This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/25/2020 at 09:15:17 (UTC).

SIPCO, LLC v. Vigilent Corporation

Case Summary

On 05/26/2020 SIPCO, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Vigilent Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is William H. Orrick. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-03520

  • Filing Date:

    05/26/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

William H. Orrick

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SIPCO, LLC

Defendant

Vigilent Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Deepali Apurva Brahmbhatt

One Llp, 4000 Macarthur Blvd., East Tower, Suite 500

Newport Beach, CA 92660

Catherine Rajwani

Attorney at Sidley Austin Brown & Wood LLP

717 North Harwood, Suite 3400

Dallas, TX 75201

Herling David Romero

Attorney at Harbor Law Group

300 W Main Street, Building A, Unit 1

Marlborough, MA 01532

Defendant Attorney

Melody Drummond Hansen

Attorney at O'Melveny & Myers LLP

2765 Sand Hill Road

Menlo Park, CA 94025

 

Court Documents

#19

18 #1

Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording

#18

#16

#14

#13

#12

10 #1

Certificate of Good Standing

#10

1 #8

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #7

Exhibit 7

1 #6

Exhibit 6

1 #5

Exhibit 5

1 #4

Exhibit 4

1 #3

Exhibit 3

1 #2

Exhibit 2

1 #1

Exhibit 1

#1

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER - Case Management Conference set for 9/1/2020 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 02, 17th Floor. Case Management Statement due by 8/25/2020. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 7/23/2020. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2020) (Entered: 07/23/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge William H. Orrick for all further proceedings. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen no longer assigned to case. Reassignment Order signed by Clerk on 7/22/2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2020) (Entered: 07/22/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • Docket(#17) CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (jhfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2020) (Entered: 07/22/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by SIPCO, LLC.. (Brahmbhatt, Deepali) (Filed on 7/22/2020) (Entered: 07/22/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • Docket(#15) CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff/Defendant shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 7/27/2020. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jhfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2020) (Entered: 07/20/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) STIPULATION Stipulation to Further Extend Deadline to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint for Patent Infringement filed by Vigilent Corporation. (Hansen, Melody) (Filed on 7/17/2020) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) STIPULATION re #1 Complaint, / Stipulation to Extend Deadline to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint for Patent Infringement filed by Vigilent Corporation. (Hansen, Melody) (Filed on 6/17/2020) (Entered: 06/17/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER granting #10 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Herling D. Romero. Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on 6/3/2020. (svklc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2020) (Entered: 06/03/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER granting #9 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Catherine I. Rajwani. Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on 6/3/2020. (svklc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2020) (Entered: 06/03/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14534059.) filed by SIPCO, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Romero, Herling) (Filed on 6/3/2020) (Entered: 06/03/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14534033.) filed by SIPCO, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Rajwani, Catherine) (Filed on 6/3/2020) (Entered: 06/03/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by SIPCO, LLC. Vigilent Corporation served on 5/28/2020, answer due 6/18/2020. (Brahmbhatt, Deepali) (Filed on 5/29/2020) (Entered: 05/29/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Summons Issued as to Vigilent Corporation. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2020) (Entered: 05/27/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 8/18/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/25/2020 09:30 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 6, 4th Floor. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2020) (Entered: 05/27/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • Docket(#5) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 6/10/2020. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2020) (Entered: 05/27/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding patents (cc: form mailed to register). (Brahmbhatt, Deepali) (Filed on 5/26/2020) (Entered: 05/26/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Certificate of Interested Entities by SIPCO, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Glocom, Inc. for SIPCO, LLC. (Brahmbhatt, Deepali) (Filed on 5/26/2020) (Entered: 05/26/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Proposed Summons. (Brahmbhatt, Deepali) (Filed on 5/26/2020) (Entered: 05/26/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Vigilent Corporation ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-14504563.). Filed bySIPCO, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Civil Cover Sheet)(Brahmbhatt, Deepali) (Filed on 5/26/2020) (Entered: 05/26/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SIPCO, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Catherine I. Rajwani

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Deepali Apurva Brahmbhatt