Stewart

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Skullcandy

Defendant

Irena Sterling doing business as Loop Savings

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Monica S. Call

Attorney at STOEL RIVES

201 S Main St Ste 1100

Salt Lake City, UT 84111-4904

Arryn K. Miner

Attorney at VORYS SATER SEYMOUR AND PEASE LLP

52 E Gay St, Po Box 1008

Columbus, OH 43216-1008

William D. Kloss, Jr.

Attorney at VORYS SATER SEYMOUR AND PEASE LLP

52 E Gay St, Po Box 1008

Columbus, OH 43216-1008

 

Court Documents

#16

15 #1

Exhibit Messaging Center Correspondence

#15

#14

#13

12 #3

Text of Proposed Order

12 #2

Exhibit B - ECF Registration Form

12 #1

Exhibit A - Application

#12

11 #3

Text of Proposed Order

11 #2

Exhibit B - ECF Registration Form

11 #1

Exhibit A - Application

#11

#10

9 #3

Exhibit C - Otter Order

9 #2

Exhibit B - General Nutrition Order

9 #1

Exhibit A - Affidavit of Non-Service

#9

23 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen(14) days after any defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero on 8/16/2019. (las) (Entered: 08/16/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE for Complaint and Summons served on Irena Sterling on 07/26/2019, filed by Plaintiff Skullcandy. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Messaging Center Correspondence)(Miner, Arryn) (Entered: 08/15/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ORDER granting #12 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Arryn K. Miner for Skullcandy. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 7/29/2019. (las) (Entered: 07/29/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ORDER granting #11 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of William D. Kloss, Jr. for Skullcandy. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 7/29/2019. (las) (Entered: 07/29/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Arryn K. Miner , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number 1088-3331277, filed by Plaintiff Skullcandy. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Application, #2 Exhibit B - ECF Registration Form, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Call, Monica) (Entered: 07/23/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of William D. Kloss, Jr. , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number 1088-3329036, filed by Plaintiff Skullcandy. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Application, #2 Exhibit B - ECF Registration Form, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Call, Monica) (Entered: 07/19/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER granting #9 Motion for Alternative Service of Process. Plaintiff may serve Defendant by delivering a copy of the Complaint and summonsvia Amazons messaging service. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero on 7/16/2019. (las) (Entered: 07/16/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION for Service of Process. Summons to be served on: Irena Sterling and Memorandum in Support filed by Plaintiff Skullcandy. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Non-Service, #2 Exhibit B - General Nutrition Order, #3 Exhibit C - Otter Order, #4 Exhibit D - Pure Encapsulations Order, #5 Text of Proposed Order) Motions referred to Cecilia M. Romero.(Call, Monica) (Entered: 07/12/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Irena Sterling. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (nl) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Irena Sterling. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh) (Entered: 06/24/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF REQUIREMENTS for appearance phv mailed to attorney Marcel C. Duhamel, for Plaintiff Skullcandy (tlh) (Entered: 06/21/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF REQUIREMENTS for appearance phv mailed to attorney William D. Kloss, Jr., Rodney A. Holaday and Arryn K. Miner, for Plaintiff Skullcandy. (tlh) (Entered: 06/21/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Report on the Filing of an action sent to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Attachments: #1 Copy of Complaint) (tlh) (Entered: 06/21/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • Docket(#3) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero under 28:636 (b)(1)(A), Magistrate to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. No attached document. Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 6/20/2019. (tco) (Entered: 06/20/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) COMPLAINT against Irena Sterling (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1088-3306080) filed by Skullcandy. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) Assigned to Judge Ted Stewart (Call, Monica) (Entered: 06/20/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Case has been indexed and assigned to Judge Ted Stewart. Plaintiff Skullcandy is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (tlh) (Entered: 06/20/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Skullcandy is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Monica S. Call

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Arryn K. Miner

Latest cases represented by Lawyer William Darrell Kloss, Jr.