This case was last updated from PACER on 02/04/2020 at 08:02:18 (UTC).

SISCOE v. SENEX SERVICES CORP.

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 SISCOE filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against SENEX SERVICES CORP. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Indiana Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are James Patrick Hanlon and Doris L. Pryor. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-00596

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Indiana Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James Patrick Hanlon

Referral Judge

Doris L. Pryor

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CANDY J. SISCOE

Defendant

SENEX SERVICES CORP.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

David S. Klain

Attorney at CONSUMER LAW PARTNERS, LLC

333 N. Michigan Ave., Suite 1300

Chicago, IL 60601

Samuel Louis Eirinberg

Attorney at CONSUMER LAW PARTNERS, LLC

333 N. Michigan Ave., Suite 1300

Chicago, IL 60601

 

Court Documents

1 #2

Proposed Summons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to SENEX SERVICES CORP. (RSF) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by David S. Klain on behalf of Plaintiff CANDY J. SISCOE. (Klain, David) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Settlement , as to Plaintiff CANDY J. SISCOE, Defendant SENEX SERVICES CORP., filed by CANDY J. SISCOE (Eirinberg, Samuel) (Entered: 01/20/2020)

#5

(#5) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (RSF) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Samuel Louis Eirinberg on behalf of Plaintiff CANDY J. SISCOE. (Eirinberg, Samuel) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#7

(#7) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed, filed by CANDY J. SISCOE. SENEX SERVICES CORP. waiver sent on 12/6/2019. (Eirinberg, Samuel) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

#6

(#6) PROCEDURES AND PRACTICES before Judge James Patrick Hanlon. (RSF) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

#9

(#9) Order Directing Filing of Documents Authorizing Dismissal - The Court has been advised by counsel that a settlement has been reached in this action. Therefore, all pending motions, if any, are now DENIED AS MOOT and all previously ordered dates relating to discovery, filings, schedules, conferences, and trial, if any, are VACATED. Within forty-five (45) days of the date of this entry, counsel for the Plaintiff shall file a motion to dismiss this cause and submit an order for the Courts signature ordering the dismissal of this action or a stipulation of dismissal See Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 1/21/2020.(KAA) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against SENEX SERVICES CORP., filed by CANDY J. SISCOE. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5756116) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Eirinberg, Samuel) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Order Directing Filing of Documents Authorizing Dismissal - The Court has been advised by counsel that a settlement has been reached in this action. Therefore, all pending motions, if any, are now DENIED AS MOOT and all previously ordered dates relating to discovery, filings, schedules, conferences, and trial, if any, are VACATED. Within forty-five (45) days of the date of this entry, counsel for the Plaintiff shall file a motion to dismiss this cause and submit an order for the Courts signature ordering the dismissal of this action or a stipulation of dismissal See Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 1/21/2020.(KAA) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Settlement , as to Plaintiff CANDY J. SISCOE, Defendant SENEX SERVICES CORP., filed by CANDY J. SISCOE (Eirinberg, Samuel) (Entered: 01/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed, filed by CANDY J. SISCOE. SENEX SERVICES CORP. waiver sent on 12/6/2019. (Eirinberg, Samuel) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) PROCEDURES AND PRACTICES before Judge James Patrick Hanlon. (RSF) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (RSF) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to SENEX SERVICES CORP. (RSF) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by David S. Klain on behalf of Plaintiff CANDY J. SISCOE. (Klain, David) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Samuel Louis Eirinberg on behalf of Plaintiff CANDY J. SISCOE. (Eirinberg, Samuel) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against SENEX SERVICES CORP., filed by CANDY J. SISCOE. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5756116) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Eirinberg, Samuel) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less