This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/30/2021 at 10:26:42 (UTC).

Skakun v. Turner Industries Group, L.L.C.

Case Summary

On 01/29/2021 Skakun filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Turner Industries Group, L L C. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is George C Hanks, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-CV-00307

  • Filing Date:

    01/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

George C Hanks, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

OcTavia Skakun

Defendant

Turner Industries Group, L.L.C.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Rashon Maurice Murrill

Attorney at Kolodny Law Firm PLLC

1011 Augusta Dr, Suite 111

Houston, TX 77057

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

8 #1

Exhibit A

8 #2

Proposed Order

#9

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER granting #8 Motion to Stay.(Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(ShoshanaArnow, 4) (Entered: 02/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Agreed MOTION to Stay Proceedings and to Proceed with Arbitration by OcTavia Skakun, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/8/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Murrill, Rashon) (Entered: 02/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER (Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(gclair, 4) (Entered: 02/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER on Initial Discovery Protocols for Employment Cases Alleging Adverse Action.(Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(gclair, 4) (Entered: 02/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 6/17/2021 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 600 in Houston before Magistrate Judge Andrew M Edison. (Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(JosephWellsadi, 4) (Entered: 02/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Turner Industries Group, L.L.C. served on 2/1/2021, answer due 2/22/2021, filed.(Murrill, Rashon) (Entered: 02/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Turner Industries Group, L.L.C.. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(ShadiaNash, 4) (Entered: 02/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Request for Issuance of Summons as to Turner Industries Group, L.L.C., filed.(Murrill, Rashon) (Entered: 01/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Turner Industries Group, L.L.C. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0541-25890749) filed by OcTavia Skakun. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Murrill, Rashon) (Entered: 01/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Turner Industries Group, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Rashon Maurice Murrill