This case was last updated from PACER on 01/25/2020 at 07:33:06 (UTC).

Sinoma Science & Technology Co., Ltd. v. Atlanta Fiberglass USA, LLC

Case Summary

On 11/26/2019 Sinoma Science Technology Co , Ltd filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Atlanta Fiberglass USA, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Steve C. Jones. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-05369

  • Filing Date:

    11/26/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Georgia Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Steve C. Jones

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant

Sinoma Science & Technology Co., Ltd.

Defendant and Counter Claimant

Atlanta Fiberglass USA, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorney

Samuel S. Woodhouse, III

Attorney at The Woodhouse Law Firm, LLC

Suite 1402, 260 Peachtree Street, N. W.

Atlanta, GA 30303

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorney

David Mark Messer

Attorney at Briskin, Cross & Sanford, LLC

Suite D, 1001 Cambridge Square

Alpharetta, GA 30009

 

Court Documents

#2

(#2) Electronic Summons Issued as to Atlanta Fiberglass USA, LLC. (jap) (Entered: 11/26/2019)

3 #1

Exhibit A

#5

(#5) ANSWER to #3 Counterclaim by Sinoma Science & Technology Co., Ltd..(Woodhouse, Samuel) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 01/24/2020)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#4

(#4) Certificate of Interested Persons by Atlanta Fiberglass USA, LLC. (Messer, David) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

#3

(#3) ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand ( Discovery ends on 6/1/2020.), COUNTERCLAIM against Sinoma Science & Technology Co., Ltd. with Jury Demand by Atlanta Fiberglass USA, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Messer, David) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 01/03/2020)

3 #2

Exhibit B

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Sinoma Science & Technology Co., Ltd. (Filing fee $400, receipt number AGANDC-9128324). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jap) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 11/26/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ANSWER to #3 Counterclaim by Sinoma Science & Technology Co., Ltd..(Woodhouse, Samuel) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 01/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Certificate of Interested Persons by Atlanta Fiberglass USA, LLC. (Messer, David) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand ( Discovery ends on 6/1/2020.), COUNTERCLAIM against Sinoma Science & Technology Co., Ltd. with Jury Demand by Atlanta Fiberglass USA, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Messer, David) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 01/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Electronic Summons Issued as to Atlanta Fiberglass USA, LLC. (jap) (Entered: 11/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT filed by Sinoma Science & Technology Co., Ltd. (Filing fee $400, receipt number AGANDC-9128324). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jap) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 11/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.