This case was last updated from PACER on 08/19/2019 at 08:16:20 (UTC).

Sivak v. Doe

Case Summary

On 06/20/2019 Sivak filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Doe. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Idaho District. The Judge overseeing this case is David C. Nye. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-00234

  • Filing Date:

    06/20/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

David C. Nye

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Lacey Sivak

Boise, ID 83707

Defendant

John Doe

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) REQUEST to proceed without payment of costs re #8 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis,, filed by Lacey Sivak. (alw) (Entered: 08/13/2019)

13 #1

USCA instructions

#13

(#13) ORDER of USCA 19-35652 as to #10 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal, filed by Lacey Sivak (Attachments: #1 USCA instructions)(jd)

12 #1

Guide to USCA

#12

(#12) USCA TIME SCHEDULE ORDER 19-35652 as to #10 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal, filed by Lacey Sivak. (Notice sent by e-mail to Court Reporter) (Attachments: #1 Guide to USCA)(jd) (Entered: 08/05/2019)

#11

(#11) USCA Case Number 19-35652 for #10 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal, filed by Lacey Sivak. (jd) (Entered: 08/05/2019)

#10

(#10) Notice of Appeal/Incorporated Brief of 24 July 2019 D.C.N. - NOTICE OF INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL as to #8 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, by Lacey Sivak. Filing fee $ 505. (Notice sent to Court Reporter & 9th Cir) (jd)

#9

(#9) SUPPLEMENTAL DATA of 22 July 2019 for case, by Plaintiff Lacey Sivak. (jd) (Entered: 07/26/2019)

#8

(#8) ORDER DENYING IN FORMA PAUPERIS APPLICATION. IT IS ORDERED: Plaintiffs Application to Proceed in Forma Pauperis (Dkt. #6 ) is DENIED. Within 14 days after entry of this Order, Plaintiff must either pay the $400 filing fee or establish imminent danger of serious physical injury. IfPlaintiff does not pay the fee and fails to show imminent danger, the Courtwill dismiss this case without further notice. Signed by Judge David C. Nye. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (km)

#7

RESTRICTED

6 #1

Motion to proceed w/out cost to Petitioner

#6

(#6) Prisoner Application to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Lacey Sivak. Responses due by 8/7/2019 (Attachments: #1 Motion to proceed w/out cost to Petitioner)(jd)

5 #2

Supplemental Data

5 #1

Cover Letter

#5

(#5) MOTION for prompt intervention and action on /exparte by Plaintiff Lacey Sivak. Responses due by 8/7/2019 (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Supplemental Data)(jd)

#4

(#4) MOTION to join the United States as a co-plaintiff by Plaintiff Lacey Sivak. Responses due by 7/26/2019 (alw) (Entered: 07/08/2019)

#3

(#3) MOTION for court order to preserve property belonging to plaintiff by Plaintiff Lacey Sivak. Responses due by 7/26/2019 (alw) (Entered: 07/08/2019)

#2

(#2) ORDER of Conditional Filing - (jd)

45 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) REQUEST to proceed without payment of costs re #8 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis,, filed by Lacey Sivak. (alw) (Entered: 08/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) ORDER of USCA 19-35652 as to #10 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal, filed by Lacey Sivak (Attachments: #1 USCA instructions)(jd)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) USCA TIME SCHEDULE ORDER 19-35652 as to #10 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal, filed by Lacey Sivak. (Notice sent by e-mail to Court Reporter) (Attachments: #1 Guide to USCA)(jd) (Entered: 08/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) USCA Case Number 19-35652 for #10 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal, filed by Lacey Sivak. (jd) (Entered: 08/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Notice of Appeal/Incorporated Brief of 24 July 2019 D.C.N. - NOTICE OF INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL as to #8 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, by Lacey Sivak. Filing fee $ 505. (Notice sent to Court Reporter & 9th Cir) (jd)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) SUPPLEMENTAL DATA of 22 July 2019 for case, by Plaintiff Lacey Sivak. (jd) (Entered: 07/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER DENYING IN FORMA PAUPERIS APPLICATION. IT IS ORDERED: Plaintiffs Application to Proceed in Forma Pauperis (Dkt. #6 ) is DENIED. Within 14 days after entry of this Order, Plaintiff must either pay the $400 filing fee or establish imminent danger of serious physical injury. IfPlaintiff does not pay the fee and fails to show imminent danger, the Courtwill dismiss this case without further notice. Signed by Judge David C. Nye. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (km)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account, This is a sealed document. re #6 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Lacey Sivak. (jd)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Prisoner Application to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Lacey Sivak. Responses due by 8/7/2019 (Attachments: #1 Motion to proceed w/out cost to Petitioner)(jd)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MOTION for prompt intervention and action on /exparte by Plaintiff Lacey Sivak. Responses due by 8/7/2019 (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Supplemental Data)(jd)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MOTION to join the United States as a co-plaintiff by Plaintiff Lacey Sivak. Responses due by 7/26/2019 (alw) (Entered: 07/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) MOTION for court order to preserve property belonging to plaintiff by Plaintiff Lacey Sivak. Responses due by 7/26/2019 (alw) (Entered: 07/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) ORDER of Conditional Filing - (jd)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Prisoner COMPLAINT against John Doe, filed by Lacey Sivak. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A, #2 Appendix B, #3 Appendix C, #4 Appendix D, #5 Appendix E, #6 Appendix F, #7 Appendix G, #8 Appendix H, #9 Appendix I, #10 Appendix J, #11 Appendix K, #12 Appendix L, #13 Appendix M, #14 Appendix N, #15 Appendix O, #16 Appendix P, #17 Appendix Q, #18 Appendix R, #19 Appendix S, #20 Appendix T, #21 Appendix U, #22 Appendix V, #23 Appendix W, #24 Appendix X, #25 Appendix Y, #26 Appendix Z, #27 Appendix AA, #28 Appendix BB, #29 Appendix CC, #30 Appendix DD, #31 Appendix EE, #32 Appendix FF, #33 Appendix GG)(jd) (Entered: 06/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less