This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/14/2022 at 09:12:25 (UTC).

Sirleaf et al v. Immigration and Customs Enforcement et al

Case Summary

On 12/16/2021 Sirleaf filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Immigration and Customs Enforcement. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Virginia Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are M. Hannah Lauck and Elizabeth W. Hanes. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-00785

  • Filing Date:

    12/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

M. Hannah Lauck

Referral Judge

Elizabeth W. Hanes

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Theophilus Tari Agedah

Kwayee M. Tarty

Adhnanu Fahed Miri

Quacy Thorne

Roney Clavel

Kouassi Kouame

Lucson Appolon

Charles Thomas

Mikhail Shapovalov

Paul White

Randolph Richards

Festus Musa

Fazili Chancelier

Jose Susannah

Henry Giovanni

Jose O. Membreno

Thomas Nganga

Pharaoh Momolu V.S. Sirleaf, I

Bowling Green, VA 22427

Defendants

Immigration and Customs Enforcement

Seven Unknown Doe

11 More Parties Available

 

Court Documents

#23

(#23) MEMORANDUM ORDER (Directing Plaintiff to File a Particularized Complaint) - Accordingly, Plaintiff is DIRECTED, within fourteen (14) days of the date of entry hereof, to particularize his complaint in conformance with the following directions and in the order set forth in this Order. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth W. Hanes on 1/19/2022. (Copy mailed to plaintiff) (smej, ) (Entered: 01/19/2022)

22 #2

Prisoner Data Report

22 #1

*Restricted*

#22

(#22) Case transferred in from District of California Central; Case Number 2:21-cv-07975. Original file and docket sheet received. (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/16/2021: #2 Prisoner Data Report) (ldab, ). (Entered: 12/16/2021)

#21

(#21) ORDER by Judge Jesus G. Bernal Transferring Case to Eastern District of Virginia. Original file, certified copy of the transfer order and docket sheet sent. Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this action is TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia. The Clerk of Court is directed to effectuate the transfer. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.) (twdb) [Transferred from California Central on 12/16/2021.] (Entered: 12/14/2021)

#20

(#20) FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending Complaint (Prisoner Civil Rights) #1 ; JURY DEMAND, filed by Plaintiff Pharaoh Momolu V.S. Sirleaf, I(hr) [Transferred from California Central on 12/16/2021.] (Entered: 11/24/2021)

#18

(#18) RETAILATORY (sic) CONSPIRACY TO VIOLATE CAT BY ATTEMPTS TO DEPRIVE OF CIVIL RIGHT TO PETITION ALIEN TORT ACTION PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 1350 filed by Plaintiffs Theophilus Tari Agedah, Lucson Appolon, Fazili Chancelier, Roney Clavel, Henry Giovanni, Kouassi Kouame, Jose O. Membreno, Adhnanu Fahed Miri, Festus Musa, Thomas Nganga, Randolph Richards, Mikhail Shapovalov, Jose Susannah, Kwayee M. Tarty, Charles Thomas, Quacy Thorne, Pharaoh Momolu V.S. Sirleaf, I, Paul White. (hr) [Transferred from California Central on 12/16/2021.] (Entered: 10/29/2021)

#17

(#17) TORTURE VICTIM PROTECTION ACT CLASS ACTION LAWSUIT SUBPEONA DUCES TECUM OF INDISPENSIBLE HIGH PARTIES TO PLAINTIFFS' ACTION filed by Plaintiffs Theophilus Tari Agedah, Lucson Appolon, Fazili Chancelier, Roney Clavel, Henry Giovanni, Kouassi Kouame, Jose O. Membreno, Adhnanu Fahed Miri, Festus Musa, Thomas Nganga, Randolph Richards, Mikhail Shapovalov, Jose Susannah, Kwayee M. Tarty, Charles Thomas, Quacy Thorne, Pharaoh Momolu V.S. Sirleaf, I, Paul White. (hr) [Transferred from California Central on 12/16/2021.] (Entered: 10/29/2021)

#16

(#16) TORTURE VICTIM PROTECTION ACT CLASS ACTION LAWSUIT MOTION TO AMEND PLAINTIFFS TO THE ABOVE-ENTITLED ACTION (and the Motions attached thereto) filed by Plaintiffs Theophilus Tari Agedah, Lucson Appolon, Fazili Chancelier, Roney Clavel, Henry Giovanni, Kouassi Kouame, Jose O. Membreno, Adhnanu Fahed Miri, Festus Musa, Thomas Nganga, Randolph Richards, Mikhail Shapovalov, Jose Susannah, Kwayee M. Tarty, Charles Thomas, Quacy Thorne, Pharaoh Momolu V.S. Sirleaf, I, Paul White. (hr) [Transferred from California Central on 12/16/2021.] (Entered: 10/29/2021)

#9

(#9) TORTURE VICTIM PROTECTION ACT CLASS ACTION LAWSUIT MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY OR PERMANENT INJUCTION ORDERING THE DEFENDANTS TO COMPLY WITH THIS COURT'S FRAIHAT V. ICE ORDER filed by Plaintiff Pharaoh Momolu V.S. Sirleaf, I. (car) [Transferred from California Central on 12/16/2021.] (Entered: 10/06/2021)

#8

(#8) TORTURE VICTIM PROTECTION ACT CLASS ACTION LAWSUIT MOTION FOR REQUESTING FOR THE APPOINMENT OF COUNSEL TO INSTITUTE ACTION FOR INCOMPETENT PLAINTIFFS filed by Plaintiff Pharaoh Momolu V.S. Sirleaf, I. (car) [Transferred from California Central on 12/16/2021.] (Entered: 10/06/2021)

#7

(#7) TORTURE VICTIM PROTECTION ACT CLASS ACTION LAWSUIT MOTION FOR An Order allowing for the to filing Amicus Curiae Briefs in this Action filed by Plaintiff Pharaoh Momolu V.S. Sirleaf, I. (car) [Transferred from California Central on 12/16/2021.] (Entered: 10/06/2021)

#6

(#6) THE FRAIHAT 2 PLAINTIFFS EMERGENCY GRIEVANCES filed by Plaintiff Pharaoh Momolu V.S. Sirleaf, I. (car) [Transferred from California Central on 12/16/2021.] (Entered: 10/06/2021)

#5

(#5) TORTURE VICTIM PROTECTION ACT CLASS ACTION LAWSUIT FRAIHAT 2 PLAINTIFFS DECLARATION OF INCOMPETENCE TO PROSECUTE THIS ACTION PURSUANT TO THIS COURT'S FRAIHAT V. ICE DECISION filed by Plaintiff Pharaoh Momolu V.S. Sirleaf, I. (car) [Transferred from California Central on 12/16/2021.] (Entered: 10/06/2021)

#4

(#4) TORTURE VICTIM PROTECTION ACT CLASS ACTION LAWSUIT MOTION FOR SUB-CLASS CERTIFICATION PURSUANT TO THIS COURT'S FRAIHART V. ICE DECISION filed by Plaintiff Pharaoh Momolu V.S. Sirleaf, I. (car) [Transferred from California Central on 12/16/2021.] (Entered: 10/06/2021)

#3

(#3) TORTURE VICTIM PROTECTION ACT CLASS ACTION LAWSUIT MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER filed by Plaintiff Pharaoh Momolu V.S. Sirleaf, I. (car) Modified on 10/6/2021 (car). [Transferred from California Central on 12/16/2021.] (Entered: 10/06/2021)

#2

(#2) TORTURE VICTIM PROTECTION ACT CLASS ACTION LAWSUIT MOTION FOR LEAVE FOR PLAINTIFFS TO PROCEED IN FORMA PUAPERIS TO PROSECUTE THIS ACTION (with class in forma pauperis affidavit attached) PURSUANT TO THIS COURT'S FRAIHART V. ICE DECISION filed by Plaintiff Pharaoh Momolu V.S. Sirleaf, I. (car) Modified on 10/6/2021 (car). [Transferred from California Central on 12/16/2021.] (Entered: 10/06/2021)

#1

(#19) FINANCIAL ENTRY: Received $402.00 from Jose Susannah. Re: Complaint (Prisoner Civil Rights) #1 . Receipt number LA230223. (dl) [Transferred from California Central on 12/16/2021.] (Entered: 11/05/2021)

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) MEMORANDUM ORDER (Directing Plaintiff to File a Particularized Complaint) - Accordingly, Plaintiff is DIRECTED, within fourteen (14) days of the date of entry hereof, to particularize his complaint in conformance with the following directions and in the order set forth in this Order. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth W. Hanes on 1/19/2022. (Copy mailed to plaintiff) (smej, ) (Entered: 01/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • DocketNotification of transfer of 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights case from the Central District of CA Case No. 2:21cv7975 to the Eastern District of Virginia. (ldab, ) (Entered: 12/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) Case transferred in from District of California Central; Case Number 2:21-cv-07975. Original file and docket sheet received. (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/16/2021: #2 Prisoner Data Report) (ldab, ). (Entered: 12/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) ORDER by Judge Jesus G. Bernal Transferring Case to Eastern District of Virginia. Original file, certified copy of the transfer order and docket sheet sent. Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this action is TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia. The Clerk of Court is directed to effectuate the transfer. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.) (twdb) [Transferred from California Central on 12/16/2021.] (Entered: 12/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending Complaint (Prisoner Civil Rights) #1 ; JURY DEMAND, filed by Plaintiff Pharaoh Momolu V.S. Sirleaf, I(hr) [Transferred from California Central on 12/16/2021.] (Entered: 11/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) FINANCIAL ENTRY: Received $402.00 from Jose Susannah. Re: Complaint (Prisoner Civil Rights) #1 . Receipt number LA230223. (dl) [Transferred from California Central on 12/16/2021.] (Entered: 11/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) RETAILATORY (sic) CONSPIRACY TO VIOLATE CAT BY ATTEMPTS TO DEPRIVE OF CIVIL RIGHT TO PETITION ALIEN TORT ACTION PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 1350 filed by Plaintiffs Theophilus Tari Agedah, Lucson Appolon, Fazili Chancelier, Roney Clavel, Henry Giovanni, Kouassi Kouame, Jose O. Membreno, Adhnanu Fahed Miri, Festus Musa, Thomas Nganga, Randolph Richards, Mikhail Shapovalov, Jose Susannah, Kwayee M. Tarty, Charles Thomas, Quacy Thorne, Pharaoh Momolu V.S. Sirleaf, I, Paul White. (hr) [Transferred from California Central on 12/16/2021.] (Entered: 10/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) TORTURE VICTIM PROTECTION ACT CLASS ACTION LAWSUIT SUBPEONA DUCES TECUM OF INDISPENSIBLE HIGH PARTIES TO PLAINTIFFS' ACTION filed by Plaintiffs Theophilus Tari Agedah, Lucson Appolon, Fazili Chancelier, Roney Clavel, Henry Giovanni, Kouassi Kouame, Jose O. Membreno, Adhnanu Fahed Miri, Festus Musa, Thomas Nganga, Randolph Richards, Mikhail Shapovalov, Jose Susannah, Kwayee M. Tarty, Charles Thomas, Quacy Thorne, Pharaoh Momolu V.S. Sirleaf, I, Paul White. (hr) [Transferred from California Central on 12/16/2021.] (Entered: 10/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) TORTURE VICTIM PROTECTION ACT CLASS ACTION LAWSUIT MOTION TO AMEND PLAINTIFFS TO THE ABOVE-ENTITLED ACTION (and the Motions attached thereto) filed by Plaintiffs Theophilus Tari Agedah, Lucson Appolon, Fazili Chancelier, Roney Clavel, Henry Giovanni, Kouassi Kouame, Jose O. Membreno, Adhnanu Fahed Miri, Festus Musa, Thomas Nganga, Randolph Richards, Mikhail Shapovalov, Jose Susannah, Kwayee M. Tarty, Charles Thomas, Quacy Thorne, Pharaoh Momolu V.S. Sirleaf, I, Paul White. (hr) [Transferred from California Central on 12/16/2021.] (Entered: 10/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) CAT EMERGENCY WRIT OF PROHIBITION filed by Plaintiffs Theophilus Tari Agedah, Lucson Appolon, Fazili Chancelier, Roney Clavel, Henry Giovanni, Kouassi Kouame, Jose O. Membreno, Adhnanu Fahed Miri, Festus Musa, Thomas Nganga, Randolph Richards, Seven Unknown Doe, Mikhail Shapovalov, Jose Susannah, Kwayee M. Tarty, Charles Thomas, Quacy Thorne, Pharaoh Momolu V.S. Sirleaf, I, Paul White. (hr) [Transferred from California Central on 12/16/2021.] (Entered: 10/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 10/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) TORTURE VICTIM PROTECTION ACT CLASS ACTION LAWSUIT SUB-CLASS CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Pharaoh Momolu V.S. Sirleaf, I, (car) [Transferred from California Central on 12/16/2021.] (Entered: 10/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) TORTURE VICTIM PROTECTION ACT CLASS ACTION LAWSUIT MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY OR PERMANENT INJUCTION ORDERING THE DEFENDANTS TO COMPLY WITH THIS COURT'S FRAIHAT V. ICE ORDER filed by Plaintiff Pharaoh Momolu V.S. Sirleaf, I. (car) [Transferred from California Central on 12/16/2021.] (Entered: 10/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) TORTURE VICTIM PROTECTION ACT CLASS ACTION LAWSUIT MOTION FOR REQUESTING FOR THE APPOINMENT OF COUNSEL TO INSTITUTE ACTION FOR INCOMPETENT PLAINTIFFS filed by Plaintiff Pharaoh Momolu V.S. Sirleaf, I. (car) [Transferred from California Central on 12/16/2021.] (Entered: 10/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) TORTURE VICTIM PROTECTION ACT CLASS ACTION LAWSUIT MOTION FOR An Order allowing for the to filing Amicus Curiae Briefs in this Action filed by Plaintiff Pharaoh Momolu V.S. Sirleaf, I. (car) [Transferred from California Central on 12/16/2021.] (Entered: 10/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) THE FRAIHAT 2 PLAINTIFFS EMERGENCY GRIEVANCES filed by Plaintiff Pharaoh Momolu V.S. Sirleaf, I. (car) [Transferred from California Central on 12/16/2021.] (Entered: 10/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) TORTURE VICTIM PROTECTION ACT CLASS ACTION LAWSUIT FRAIHAT 2 PLAINTIFFS DECLARATION OF INCOMPETENCE TO PROSECUTE THIS ACTION PURSUANT TO THIS COURT'S FRAIHAT V. ICE DECISION filed by Plaintiff Pharaoh Momolu V.S. Sirleaf, I. (car) [Transferred from California Central on 12/16/2021.] (Entered: 10/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) TORTURE VICTIM PROTECTION ACT CLASS ACTION LAWSUIT MOTION FOR SUB-CLASS CERTIFICATION PURSUANT TO THIS COURT'S FRAIHART V. ICE DECISION filed by Plaintiff Pharaoh Momolu V.S. Sirleaf, I. (car) [Transferred from California Central on 12/16/2021.] (Entered: 10/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) TORTURE VICTIM PROTECTION ACT CLASS ACTION LAWSUIT MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER filed by Plaintiff Pharaoh Momolu V.S. Sirleaf, I. (car) Modified on 10/6/2021 (car). [Transferred from California Central on 12/16/2021.] (Entered: 10/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) TORTURE VICTIM PROTECTION ACT CLASS ACTION LAWSUIT MOTION FOR LEAVE FOR PLAINTIFFS TO PROCEED IN FORMA PUAPERIS TO PROSECUTE THIS ACTION (with class in forma pauperis affidavit attached) PURSUANT TO THIS COURT'S FRAIHART V. ICE DECISION filed by Plaintiff Pharaoh Momolu V.S. Sirleaf, I. (car) Modified on 10/6/2021 (car). [Transferred from California Central on 12/16/2021.] (Entered: 10/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT filed against Defendants pursuant to 42 U.S.C. 1983. Case assigned to Judge Cormac J. Carney and referred to Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato, filed by Plaintiff Pharaoh Momolu V.S. Sirleaf, I. (car) [Transferred from California Central on 12/16/2021.] (Entered: 10/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Immigration and Customs Enforcement is a litigant