This case was last updated from PACER on 10/06/2020 at 08:31:27 (UTC).

Sjaardema v. Monsanto Company

Case Summary

On 08/07/2020 Sjaardema filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Monsanto Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Iowa Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Celeste F. Bremer and John A. Jarvey. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-CV-00249

  • Filing Date:

    08/07/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Iowa Southern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Celeste F. Bremer

Presiding Judge

John A. Jarvey

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Eugene Sjaardema

Defendant

Monsanto Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

James H. Cook

Attorney at DUTTON DANIELS HINES KALKHOFF COOK & SWANSON PLC

3151 Brockway, P.O. Box 810

Waterloo, IA 50701

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-230) to the United States District Court for the Northern District of California MDL No. 2741 (don) (Entered: 09/01/2020)

#5

(#5) Certified Conditional Transfer Order MDL No. 2741 for the Northern District of California. (kjw) (Entered: 08/27/2020)

#2

(#2) Letter to MDL Panel regarding Potential Tag-Along Action. Emailed Docket sheet, complaint and letter to the MDL Panel. (kjw) (Entered: 08/10/2020)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Monsanto Company Filing fee paid in the amount of $ 400, receipt number 0863-4211928., filed by Eugene Sjaardema. Notice of Dismissal for lack of Service deadline set for 11/5/2020. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 11/5/2020. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Cook, James) (Entered: 08/07/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/31/2020
  • Docket***Civil Case Terminated. Extraction of Case to the Northern District of California (don) (Entered: 09/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-230) to the United States District Court for the Northern District of California MDL No. 2741 (don) (Entered: 09/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Certified Conditional Transfer Order MDL No. 2741 for the Northern District of California. (kjw) (Entered: 08/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • Docket(#4) TEXT MINUTE ORDER - TO INVOLVED CLERKS - Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-230) Finalized on 8/26/20. Please see pleading (3 in ALM/2:20-cv-00587, 3 in ALM/2:20-cv-00588, 3 in ALM/2:20-cv-00589, 3 in ALN/2:20-cv-01087, 3 in CAC/8:20-cv-01485, 3 in FLM/8:20-cv-01750, 3 in IAS/4:20-cv-00249, 3 in IAS/4:20-cv-00250, 3 in KYE/3:20-cv-00062, 3 in MA/3:20-cv-30118, 1976 in MDL No. 2741, 3 in MOE/4:20-cv-00322, 3 in NE/8:20-cv-00322, 3 in NYE/2:20-cv-03002, 3 in NYW/1:20-cv-01068, 3 in NYW/6:20-cv-06588, 3 in OHN/3:20-cv-01783, 3 in PAE/2:20-cv-03131, 3 in WVN/1:20-cv-00198). As stipulated in Rule 7.1(c) of the Rules of Procedure of the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, transmittal of the order has been stayed 7 days to give any party an opportunity to oppose the transfer. The 7-day period has now elapsed, no opposition was received, and the order is directed to the Clerk of the United States District Court for the N.D. California for filing. The Panel governing statute, 28 U.S.C. 1407, requires that the transferee clerk transmit a certified copy of the Panel order to transfer to the clerk of the district court from which the action is being transferred. Signed by Clerk of the Panel John W. Nichols on 8/26/2020.Associated Cases: MDL No. 2741, ALM/2:20-cv-00587, ALM/2:20-cv-00588, ALM/2:20-cv-00589, ALN/2:20-cv-01087, CAC/8:20-cv-01485, FLM/8:20-cv-01750, IAS/4:20-cv-00249, IAS/4:20-cv-00250, KYE/3:20-cv-00062, MA/3:20-cv-30118, MOE/4:20-cv-00322, NE/8:20-cv-00322, NYE/2:20-cv-03002, NYW/1:20-cv-01068, NYW/6:20-cv-06588, OHN/3:20-cv-01783, PAE/2:20-cv-03131, WVN/1:20-cv-00198 (CMD) (kjw) (Entered: 08/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet Note: Counsel should download the attached summons and/or corporate disclosure packet, if applicable. In compliance with Rule 4 of the Rules of Civil Procedure for summons and Local Rule 7.1 for the disclosure statements. (Attachments: #1 Corporate Disclosure Packet) (don) (Entered: 08/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Letter to MDL Panel regarding Potential Tag-Along Action. Emailed Docket sheet, complaint and letter to the MDL Panel. (kjw) (Entered: 08/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Monsanto Company Filing fee paid in the amount of $ 400, receipt number 0863-4211928., filed by Eugene Sjaardema. Notice of Dismissal for lack of Service deadline set for 11/5/2020. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 11/5/2020. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Cook, James) (Entered: 08/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less