This case was last updated from PACER on 12/17/2019 at 07:06:21 (UTC).

Skrewball Spirits, LLC v. One (1) Source Signature Glassware, Inc.

Case Summary

On 10/18/2019 Skrewball Spirits, LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against One 1 Source Signature Glassware, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Karen S. Crawford and Anthony J. Battaglia. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-02005

  • Filing Date:

    10/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    California Southern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Karen S. Crawford

Presiding Judge

Anthony J. Battaglia

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Skrewball Spirits, LLC

Defendant

One (1) Source Signature Glassware, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

James R Wakefield

Attorney at Cummins and White LLP

2424 South East Bristol Street, Suite 300

Newport Beach, CA 92660

Jason N. Black

Attorney at Black Deen LLP

1620 5Th Ave., Suite 875

San Diego, CA 92101

Defendant Attorneys

Tyler Brown

Attorney at Brown & Brown

1152 North Mountain Avenue, Suite 210

Upland, CA 91786

Gregory J. Larson

Attorney at Larson & Simpson, PLC

90 South Kyrene Road, Suite 5

Chandler, AZ 85226

 

Court Documents

#13

(#13) ORDER Granting Plaintiff's Motion for Substitution of Attorney. Attorney James R Wakefield terminated. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 12/3/2019. (jrm) (Entered: 12/03/2019)

#12

(#12) MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Skrewball Spirits, LLC. (Black, Jason) (jrm). (Entered: 12/03/2019)

11 #2

Exhibit Exhibit 2

11 #1

Exhibit Exhibit 1

#11

(#11) REPLY to Response to Motion re #3 MOTION to Change Venue filed by One (1) Source Signature Glassware, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2)(Larson, Gregory)(jrm). (Entered: 11/27/2019)

10 #1

*Restricted*

#10

(#10) Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order Thereon by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia Rejecting re #9 MOTION to Substitute Attorney , from Plaintiff Skrewball Spirits, LLC. Non-compliance with local rule(s), ECF 2(h): Includes a proposed order or requires judges signature, ECF 2(h) - Includes a proposed order or requires judges signature; Judicial Council forms prohibited.. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: The document is rejected. It is ordered that the Clerk STRIKE the document from the record, and serve a copy of this order on all parties. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on..(sjt) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/25/2019: #1 Rejected Document) (sjt). (Entered: 11/25/2019)

#9

(#9) **DOCUMENT STRICKEN PER ORDER [10 MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Skrewball Spirits, LLC. (Black, Jason)Attorney Jason N. Black added to party Skrewball Spirits, LLC(pty:pla) (sjt). (Main Document 9 replaced on 11/25/2019) (sjt). Modified to strike on 11/25/2019 (sjt). (Entered: 11/25/2019)

#8

(#8) RESPONSE in Opposition re #3 MOTION to Change Venue filed by Skrewball Spirits, LLC. (Wakefield, James) Modified docket text on 11/21/2019 (jrm). (Entered: 11/20/2019)

#7

(#7) ORDER Approving the Pro Hac Vice Application of Gregory J. Larson, re #6 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 11/12/2019.(rmc) (Entered: 11/14/2019)

6 #1

Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing

#6

(#6) Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number 0974-13140790.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Larson, Gregory) (dsn) (Entered: 11/07/2019)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Withdrawal of Document by One (1) Source Signature Glassware, Inc. (Brown, Tyler) Docket text modified on 11/7/2019; QC mailer sent re incorrect event; no refile request (jrm). (Entered: 11/06/2019)

3 #3

Exhibit Exhibit C

3 #2

Exhibit Exhibit B

3 #1

Exhibit Exhibit A

#3

(#3) MOTION to Change Venue by One (1) Source Signature Glassware, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C)(Brown, Tyler)QC mailer sent re duplicate entry (jrm). (Entered: 11/05/2019)

2 #1

Exhibit A

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) ORDER Granting Plaintiff's Motion for Substitution of Attorney. Attorney James R Wakefield terminated. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 12/3/2019. (jrm) (Entered: 12/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Skrewball Spirits, LLC. (Black, Jason) (jrm). (Entered: 12/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) REPLY to Response to Motion re #3 MOTION to Change Venue filed by One (1) Source Signature Glassware, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2)(Larson, Gregory)(jrm). (Entered: 11/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order Thereon by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia Rejecting re #9 MOTION to Substitute Attorney , from Plaintiff Skrewball Spirits, LLC. Non-compliance with local rule(s), ECF 2(h): Includes a proposed order or requires judges signature, ECF 2(h) - Includes a proposed order or requires judges signature; Judicial Council forms prohibited.. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: The document is rejected. It is ordered that the Clerk STRIKE the document from the record, and serve a copy of this order on all parties. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on..(sjt) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/25/2019: #1 Rejected Document) (sjt). (Entered: 11/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) **DOCUMENT STRICKEN PER ORDER [10 MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Skrewball Spirits, LLC. (Black, Jason)Attorney Jason N. Black added to party Skrewball Spirits, LLC(pty:pla) (sjt). (Main Document 9 replaced on 11/25/2019) (sjt). Modified to strike on 11/25/2019 (sjt). (Entered: 11/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) RESPONSE in Opposition re #3 MOTION to Change Venue filed by Skrewball Spirits, LLC. (Wakefield, James) Modified docket text on 11/21/2019 (jrm). (Entered: 11/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER Approving the Pro Hac Vice Application of Gregory J. Larson, re #6 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 11/12/2019.(rmc) (Entered: 11/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number 0974-13140790.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Larson, Gregory) (dsn) (Entered: 11/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER by Judge Battaglia: Setting Briefing Schedule re #3 MOTION to Change Venue : Responses due by 11/20/2019; Replies due by 11/27/2019; sur-replies will not be accepted. Motion hearing scheduled for 2/6/20 at 2:00 p.m. in Courtroom 4A.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(no document attached) (sc) (Entered: 11/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Withdrawal of Document by One (1) Source Signature Glassware, Inc. (Brown, Tyler) Docket text modified on 11/7/2019; QC mailer sent re incorrect event; no refile request (jrm). (Entered: 11/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) MOTION to Change Venue by One (1) Source Signature Glassware, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C)(Brown, Tyler)QC mailer sent re duplicate entry (jrm). (Entered: 11/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) **Document Withdrawn per Dkt. No. #4 ** MOTION to Change Venue by One (1) Source Signature Glassware, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Brown, Tyler) (jrm). Modified to withdraw on 11/7/2019 (jrm). (Entered: 11/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from San Diego Superior Court, Central Division, case number 37-2019-000487-CU-BC-CTL. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0974-13069975.), filed by One (1) Source Signature Glassware, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Exhibit A - state court complaint, #3 Exhibit B - summons)The new case number is 3:19-cv-02005-AJB-KSC. Judge Anthony J. Battaglia and Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford are assigned to the case.(jmo) (jao). (Entered: 10/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jason Nolan Black