This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/13/2021 at 08:05:17 (UTC).

Skarness v. Standard Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 05/14/2021 Skarness filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against Standard Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Lee H Rosenthal. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-CV-01607

  • Filing Date:

    05/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Lee H Rosenthal

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant

Susan Skarness

Defendant and Counter Claimant

Standard Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorney

Madison Tate Donaldson

Attorney at Marc Whitehead Assoc.

430 Heights Boulevard

Houston, TX 77007

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorney

Ryan Kent McComber

Attorney at Figari Davenport, LLP

901 Main Street, Suite 3400

Dallas, TX 75202-3776

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) ANSWER to #7 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Susan Skarness, filed.(Donaldson, Madison) (Entered: 06/30/2021)

#8

(#8) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Standard Insurance Company, filed.(McComber, Ryan) (Entered: 06/23/2021)

#7

(#7) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against Susan Skarness by Standard Insurance Company, filed.(McComber, Ryan) (Entered: 06/23/2021)

#6

(#6) ORDER on Initial Discovery Protocols for Employment Cases Alleging Adverse Action.(Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(leddins, 4) (Entered: 05/19/2021)

5 #1

Attachments

#5

(#5) ORDER Scheduling Rule 16 Conference With the Court and Setting Out the Requirements for Initial Pretrial Work. Initial Conference set for 8/27/2021 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 11B before Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal. (Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) (Attachments: #1 Attachments) Parties notified.(DesireeSillasadi, 4) (Entered: 05/17/2021)

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to Standard Insurance Company. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(DesireeSillas, 4) (Entered: 05/17/2021)

#3

(#3) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Susan Skarness, filed.(Donaldson, Madison) (Entered: 05/14/2021)

#2

(#2) Request for Issuance of Summons as to Standard Insurance Company, filed.(Donaldson, Madison) (Entered: 05/14/2021)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Standard Insurance Company (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0541-26442624) filed by Susan Skarness. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Donaldson, Madison) (Entered: 05/14/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ANSWER to #7 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Susan Skarness, filed.(Donaldson, Madison) (Entered: 06/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Standard Insurance Company, filed.(McComber, Ryan) (Entered: 06/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against Susan Skarness by Standard Insurance Company, filed.(McComber, Ryan) (Entered: 06/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER on Initial Discovery Protocols for Employment Cases Alleging Adverse Action.(Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(leddins, 4) (Entered: 05/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER Scheduling Rule 16 Conference With the Court and Setting Out the Requirements for Initial Pretrial Work. Initial Conference set for 8/27/2021 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 11B before Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal. (Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) (Attachments: #1 Attachments) Parties notified.(DesireeSillasadi, 4) (Entered: 05/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to Standard Insurance Company. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(DesireeSillas, 4) (Entered: 05/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Susan Skarness, filed.(Donaldson, Madison) (Entered: 05/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Request for Issuance of Summons as to Standard Insurance Company, filed.(Donaldson, Madison) (Entered: 05/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Standard Insurance Company (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0541-26442624) filed by Susan Skarness. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Donaldson, Madison) (Entered: 05/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where The Standard Insurance Co. Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ryan Kent McComber