Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 07/13/2020 at 12:09:52 (UTC).

Six Hogs, LLC v. Doe et al

Case Summary

On 03/26/2020 Six Hogs, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Doe. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arkansas Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Kristine G. Baker. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-CV-00338

  • Filing Date:

    03/26/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Arkansas Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Kristine G. Baker

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant

Six Hogs LLC

Defendants and Counter Claimants

John Doe

Samsonico USA LLC

John Doe doing business as Samsonico International Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

William L. Montague, Jr.

Attorney at Montague Law PLLC

110 West Vine Street, Suite 300

Lexington, KY 40507

George David McClure, Jr.

Attorney at Attorney at Law

101 Ashlawn Court

Huntsville, AL 35806

Richard Blakely Glasgow

Attorney at Wright, Lindsey & Jennings

200 West Capitol Avenue, Suite 2300

Little Rock, AR 72201-3699

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

James M. Francis

Attorney at Francis Law Firm

4071 Tates Creek Centre Drive, Suite 304

Lexington, KY 40517

Joseph Davidson Calhoun, III

Attorney at Calhoun Law Firm

Post Office Box 251504

Little Rock, AR 72225

 

Court Documents

37 #1

Brief in Support of Motion

#37

(#37) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Six Hogs LLC (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Motion)(Montague, William) (Entered: 05/22/2020)

#36

(#36) Defendants' ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, First COUNTERCLAIM against Six Hogs LLC by Samsonico USA LLC.(Calhoun, Joseph) (Docket text modified on 5/4/2020 to indicate the Counterclaim is filed against Plaintiff and to remove the reference to a Jury Demand.) (thd). (Entered: 05/01/2020)

#35

(#35) INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference to occur by 6/29/2020; Rule 26(f) Report due by 7/13/2020; Bench Trial set for sometime during the week of 6/7/2021 at 09:00 AM in Little Rock Courtroom # 4C before Judge Kristine G. Baker. Signed at the direction of the Court on 04/30/2020. (tmw) (Entered: 04/30/2020)

#34

(#34) ORDER granting #31 motion to withdraw James M. Francis as counsel of record for Samsonico; directing the Clerk of Court to terminate Mr. Francis as counsel of record for Samsonico; and denying #27 Samsonico's motion for leave to conduct jurisdictional discovery on an expedited basis, and motion for extension of time to respond to complaint. Samsonico may file a new motion for an extension of time to respond to the complaint in compliance with the Local Rules. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 4/29/2020. (jbh) (Entered: 04/29/2020)

33 #2

Exhibit B - Counsel correspondence (04-10-20)

33 #1

Exhibit A - Counsel correspondence (01-09-20)

#31

(#31) MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Samsonico USA LLC and John Doe dba Samsonico International Inc. (Calhoun, Joseph) (Docket text modified on 4/23/2020 to correct the description of the document filed) (jak) (Entered: 04/23/2020)

#27

(#33) RESPONSE in Opposition re #27 MOTION for Leave to File Conduct Jurisdictional Discovery on an Expedited Basis, and Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint filed by Six Hogs LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Counsel correspondence (01-09-20), #2 Exhibit B - Counsel correspondence (04-10-20))(Montague, William) (Entered: 04/27/2020)

#5

(#5) FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Six Hogs, LLC. (Montague, William) [Transferred from kyed on 3/26/2020.] (Entered: 01/04/2020)

#6

(#6) REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding re #1 Complaint cc: form e-mailed to Register. (MM) [Transferred from kyed on 3/26/2020.] (Entered: 01/06/2020)

#3

(#3) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY RE: FAILURE TO FILE FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURES to counsel of record, William L. Montague, Jr.. #1 Complaint has been filed by Six Hogs, LLC without the required Rule 7.1 Disclosure statement. Rule 7.1 Disclosures must be filed within fourteen (14) calendar days. Failure to file the Disclosure Statement will cause the case to be submitted to the presiding judge for further action. cc: COR (MM) [Transferred from kyed on 3/26/2020.] (Entered: 01/03/2020)

2 #1

Summons Samsonico USA LLC

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to John Doe, Samsonico USA LLC; Summons issued and returned to counsel electronically (Attachments: #1 Summons Samsonico USA LLC)(MM) [Transferred from kyed on 3/26/2020.] (Entered: 01/03/2020)

1 #3

Summons Samsonico USA LLC

1 #2

Summons John Doe dba Samsonico International Inc.

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#36) Defendants' ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, First COUNTERCLAIM against Six Hogs LLC by Samsonico USA LLC.(Calhoun, Joseph) (Docket text modified on 5/4/2020 to indicate the Counterclaim is filed against Plaintiff and to remove the reference to a Jury Demand.) (thd). (Entered: 05/01/2020)

44 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#37) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Six Hogs LLC (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Motion)(Montague, William) (Entered: 05/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #36 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to indicate the Counterclaim is filed against Plaintiff Six Hogs LLC and to remove the reference to a Jury Demand. (thd) (Entered: 05/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) Defendants' ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, First COUNTERCLAIM against Six Hogs LLC by Samsonico USA LLC.(Calhoun, Joseph) (Docket text modified on 5/4/2020 to indicate the Counterclaim is filed against Plaintiff and to remove the reference to a Jury Demand.) (thd). (Entered: 05/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference to occur by 6/29/2020; Rule 26(f) Report due by 7/13/2020; Bench Trial set for sometime during the week of 6/7/2021 at 09:00 AM in Little Rock Courtroom # 4C before Judge Kristine G. Baker. Signed at the direction of the Court on 04/30/2020. (tmw) (Entered: 04/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) ORDER granting #31 motion to withdraw James M. Francis as counsel of record for Samsonico; directing the Clerk of Court to terminate Mr. Francis as counsel of record for Samsonico; and denying #27 Samsonico's motion for leave to conduct jurisdictional discovery on an expedited basis, and motion for extension of time to respond to complaint. Samsonico may file a new motion for an extension of time to respond to the complaint in compliance with the Local Rules. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 4/29/2020. (jbh) (Entered: 04/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) RESPONSE in Opposition re #27 MOTION for Leave to File Conduct Jurisdictional Discovery on an Expedited Basis, and Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint filed by Six Hogs LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Counsel correspondence (01-09-20), #2 Exhibit B - Counsel correspondence (04-10-20))(Montague, William) (Entered: 04/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #31 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to correct the description of the document filed pursuant to the attached correspondence. (jak) (Entered: 04/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Samsonico USA LLC and John Doe dba Samsonico International Inc. (Calhoun, Joseph) (Docket text modified on 4/23/2020 to correct the description of the document filed) (jak) (Entered: 04/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) NOTICE of Appearance by George David McClure, Jr on behalf of Six Hogs LLC (McClure, George) (Entered: 04/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) ORDER granting #26 joint motion for enlargement of time; and extending defendants' deadline to file a response to plaintiff Six Hogs, LLC's complaint until and including 5/1/2020. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 4/15/2020. (jbh) (Entered: 04/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
19 More Docket Entries
  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by John Doe, Samsonico USA LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Francis, James) [Transferred from kyed on 3/26/2020.] (Entered: 02/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by John Doe, Samsonico USA LLC. (Francis, James) [Transferred from kyed on 3/26/2020.] (Entered: 02/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Six Hogs, LLC via personal service to John Doe served on 1/21/2020, answer due 2/11/2020. (Montague, William) [Transferred from kyed on 3/26/2020.] (Entered: 01/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Six Hogs, LLC via personal service on registered agent to Samsonico USA LLC served on 1/21/2020, answer due 2/11/2020. (Montague, William) [Transferred from kyed on 3/26/2020.] (Entered: 01/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Six Hogs, LLC. (Montague, William) [Transferred from kyed on 3/26/2020.] (Entered: 01/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding re #1 Complaint cc: form e-mailed to Register. (MM) [Transferred from kyed on 3/26/2020.] (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • DocketConflict Check run. (MM) [Transferred from kyed on 3/26/2020.] (Entered: 01/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY RE: FAILURE TO FILE FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURES to counsel of record, William L. Montague, Jr.. #1 Complaint has been filed by Six Hogs, LLC without the required Rule 7.1 Disclosure statement. Rule 7.1 Disclosures must be filed within fourteen (14) calendar days. Failure to file the Disclosure Statement will cause the case to be submitted to the presiding judge for further action. cc: COR (MM) [Transferred from kyed on 3/26/2020.] (Entered: 01/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to John Doe, Samsonico USA LLC; Summons issued and returned to counsel electronically (Attachments: #1 Summons Samsonico USA LLC)(MM) [Transferred from kyed on 3/26/2020.] (Entered: 01/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4558984), filed by Six Hogs, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons John Doe dba Samsonico International Inc., #3 Summons Samsonico USA LLC)(MM) [Transferred from kyed on 3/26/2020.] (Entered: 01/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Joseph Davidson Calhoun, III(Designation Retained)

Latest cases represented by Lawyer James M. Francis