This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/08/2021 at 08:18:46 (UTC).

Skov v. Monsanto Company

Case Summary

On 11/09/2020 Skov filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Monsanto Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Mark Pittman. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-CV-01217

  • Filing Date:

    11/09/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Mark Pittman

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Linda Skov

Erik Skov

Defendant

Monsanto Company

Not Classified By Court and Plaintiff

Erik Skov

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Not Classified By Court Attorneys

Jon Brison Bursey

Attorney at Harris Finley & Bogle PC

120 Palo Pinto Street

Weatherford, TX 76086

Mac Smith

Attorney at Harris Finley & Bogle PC

120 Palo Pinto Street

Weatherford, TX 76086

Andrew D Sims

Attorney at Harris Finley & Bogle PC

777 Main St, Suite 1800

Fort Worth, TX 76102-5341

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO 247): The JPML has issued the attached order in MDL 2741, and that order has now been filed in the Northern District of California. (wxc) (Entered: 12/14/2020)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to Monsanto Company. (wxc) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

#2

(#2) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. File to: Judge Pittman. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. Attorneys are further reminded that, if necessary, they must comply with Local Rule 83.10(a) within 14 days or risk the possible dismissal of this case without prejudice or without further notice. (wxc) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

1 #1

Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against All Defendants filed by Linda Skov, Erik Skov. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0539-11341508) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (Bursey, Jon) Modified on 11/10/2020 (twd). (Entered: 11/10/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/17/2020
  • DocketCase transferred from NDTX has been opened in in California Northern District as case number 3:20-cv-09068. (wxc) (Entered: 12/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • DocketInterdistrict Transfer to California Northern; notice sent via email. All documents available electronically. If receiving court cannot upload, documents are available from PACER (record does not contain restricted documents). Counsel advised to file future documents in California Northern. (wxc) (Entered: 12/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO 247): The JPML has issued the attached order in MDL 2741, and that order has now been filed in the Northern District of California. (wxc) (Entered: 12/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Monsanto Company. (wxc) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. File to: Judge Pittman. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. Attorneys are further reminded that, if necessary, they must comply with Local Rule 83.10(a) within 14 days or risk the possible dismissal of this case without prejudice or without further notice. (wxc) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against All Defendants filed by Linda Skov, Erik Skov. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0539-11341508) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (Bursey, Jon) Modified on 11/10/2020 (twd). (Entered: 11/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Monsanto Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jon Brison Bursey