This case was last updated from PACER on 12/03/2019 at 07:41:48 (UTC).

Skoronski v. Monsanto Company, Inc.

Case Summary

On 10/04/2019 Skoronski filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Monsanto Company, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Iowa Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Stephen B. Jackson, Jr and Rebecca Goodgame Ebinger. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-00072

  • Filing Date:

    10/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Iowa Southern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Stephen B. Jackson, Jr

Presiding Judge

Rebecca Goodgame Ebinger

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Ron F Skoronski

Ron F. Skoronski

Defendant

Monsanto Company, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Davin C Curtiss

Attorney at O'CONNOR & THOMAS, P.C.

1000 Main Street

Dubuque, IA 52001

A John Arenz

Attorney at O'CONNOR & THOMAS, P.C.

1000 Main Street

Dubuque, IA 52001

Davin C. Curtiss

Attorney at O'CONNOR & THOMAS, P.C.

1000 Main Street

Dubuque, IA 52001

Christopher C. Fry

Attorney at O'CONNOR & THOMAS, P.C.

1000 Main Street

Dubuque, IA 52001

A. John Arenz

Attorney at O'CONNOR & THOMAS, P.C.

1000 Main Street

Dubuque, IA 52001

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) Certified Conditional Transfer Order by clerk's office by the Northern District of California. (kjw) (Entered: 10/17/2019)

#6

(#6) Certified Conditional Transfer Order MDL No. 2741 by Northern District of California. (kjw) (Entered: 10/16/2019)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher C. Fry on behalf of Ron F. Skoronski (Fry, Christopher) (Entered: 10/11/2019)

#2

(#2) Letter to MDL Panel regarding Potential Tag-Along Action. Emailed Docket sheet, complaint and letter to the MDL Panel. (kjw) (Entered: 10/07/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against Monsanto Company, Inc. Filing fee paid in the amount of $ 400, receipt number 0863-3941265., filed by Ron F Skoronski. Notice of Dismissal for lack of Service deadline set for 1/2/2020. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 1/2/2020.(Curtiss, Davin) (Entered: 10/04/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/17/2019
  • ***Civil Case Terminated. Case electronically sent to the Northern District of California. (kjw) (Entered: 10/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Certified Conditional Transfer Order by clerk's office by the Northern District of California. (kjw) (Entered: 10/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Certified Conditional Transfer Order MDL No. 2741 by Northern District of California. (kjw) (Entered: 10/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • (#5) TEXT MINUTE ORDER - TO INVOLVED CLERKS - Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-158) Finalized on 10/16/19. Please see pleading (3 in CO/1:19-cv-02339, 3 in CO/1:19-cv-02689, 3 in FLM/2:19-cv-00608, 3 in FLM/2:19-cv-00721, 3 in FLM/3:19-cv-00976, 3 in FLM/8:19-cv-02034, 3 in FLM/8:19-cv-02035, 3 in FLM/8:19-cv-02037, 3 in FLM/8:19-cv-02072, 3 in FLM/8:19-cv-02075, 3 in FLM/8:19-cv-02083, 3 in FLM/8:19-cv-02086, 3 in FLM/8:19-cv-02261, 3 in FLS/1:19-cv-23715, 3 in FLS/4:19-cv-10155, 3 in GAN/4:19-cv-00194, 3 in IAN/6:19-cv-02061, 3 in IAS/3:19-cv-00072, 3 in ILN/1:19-cv-06313, 3 in LAW/6:19-cv-01276, 1336 in MDL No. 2741, 3 in MN/0:19-cv-02625, 3 in MN/0:19-cv-02628, 3 in MOE/4:19-cv-02421, 3 in MOE/4:19-cv-02426, 3 in MOE/4:19-cv-02430, 3 in MOE/4:19-cv-02432, 3 in MOE/4:19-cv-02435, 3 in MOE/4:19-cv-02610, 3 in NYS/7:19-cv-08776, 3 in OHN/3:19-cv-01833, 3 in PAW/2:19-cv-01234, 3 in SC/7:19-cv-02581, 3 in SC/8:19-cv-02605). As stipulated in Rule 7.1(c) of the Rules of Procedure of the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, transmittal of the order has been stayed 7 days to give any party an opportunity to oppose the transfer. The 7-day period has now elapsed, no opposition was received, and the order is directed to the Clerk of the United States District Court for the N.D. California for filing. The Panel governing statute, 28 U.S.C. 1407, requires that the transferee clerk transmit a certified copy of the Panel order to transfer to the clerk of the district court from which the action is being transferred. Signed by Clerk of the Panel John W. Nichols on 10/16/2019. Associated Cases: MDL No. 2741 et al. (CMD) (kjw) (Entered: 10/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher C. Fry on behalf of Ron F. Skoronski (Fry, Christopher) (Entered: 10/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet Note: Counsel should download the attached summons and/or corporate disclosure packet, if applicable. In compliance with Rule 4 of the Rules of Civil Procedure for summons and Local Rule 7.1 for the disclosure statements. (Attachments: #1 7.1 packet) (kjw) (Entered: 10/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Letter to MDL Panel regarding Potential Tag-Along Action. Emailed Docket sheet, complaint and letter to the MDL Panel. (kjw) (Entered: 10/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against Monsanto Company, Inc. Filing fee paid in the amount of $ 400, receipt number 0863-3941265., filed by Ron F Skoronski. Notice of Dismissal for lack of Service deadline set for 1/2/2020. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 1/2/2020.(Curtiss, Davin) (Entered: 10/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.