This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/03/2022 at 08:45:18 (UTC).

Skipper et al v. Selective Insurance Company of the Southeast

Case Summary

On 11/04/2021 Skipper filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Selective Insurance Company of the Southeast. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Alabama Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are William E. Cassady, Kristi K. DuBose and Bert W. Milling, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00480

  • Filing Date:

    11/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Bert W. Milling, Jr

Presiding Judges

William E. Cassady

Kristi K. DuBose

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Cigar Bar

George W. Skipper, III

Bistro Restaurant

Defendant

Selective Insurance Company of the Southeast

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Max Compton

25 Bull Street, Suite 400

Savannah, GA 31401

William M. Compton

Attorney at Morgan and Morgan, P.A.

25 Bull Street, Suite 400

Savannah, GA 31401

Defendant Attorneys

Brent Burns

Attorney at King & Jurgens, LLC

201 St. Charles Avenuesuite 4500

New Orleans, LA 70170

John Anthony Cangelosi

Attorney at King & Jurgens, LLC

201 St. Charles Avenueste 45Th Floor

New Orleans, LA 70170

Jonathan Michael Lieb

Attorney at McDowell Knight Roedder & Sledge, L.L.C.

P.O. Box 350

Mobile, AL 36601

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Summons

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to Selective Insurance Company of the Southeast. Note to Counsel: The Summons have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service. (srd) (Entered: 11/08/2021)

#3

(#3) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, filed by Selective Insurance Company of the Southeast. (Lieb, Jonathan) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

5 #5

Main Document

5 #1

Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing

6 #6

Main Document

6 #1

Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing

#8

(#8) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Selective Insurance Company of the Southeast. (Lieb, Jonathan) (Entered: 12/30/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Selective Insurance Company of the Southeast. (Lieb, Jonathan) (Entered: 12/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ENDORSED ORDER GRANTING #5 Motion for John A. Cangelosi to Appear Pro Hac Vice; GRANTING #6 Motion for Brent M. Burns to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bert W. Milling, Jr on 12/3/2021. (clr) (Entered: 12/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTIONS REFERRED: #5 MOTION and APPLICATION for John A. Cangelosi to Appear Pro Hac Vice and #6 MOTION and APPLICATION for Brent M. Burns to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Referred to Judge Bert W. Milling, Jr. (srd) (Entered: 12/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION and APPLICATION for Brent M. Burns to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney affirms that a certificate of good standing that complies with #S.D. Ala. GenLR 83.3(d) is attached. ( Filing fee $ 75, Receipt number AALSDC-2915579, Online Credit Card Payment) filed by Selective Insurance Company of the Southeast. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Burns, Brent) (Main Document 6 replaced on 12/2/2021) (srd). (Entered: 12/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION and APPLICATION for John A. Cangelosi to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney affirms that a certificate of good standing that complies with #S.D. Ala. GenLR 83.3(d) is attached. ( Filing fee $ 75, Receipt number AALSDC-2915496, Online Credit Card Payment) filed by Selective Insurance Company of the Southeast. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Cangelosi, John) (Entered: 12/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ENDORSED ORDER granting #3 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; re #1 Complaint. Answer or response due from Selective Insurance Company of the Southeast on 12/31/2021. Signed by District Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 11/24/2021. (khc) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTIONS REFERRED: #3 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, to Judge DuBose. (srd) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, filed by Selective Insurance Company of the Southeast. (Lieb, Jonathan) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to Selective Insurance Company of the Southeast. Note to Counsel: The Summons have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service. (srd) (Entered: 11/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Selective Insurance Company of the Southeast ( Filing fee $402 receipt number AALSDC-2902863, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by George W. Skipper, III, Cigar Bar. 90 day Rule 4m deadline set for 2/2/2022. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (Compton, William) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/8/2021: #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (srd). (Entered: 11/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Selective Insurance Company of America is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer John A. Cangelosi

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jonathan M Lieb