This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/06/2022 at 07:54:57 (UTC).

Skillz Platform Inc. v. Digiatech, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 01/05/2022 Skillz Platform Inc filed an Other lawsuit against Digiatech, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Susan Illston. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:22-CV-00062

  • Filing Date:

    01/05/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Susan Illston

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Skillz Platform Inc.

Defendants

Digiatech, LLC

Newmark Partners, L.P.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Alex Roupen Baghdassarian

Amy B. Hackett

Richard Briansky

Defendant Attorneys

Nitoj P. Singh

David A Paul

John-Paul Singh Deol

Philip Ho-Jun Kim

 

Court Documents

#37

(#37) ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 2/14/2022) (Entered: 02/14/2022)

#36

(#36) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Susan Illston: Status Conference held via Zoom webinar on 2/11/2022.Total Time in Court: 3 minutes. Court Reporter: FTR - SF. Plaintiff Attorney: Richard Briansky. Defendant Attorney: John-Paul Deol, Philip Kim. (ec, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/11/2022) (Entered: 02/11/2022)

#35

(#35) Order by Judge Susan Illston granting #33 Motion for Pro Hac Vice of David Paul.(ec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2022) (Entered: 02/10/2022)

33 #1

Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing

33 #33

Main Document

#32

(#32) Order by Judge Susan Illston granting #31 Motion for Pro Hac Vice of Philip Kim.(ec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2022) (Entered: 02/10/2022)

31 #1

Exhibit Certifcate of Good Standing

31 #31

Main Document

18 #2

Exhibit B

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Richard Briansky for Plaintiff Skillz Platform Inc. (Briansky, Richard) (Filed on 1/7/2022) (Entered: 01/07/2022)

#3

(#3) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 4/1/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/8/2022 02:00 PM. (bns, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2022) (Entered: 01/06/2022)

1 #6

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #5

Exhibit 5

1 #4

Exhibit 4

1 #3

Exhibit 3

1 #2

Exhibit 2

1 #1

Exhibit 1

1 #1

Main Document

59 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#37) ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 2/14/2022) (Entered: 02/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Susan Illston: Status Conference held via Zoom webinar on 2/11/2022.Total Time in Court: 3 minutes. Court Reporter: FTR - SF. Plaintiff Attorney: Richard Briansky. Defendant Attorney: John-Paul Deol, Philip Kim. (ec, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/11/2022) (Entered: 02/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) Order by Judge Susan Illston granting #33 Motion for Pro Hac Vice of David Paul.(ec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2022) (Entered: 02/10/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • Docket(#34) CLERK'S NOTICE ADVANCING HEARING TIME: Status Conference set for 2/11/2022 at 12:30 PM - Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/si General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are remi nded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. Status Conference set for 2/11/2022 12:30 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. (ec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2022). (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (Entered: 02/10/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-16891556.) filed by Digiatech, LLC, Newmark Partners, L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Paul, David) (Filed on 2/10/2022) (Entered: 02/10/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) Order by Judge Susan Illston granting #31 Motion for Pro Hac Vice of Philip Kim.(ec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2022) (Entered: 02/10/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-16891515.) filed by Digiatech, LLC, Newmark Partners, L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certifcate of Good Standing)(Kim, Philip) (Filed on 2/10/2022) (Entered: 02/10/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) CLERK'S NOTICE CONVERTING MOTION HEARING TO STATUS CONFERENCE: The Motion to Remand Hearing #18 is VACATED and a Status Conference is set for 2/11/2022 at 03:00 PM - Videoconference Only before Judge Susan Illston. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/si Genera l Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. Status Conference set for 2/11/2022 03:00 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only before Judge Susan Illston. (ec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2022). (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (Entered: 02/10/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #8 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings ) filed by Skillz Platform Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Motion for Declaratory Relief, #2 Exhibit Bankruptcy Jurisdictional Order, #3 Exhibit Transcript of Hearing, #4 Exhibit Notice of Removal)(Briansky, Richard) (Filed on 2/2/2022) Modified on 2/3/2022 (anj, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 02/02/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) OPPOSITION/RESPONSE AND REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF SAME (re #18 MOTION to Remand ) filed by Digiatech, LLC, Newmark Partners, L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Request for Judicial Notice (RJN), #2 Exhibit Exhibit A to RJN, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B to RJN, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C to RJN, #5 Exhibit Exhibit D to RJN, #6 Exhibit Exhibit E to RJN)(Deol, John-Paul) (Filed on 1/31/2022) Modified on 2/1/2022 (jml, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 01/31/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
20 More Docket Entries
  • 01/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Susan Illston for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by Clerk on 01/13/2022. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(mbc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2022) (Entered: 01/13/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Digiatech, LLC, Newmark Partners, L.P.. Motion Hearing set for 2/18/2022 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom A, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse. Responses due by 1/26/2022. Replies due by 2/2/2022. (Attachments: #1 Request for Judicial Notice, #2 Proposed Order)(Deol, John-Paul) (Filed on 1/12/2022) (Entered: 01/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Defendants Digiatech, LLC and Newmark Partners, L.P.'s ANSWER to Complaint byDigiatech, LLC, Newmark Partners, L.P.. (Deol, John-Paul) (Filed on 1/12/2022) (Entered: 01/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • Docket(#6) CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now reassign this case to a District Judge because a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (shy, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2022) (Entered: 01/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Digiatech, LLC, Newmark Partners, L.P... (Deol, John-Paul) (Filed on 1/12/2022) (Entered: 01/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • Docket#Electronic filing error. NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Richard E. Briansky. The docket shows a different address from what is appearing on the document (dkt. #: 4 Notice of Appearance filed by Skillz Platform Inc.). Please update your personal profile on ECF. (jml, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2022) (Entered: 01/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Richard Briansky for Plaintiff Skillz Platform Inc. (Briansky, Richard) (Filed on 1/7/2022) (Entered: 01/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 4/1/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/8/2022 02:00 PM. (bns, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2022) (Entered: 01/06/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • Docket(#2) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 1/20/2022. (anj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2022) (Entered: 01/06/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of California, San Francisco. Their case number is CGC-21-597098. (Filing fee $402 receipt number ACANDC-16774979). Filed byNewmark Partners, L.P., Digiatech, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Singh, Nitoj) (Filed on 1/5/2022) (Entered: 01/05/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less