This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/20/2022 at 07:37:53 (UTC).

Skechers USA, Inc. v. HDI Global Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 12/22/2021 Skechers USA, Inc filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against HDI Global Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Mark C. Scarsi and John E. McDermott. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-09866

  • Filing Date:

    12/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Mark C. Scarsi

Referral Judge

John E. McDermott

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Skechers USA, Inc.

Defendants

HDI Global Insurance Company

Does 1 through 50, inclusive

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

David Paul Schack

Matthew B O'Hanlon

Defendant Attorneys

Jennifer Yu Sacro

Michael Farbod Houshmand

Joseph A. Hinkhouse

Smita Mokshagundam

 

Court Documents

#21

(#21) JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan filed by Plaintiff Skechers USA, Inc... (O'Hanlon, Matthew) (Entered: 02/14/2022)

#20

(#20) ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Smita Mokshagundam to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant HDI Global Insurance Company and designating Jennifer Y. Sacro as local counsel #18 by Judge Mark C. Scarsi. (lc) (Entered: 02/03/2022)

#19

(#19) ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Joseph A. Hinkhouse to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant HDI Global Insurance Company and designating Jennifer Y. Sacro as local counsel #17 by Judge Mark C. Scarsi. (lc) (Entered: 02/03/2022)

18 #1

Proposed Order

18 #18

Main Document

17 #1

Proposed Order

17 #17

Main Document

14 #1

Proposed Order

13 #1

Proposed Order

#8

(#8) ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) filed by Defendant HDI Global Insurance Company.(Sacro, Jennifer) (Entered: 12/29/2021)

#7

(#7) INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE MARK C. SCARSI upon filing of the complaint by Judge Mark C. Scarsi. (smo) (Entered: 12/27/2021)

#6

(#6) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (car) (Entered: 12/27/2021)

#5

(#5) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car) (Entered: 12/27/2021)

#4

(#4) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Mark C. Scarsi and Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott. (car) (Entered: 12/27/2021)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant HDI Global Insurance Company, identifying HDI Global Network AG; HDI Global SE; Talanx AG; Plaintiff; and Defendant. (Sacro, Jennifer) (Entered: 12/22/2021)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant HDI Global Insurance Company. (Sacro, Jennifer) (Entered: 12/22/2021)

1 #1

Exhibit A - State Court Case File

1 #1

Main Document

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan filed by Plaintiff Skechers USA, Inc... (O'Hanlon, Matthew) (Entered: 02/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Smita Mokshagundam to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant HDI Global Insurance Company and designating Jennifer Y. Sacro as local counsel #18 by Judge Mark C. Scarsi. (lc) (Entered: 02/03/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Joseph A. Hinkhouse to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant HDI Global Insurance Company and designating Jennifer Y. Sacro as local counsel #17 by Judge Mark C. Scarsi. (lc) (Entered: 02/03/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Smita Mokshagundam to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant HDI Global Insurance Company (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500.00 Previously Paid on 1/27/2022, Receipt No. ACACDC-32696787) filed by Defendant HDI Global Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Sacro, Jennifer) (Entered: 01/31/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Joseph A. Hinkhouse to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant HDI Global Insurance Company (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500.00 Previously Paid on 1/27/2022, Receipt No. ACACDC-32696705) filed by Defendant HDI Global Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Sacro, Jennifer) (Entered: 01/31/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Smita Mokshagundam to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant HDI Global Insurance Company (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-32696787) #14 and APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Joseph A. Hinkhouse to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant HDI Global Insurance Company (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500.00 Previously Paid on 1/27/2022, Receipt No. ACACDC-32696705) #13 by Judge Mark C. Scarsi. The documents are stricken and counsel is ordered to file an amended or corrected applications by February 1, 2022. (smo) (Entered: 01/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Smita Mokshagundam to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant HDI Global Insurance Company (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-32696787) #14 , APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Joseph A. Hinkhouse to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant HDI Global Insurance Company (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500.00 Previously Paid on 1/27/2022, Receipt No. ACACDC-32696705) #13 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 5-4.3.4 Application not hand-signed. Other error(s) with document(s): No signature on Application. Local counsel failed to sign the application. See LR 11-1. See Instructions for Applicants (1) note that electronic signatures are not accepted. (G-64). (lt) (Entered: 01/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Smita Mokshagundam to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant HDI Global Insurance Company (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-32696787) filed by Defendant HDI Global Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Sacro, Jennifer) (Entered: 01/27/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Joseph A. Hinkhouse to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant HDI Global Insurance Company (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500.00 Previously Paid on 1/27/2022, Receipt No. ACACDC-32696705) filed by Defendant HDI Global Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Sacro, Jennifer) (Entered: 01/27/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Skechers USA, Inc., (O'Hanlon, Matthew) (Entered: 01/04/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 12/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Mark C. Scarsi. Scheduling Conference set for 2/28/2022 at 10:00 AM before Judge Mark C. Scarsi. (smo) (Entered: 12/29/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) filed by Defendant HDI Global Insurance Company.(Sacro, Jennifer) (Entered: 12/29/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE MARK C. SCARSI upon filing of the complaint by Judge Mark C. Scarsi. (smo) (Entered: 12/27/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (car) (Entered: 12/27/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car) (Entered: 12/27/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Mark C. Scarsi and Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott. (car) (Entered: 12/27/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does 1 through 50, inclusive, HDI Global Insurance Company, filed by Plaintiff Skechers USA, Inc. Filed in State Court on 12/22/2021 Submitted with Attachment 1 to Notice of Removal #1 . (car) (Entered: 12/27/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant HDI Global Insurance Company, identifying HDI Global Network AG; HDI Global SE; Talanx AG; Plaintiff; and Defendant. (Sacro, Jennifer) (Entered: 12/22/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant HDI Global Insurance Company. (Sacro, Jennifer) (Entered: 12/22/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles County Superior Court, case number 21STCV42997 Receipt No: ACACDC-32523368 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant HDI Global Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Case File) (Attorney Jennifer Yu Sacro added to party HDI Global Insurance Company(pty:dft))(Sacro, Jennifer) (Entered: 12/22/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less