This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/19/2019 at 07:52:57 (UTC).

Sizemore v. Wexford Health Services et al

Case Summary

On 06/20/2019 Sizemore filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against Wexford Health Services. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Central District. The Judge overseeing this case is Colin Stirling Bruce. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-01210

  • Filing Date:

    06/20/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

  • Courthouse:

    Illinois Central District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Colin Stirling Bruce

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Quincy Sizemore

Canton, IL 61520

Defendants

Jane Doe

Illinois Department of Corrections

John Doe

. Meaker

Justin Hammers

. Osmundson

Wexford Health Services

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF SERVICE and Notice of Lawsuit sent to Dr. Osmundson on 8/16/2019. (KE, ilcd) (Entered: 08/16/2019)

#9

(#9) HIPAA QUALIFIED PROTECTIVE ORDER entered by Judge Harold A. Baker on 8/16/2019. See written order. (KE, ilcd) (Entered: 08/16/2019)

#8

(#8) MERIT REVIEW AND CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER entered by Judge Harold A. Baker on 8/16/2019. Pursuant to its merit review of the Complaint under 28 U.S.C. Sec 1915A, the court finds that the plaintiff states an Eighth Amendment claim for deliberate indifference to a serious medical need against Defendant Dr. Osmundson and the Doe defendants. Any additional claims shall not be included in the case, except at the court's discretion on motion by a party for good cause shown or pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 15. The clerk is directed to enter the standard qualified protective order pursuant to the Health Insurance Portability and Accountability Act. The clerk is directed to terminate Wexford Health Services, Illinois Department of Corrections, Meaker, and Justin Hammers as Defendants. The clerk is directed to attempt service on Defendant Dr. Osmundson pursuant to the standard procedures. See written order. Rule 16 Deadline 10/15/2019. (KE, ilcd) (Entered: 08/16/2019)

#7

(#7) PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 8/8/2019 10:14:06 AM ]. File Size [ 1880 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:03:55 ]. (admin). (Entered: 08/08/2019)

#6

(#6) Telephone WRIT issued for Quincy Sizemore on 8/8/2019 at 10:20 AM for a Merit Review Hearing before Judge Baker. (KE, ilcd) (Entered: 07/17/2019)

#5

(#5) Letter from Quincy Sizemore with filing fee enclosed. (KM, ilcd) (Entered: 07/03/2019)

#4

(#4) Letter from plaintiff Quincy Sizemore advising payment of filing fee. (No check was enclosed with letter.) (KM, ilcd) (Entered: 06/26/2019)

#3

(#3) Remark: IFP form attached. (SAG, ilcd) (Entered: 06/20/2019)

2 #1

Notice Regarding Privacy Issues

#2

(#2) NOTICE OF CASE OPENING. Please be advised that your case has been assigned to Judge Colin Stirling Bruce. Effective immediately, all documents should be mailed or scanned to the Urbana Division, 201 S Vine Street, Urbana, IL 61802.Merit Review Deadline set for 7/10/2019. (Attachments: #1 Notice Regarding Privacy Issues)(SAG, ilcd) (Entered: 06/20/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Quincy Sizemore.(SAG, ilcd) (Entered: 06/20/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF SERVICE and Notice of Lawsuit sent to Dr. Osmundson on 8/16/2019. (KE, ilcd) (Entered: 08/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) HIPAA QUALIFIED PROTECTIVE ORDER entered by Judge Harold A. Baker on 8/16/2019. See written order. (KE, ilcd) (Entered: 08/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MERIT REVIEW AND CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER entered by Judge Harold A. Baker on 8/16/2019. Pursuant to its merit review of the Complaint under 28 U.S.C. Sec 1915A, the court finds that the plaintiff states an Eighth Amendment claim for deliberate indifference to a serious medical need against Defendant Dr. Osmundson and the Doe defendants. Any additional claims shall not be included in the case, except at the court's discretion on motion by a party for good cause shown or pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 15. The clerk is directed to enter the standard qualified protective order pursuant to the Health Insurance Portability and Accountability Act. The clerk is directed to terminate Wexford Health Services, Illinois Department of Corrections, Meaker, and Justin Hammers as Defendants. The clerk is directed to attempt service on Defendant Dr. Osmundson pursuant to the standard procedures. See written order. Rule 16 Deadline 10/15/2019. (KE, ilcd) (Entered: 08/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2019
  • Minute Entry for proceedings held 8/8/2019 before Judge Harold A. Baker. Appearance of the Plaintiff pro se. Merit Review Hearing held by telephone. Allegations of the Complaint discussed. Written Order to be entered. (Tape #UR-C 10:14 AM.) (DS, ilcd) (Entered: 08/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 8/8/2019 10:14:06 AM ]. File Size [ 1880 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:03:55 ]. (admin). (Entered: 08/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Telephone WRIT issued for Quincy Sizemore on 8/8/2019 at 10:20 AM for a Merit Review Hearing before Judge Baker. (KE, ilcd) (Entered: 07/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • TEXT ORDER entered by Judge Harold A. Baker on 7/17/2019. A merit review hearing is set for August 8, 2019, at 10:20 a.m., by telephone conference call from Urbana. The clerk is directed to issue a writ to insure plaintiff's appearance at this merit review hearing. (KE, ilcd) (Entered: 07/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 24626008798 (KE, ilcd) (Entered: 07/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Letter from Quincy Sizemore with filing fee enclosed. (KM, ilcd) (Entered: 07/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Letter from plaintiff Quincy Sizemore advising payment of filing fee. (No check was enclosed with letter.) (KM, ilcd) (Entered: 06/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Remark: IFP form attached. (SAG, ilcd) (Entered: 06/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • TEXT ORDER entered by Judge Colin Stirling Bruce on 6/20/2019. Plaintiff has filed a Complaint but has not paid the $400 filing fee nor filed a petition to proceed in forma pauperis. Within 21 days of the entry of this order, Plaintiff must pay the $400 filing fee in full or file a petition to proceed in forma pauperis with attached trust fund ledgers for the last 6 months. Failure to comply without good cause will result in dismissal of this case without prejudice, and the Plaintiff will still be responsible for payment of the filing fee. See 28 U.S.C. Sec. 1914. The Clerk is directed to send Plaintiff the forms for proceeding in forma pauperis. (SAG, ilcd) (Entered: 06/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE OF CASE OPENING. Please be advised that your case has been assigned to Judge Colin Stirling Bruce. Effective immediately, all documents should be mailed or scanned to the Urbana Division, 201 S Vine Street, Urbana, IL 61802.Merit Review Deadline set for 7/10/2019. (Attachments: #1 Notice Regarding Privacy Issues)(SAG, ilcd) (Entered: 06/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Quincy Sizemore.(SAG, ilcd) (Entered: 06/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Osmundson is a litigant

Latest cases where WEXFORD HEALTH SERVICES is a litigant

Latest cases where Illinois Department of Corrections is a litigant