This case was last updated from PACER on 02/03/2020 at 08:20:35 (UTC).

Skagit County v. JUUL Labs Inc et al

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 Skagit County filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against JUUL Labs Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is William H. Orrick. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-08000

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

William H. Orrick

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Skagit County

Defendants

Pax Labs Inc

Altria Group Inc.

Nu Mark Innovations Ltd

Altria Group Distribution Company

Altria Client Services

JUUL Labs Inc

Nu Mark LLC

Eonsmoke LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Dean N Kawamoto

Attorney at KELLER ROHRBACK LLP (WA)

1201 3Rd Ave, Ste 3200

Seattle, WA 98101-3052

Derek W. Loeser

Attorney at Keller Rohrback, L.L.P.

1201 Third Avenue, Suite 3200

Seattle, WA 98101

Richard Alan Weyrich

Attorney at SKAGIT COUNTY PROSECUTOR'S OFFICE

605 S 3Rd St, Courthouse Annex

Mt Vernon, WA 98273

Felicia Craick

Attorney at KELLER ROHRBACK LLP (WA)

1201 3Rd Ave, Ste 3200

Seattle, WA 98101-3052

Gretchen Freeman Cappio

Attorney at Keller Rohrback, LLP

1201 Third Avenue, Suite 3200

Seattle, WA 98101-3052

Melinda Miller

Attorney at SKAGIT COUNTY PROSECUTOR'S OFFICE

605 S 3Rd St, Courthouse Annex

Mt Vernon, WA 98273

Alison Gaffney

Attorney at KELLER ROHRBACK LLP (WA)

1201 3Rd Ave, Ste 3200

Seattle, WA 98101-3052

 

Court Documents

1 #2

Summons

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Altria Client Services, Altria Group Distribution Company, Altria Group, Inc., Eonsmoke LLC, Juul Labs, Inc. f/k/a Pax Labs, Inc., Nu Mark Innovations, Ltd., Nu Mark LLC, PAX Labs, Inc. with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # 0981-6014508) Attorney Derek W Loeser added to party Skagit County(pty:pla), filed by Skagit County. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Loeser, Derek) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Related Case(s) 19-1600; 19-1664; 19-1814, by Plaintiff Skagit County. (Loeser, Derek) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

#3

(#3) Summons Electronically Issued as to defendants JUUL Labs Inc, PAX Labs Inc, Eonsmoke LLC, Altria Group Inc, Altria Client Services, Altria Group Distribution Company, Nu Mark LLC, and Nu Mark Innovations Ltd. (GT) (Entered: 11/19/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#4

(#4) MDL 2913 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-14); In re Juul Labs, Inc., Marketing, Sales Practices, and Products Liability Litigation; Northern District of California; assigned to Judge Williams H. Orrick, III. (PM) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

#5

(#5) Case transferred in from District of Washington Western; Case Number 2:19-cv-01866. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 12/06/2019)

5 #1

*Restricted*

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/05/2019
  • MEMBER CASE OPENED: Washington Western, 2:19-cv-01866-RSL, Skagit County, Opened in California Northern District as 3:19-cv-8000-WHO pursuant to Conditional Transfer Order 14 cc: JPMDL (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2019) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Case transferred in from District of Washington Western; Case Number 2:19-cv-01866. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MDL 2913 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-14); In re Juul Labs, Inc., Marketing, Sales Practices, and Products Liability Litigation; Northern District of California; assigned to Judge Williams H. Orrick, III. (PM) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons Electronically Issued as to defendants JUUL Labs Inc, PAX Labs Inc, Eonsmoke LLC, Altria Group Inc, Altria Client Services, Altria Group Distribution Company, Nu Mark LLC, and Nu Mark Innovations Ltd. (GT) (Entered: 11/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • Judge Robert S. Lasnik added. (GT) (Entered: 11/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Related Case(s) 19-1600; 19-1664; 19-1814, by Plaintiff Skagit County. (Loeser, Derek) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Altria Client Services, Altria Group Distribution Company, Altria Group, Inc., Eonsmoke LLC, Juul Labs, Inc. f/k/a Pax Labs, Inc., Nu Mark Innovations, Ltd., Nu Mark LLC, PAX Labs, Inc. with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # 0981-6014508) Attorney Derek W Loeser added to party Skagit County(pty:pla), filed by Skagit County. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Loeser, Derek) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.