This case was last updated from PACER on 09/26/2020 at 07:54:37 (UTC).

Skull Shaver, LLC v. Freedom Grooming

Case Summary

On 07/28/2020 Skull Shaver, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Freedom Grooming. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:20-CV-03670

  • Filing Date:

    07/28/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pennsylvania Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Skull Shaver, LLC

Defendant

Freedom Grooming

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

AHMED M. SOLIMAN

Attorney at SOLIMAN & ASSOCIATES, PC

923 Haddonfield Road, Suite 300

Cherry Hill, NJ 08002

 

Court Documents

#3

(#3) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Skull Shaver, LLC. Freedom Grooming waiver sent on 8/7/2020, answer due 10/6/2020. (SOLIMAN, AHMED) (Entered: 08/11/2020)

#2

(#2) INITIAL PROCEDURAL ORDER. SIGNED BY JUDGE: JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR ON 7/29/20. 7/29/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(DT) (Entered: 07/29/2020)

1 #6

Declaration

1 #5

Designation Form

1 #4

Case Management Track Form

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit

1 #1

Exhibit

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Freedom Grooming ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0313-14454704.), filed by Skull Shaver, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Case Management Track Form, #5 Designation Form, #6 Declaration)(SOLIMAN, AHMED) (Entered: 07/28/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Skull Shaver, LLC. Freedom Grooming waiver sent on 8/7/2020, answer due 10/6/2020. (SOLIMAN, AHMED) (Entered: 08/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • DocketDEMAND for Trial by Jury by Skull Shaver, LLC. (JL) (Entered: 07/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) INITIAL PROCEDURAL ORDER. SIGNED BY JUDGE: JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR ON 7/29/20. 7/29/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(DT) (Entered: 07/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Freedom Grooming ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0313-14454704.), filed by Skull Shaver, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Case Management Track Form, #5 Designation Form, #6 Declaration)(SOLIMAN, AHMED) (Entered: 07/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less