This case was last updated from PACER on 02/15/2020 at 08:17:47 (UTC).

Sisvel International S.A. et al v. Tesla, Inc.

Case Summary

On 12/17/2019 Sisvel International S A filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Tesla, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Delaware District. The Judge overseeing this case is Maryellen Noreika. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-02288

  • Filing Date:

    12/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Delaware District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Maryellen Noreika

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Sisvel International S.A.

3G Licensing S.A.

Defendant

Tesla, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Timothy Devlin

Attorney at Devlin Law Firm LLC

1526 Gilpin Avenue

Wilmington, DE 19806

Neil A. Benchell

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to ANSWER Complaint to March 11, 2020 - filed by 3G Licensing S.A., Sisvel International S.A.. (Devlin, Timothy) (Entered: 01/29/2020)

#8

(#8) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Neil Benchell - filed by Sisvel International S.A.. (Devlin, Timothy) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

#7

(#7) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to ANSWER Complaint to February 10, 2020 - filed by Sisvel International S.A.. (Devlin, Timothy) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sisvel International S.A., 3G Licensing S.A.. Tesla, Inc. served on 12/18/2019, answer due 1/8/2020. (Devlin, Timothy) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

#5

(#5) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Sisvel International S.A. for 3G Licensing S.A. filed by 3G Licensing S.A., Sisvel International S.A.. (Devlin, Timothy) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

#4

(#4) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Fineur International S.A. for Sisvel International S.A. filed by 3G Licensing S.A., Sisvel International S.A.. (Devlin, Timothy) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

#3

(#3) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) See Attached. (myr) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

#2

(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (myr) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

1 #13

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #10

Exhibit 10

1 #9

Exhibit 9

1 #8

Exhibit 8

1 #7

Exhibit 7

1 #6

Exhibit 6

1 #5

Exhibit 5

1 #2

Exhibit 2

1 #1

Exhibit 1

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT filed with Jury Demand against Tesla, Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 311-2804179.) - filed by Sisvel International S.A., 3G Licensing S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Civil Cover Sheet)(myr) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSO ORDERED re #9 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to ANSWER Complaint to March 11, 2020 (Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Tesla, Inc. answer due 3/11/2020). ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 1/29/2020. (dlw) (Entered: 01/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to ANSWER Complaint to March 11, 2020 - filed by 3G Licensing S.A., Sisvel International S.A.. (Devlin, Timothy) (Entered: 01/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • DocketPro Hac Vice Attorney Neil A. Benchell for 3G Licensing S.A. and Sisvel International S.A. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (mal) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSO ORDERED re #8 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Neil Benchell filed by Sisvel International S.A. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 1/6/2020. (dlw) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSO ORDERED re #7 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to ANSWER Complaint to February 10, 2020 (Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Tesla, Inc. answer due 2/10/2020). ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 1/6/2020. (dlw) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Neil Benchell - filed by Sisvel International S.A.. (Devlin, Timothy) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to ANSWER Complaint to February 10, 2020 - filed by Sisvel International S.A.. (Devlin, Timothy) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Maryellen Noreika. Please include the initials of the Judge (MN) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb) (Entered: 12/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sisvel International S.A., 3G Licensing S.A.. Tesla, Inc. served on 12/18/2019, answer due 1/8/2020. (Devlin, Timothy) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Sisvel International S.A. for 3G Licensing S.A. filed by 3G Licensing S.A., Sisvel International S.A.. (Devlin, Timothy) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Fineur International S.A. for Sisvel International S.A. filed by 3G Licensing S.A., Sisvel International S.A.. (Devlin, Timothy) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Tesla, Inc. on 12/18/2019. Requesting party or attorney should pick up issued summons at the Help Desk, Room 4209, or call 302-573-6170 and ask the Clerk to mail the summons to them. (myr) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) See Attached. (myr) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (myr) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT filed with Jury Demand against Tesla, Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 311-2804179.) - filed by Sisvel International S.A., 3G Licensing S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Civil Cover Sheet)(myr) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.