This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/16/2021 at 09:09:56 (UTC).

Skandia Mutual Life Insurance Co. et al v. Viatris Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 02/15/2021 Skandia Mutual Life Insurance Co filed a Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange lawsuit against Viatris Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is J. Paul Oetken. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-01333

  • Filing Date:

    02/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

J. Paul Oetken

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

GIC Private Limited

KBC Asset Management NV

Skandia Mutual Life Insurance Co.

Lansforsakringar AB

Defendants

Rajiv Malik

Anthony Mauro

Kenneth S. Parks

Heather Bresch

James Nesta

Viatris Inc.

Mylan N.V.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Daniel Hume

Attorney at Kirby McInerney

250 Park Avenue, Suite 820

New York, NY 10177

 

Court Documents

#27

#26

#25

#24

#23

#22

#21

#20

#19

#18

#17

#16

#15

#14

#13

#12

#11

#10

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) STIPULATION AND ORDER, IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and among the parties, through their undersigned counsel, that: 1. Defendants will respond to Plaintiffs' complaint on or before April 28, 2021. 2. The Parties will continue to meet and confer regarding a schedule for further proceedings in this Action. 3. This Stipulation and Order is entered without prejudice to any position, claim, or defense any party may assert with respect to any pleading or dispositive motion, including but not limited to a motion to dismiss. This stipulation may be signed in counterparts and by email via PDF. IT IS SO STIPULATED. Heather Bresch answer due 4/28/2021; Rajiv Malik answer due 4/28/2021; Anthony Mauro answer due 4/28/2021; James Nesta answer due 4/28/2021; Kenneth S. Parks answer due 4/28/2021. (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 3/12/2021) (kv) (Entered: 03/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Viatris Inc...(Leraris, Rory) (Entered: 03/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Heather Bresch, Rajiv Malik, Anthony Mauro, James Nesta, Kenneth S. Parks, Viatris Inc...(Leraris, Rory) (Entered: 03/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (laq) (Entered: 02/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge J. Paul Oetken. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (laq) (Entered: 02/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • DocketCASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:16-cv-07926-JPO. Notice of Assignment to follow. (laq) (Entered: 02/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Viatris Inc.. (sj) (Entered: 02/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Rajiv Malik. (sj) (Entered: 02/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Kenneth S. Parks. (sj) (Entered: 02/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to James Nesta. (sj) (Entered: 02/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 02/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by GIC Private Limited, KBC Asset Management NV, Lnsfrskringar AB, Skandia Global Funds PLC..(Hume, Daniel) (Entered: 02/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 1:16-cv-07926-JPO. Document filed by GIC Private Limited, KBC Asset Management NV, Lnsfrskringar AB, Skandia Global Funds PLC..(Hume, Daniel) (Entered: 02/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Hume, Daniel) (Entered: 02/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Anthony Mauro, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by GIC Private Limited, KBC Asset Management NV, Lnsfrskringar AB, Skandia Global Funds PLC..(Hume, Daniel) (Entered: 02/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Heather Bresch, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by GIC Private Limited, KBC Asset Management NV, Lnsfrskringar AB, Skandia Global Funds PLC..(Hume, Daniel) (Entered: 02/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to James Nesta, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by GIC Private Limited, KBC Asset Management NV, Lnsfrskringar AB, Skandia Global Funds PLC..(Hume, Daniel) (Entered: 02/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Kenneth S. Parks, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by GIC Private Limited, KBC Asset Management NV, Lnsfrskringar AB, Skandia Global Funds PLC..(Hume, Daniel) (Entered: 02/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Rajiv Malik, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by GIC Private Limited, KBC Asset Management NV, Lnsfrskringar AB, Skandia Global Funds PLC..(Hume, Daniel) (Entered: 02/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Viatris Inc. f/k/a Mylan N.V., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by GIC Private Limited, KBC Asset Management NV, Lnsfrskringar AB, Skandia Global Funds PLC..(Hume, Daniel) (Entered: 02/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Heather Bresch, Rajiv Malik, Anthony Mauro, James Nesta, Kenneth S. Parks, Viatris Inc. F/K/A Mylan N.V.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-23947152)Document filed by KBC Asset Management NV, Lnsfrskringar AB, GIC Private Limited, Skandia Global Funds PLC..(Hume, Daniel) (Entered: 02/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where VIATRIS INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where KBC Asset Management N.V. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Daniel Hume