This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/24/2022 at 08:14:54 (UTC).

Sink v. Air & Liquid Systems Corporation et al

Case Summary

On 04/25/2022 Sink filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against Air Liquid Systems Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, South Carolina District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Bruce Howe Hendricks. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-01316

  • Filing Date:

    04/25/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Bruce Howe Hendricks

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Alexander Sink

Defendants

BW/IP, INC.

Air & Liquid Systems Corporation

Anchor Darling Valve Company

Aurora Pump Company

Blackmer Pump Company

Byron Jackson Pump Company

Carver Pump Company

Crane Co.

Flowserve US, Inc.

General Electric Company

IMO Industries, Inc.

John Crane Inc.

Velan Valve Corp.

ViacomCBS Inc.

Viking Pump, Inc.

Warren Pumps, LLC

Weir Valves & Controls USA, Inc. doing business as Atwood & Morrill Co. Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Tyler B Wilke

Attorney at Flint Law Firm LLC

222 E Park Street, Suite 500

Edwardsville, IL 62025

William Christopher Swett

Attorney at Motley Rice LLC

28 Bridgeside Boulevard

Mt Pleasant, SC 29464

Defendant Attorneys

Mary Elizabeth O'Neill

Attorney at Womble Bond Dickinson (US) LLP (Char)

One Wells Fargo Center, 301 South College Street

Charlottte, NC 28202

Deirdre Shelton McCool

Attorney at Nelson Mullins Riley and Scarborough

Po Box 1806

Charleston, SC 29402

G Mark Phillips

Attorney at Nelson Mullins Riley and Scarborough (Ch)

151 Meeting Street, Sixth Floor

Charleston, SC 29401

James B Glenn

Attorney at Nelson Mullins Riley and Scarborough LLP (Cola)

Meridian Building, 17Th Floor

Columbia, SC 29201

Robert O Meriwether

Attorney at Nelson Mullins Riley and Scarborough

Po Box 11070

Columbia, SC 29211

Nicolas John Cherry

Attorney at Fox Rothschild LLP

2 West Washington Street, Suite 1100

Greenville, SC 29601

Stephanie G Flynn

Attorney at Fox Rothschild LLP

2 West Washington Street, Suite 1100

Greenville, SC 29601

Tara Cloer Sullivan

Attorney at K&L Gates LLP (Chas)

134 Meeting Street, Suite 500

Charleston, SC 29401

John M Montgomery

Attorney at Robinson Gray Stepp and Laffitte LLC

1310 Gadsden Street

Columbia, SC 29201

William Ansel Collins, Jr

Attorney at Dougall and Collins

1700 Woodcreek Farms Road, Suite 100

Elgin, SC 29045

Cameron Dane Berthelsen

Attorney at Richardson Plowden & Robinson

235 Magrath Darby Blvd., Ste. 100

Mt. Pleasant, SC 29464

James H Elliott, Jr

Attorney at Richardson Plowden & Robinson

235 Magrath Darby Blvd., Ste. 100

Mt. Pleasant, SC 29464

A Victor Rawl, Jr

Attorney at Gordon and Rees LLP

40 Calhoun Street, Suite 350

Charleston, SC 29401

William Henry Kleindienst

Attorney at Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani LLP

40 Calhoun Street, Suite 350

Charleston, SC 29401

Jennifer M Techman

Attorney at Evert Weathersby Houff

3455 Peachtree Road Ne, Suite 1550

Atlanta, GA 30326

 

Court Documents

48 #1

Application

48 #48

Main Document

#47

(#47) NOTICE of Appearance by Stephanie G Flynn on behalf of Carver Pump Company, Viking Pump, Inc., Warren Pumps, LLC (Flynn, Stephanie) (Entered: 06/15/2022)

#46

(#46) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by ViacomCBS Inc..(Techman, Jennifer) (Entered: 06/03/2022)

#45

(#45) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Flowserve US, Inc..(Montgomery, John) (Entered: 06/02/2022)

#44

(#44) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Flowserve US, Inc..(Montgomery, John) (Entered: 06/02/2022)

#43

(#43) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Warren Pumps, LLC.(Cherry, Nicolas) (Entered: 06/01/2022)

#42

(#42) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Viking Pump, Inc..(Cherry, Nicolas) (Entered: 06/01/2022)

#41

(#41) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Carver Pump Company.(Cherry, Nicolas) (Entered: 06/01/2022)

#11

(#11) NOTICE of Appearance by Deirdre Shelton McCool on behalf of Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, Anchor Darling Valve Company, Blackmer Pump Company, Weir Valves & Controls USA, Inc. (McCool, Deirdre) (Entered: 05/17/2022)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by James B Glenn on behalf of Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, Anchor Darling Valve Company, Blackmer Pump Company, Weir Valves & Controls USA, Inc. (Glenn, James) (Entered: 05/17/2022)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by G Mark Phillips on behalf of Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, Anchor Darling Valve Company, Blackmer Pump Company, Weir Valves & Controls USA, Inc. (Phillips, G) (Entered: 05/17/2022)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Robert O Meriwether on behalf of Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, Anchor Darling Valve Company, Blackmer Pump Company, Weir Valves & Controls USA, Inc. (Meriwether, Robert) (Entered: 05/17/2022)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Cameron Dane Berthelsen on behalf of John Crane Inc. (Berthelsen, Cameron) (Entered: 05/09/2022)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by James H Elliott, Jr on behalf of John Crane Inc. (Elliott, James) (Entered: 05/09/2022)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (adic, ) (Entered: 04/26/2022)

#2

(#2) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Alexander Sink. (adic, ) (Entered: 04/26/2022)

#1

(#44) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Flowserve US, Inc..(Montgomery, John) (Entered: 06/02/2022)

36 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#49) TEXT ORDER granting #48 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Tyler B. Wilke, who represents the Plaintiff, is granted admission Pro Hac Vice admission in this case. Entered at the Direction of The Honorable Bruce Howe Hendricks on 6/15/2022.(vdru, ) (Entered: 06/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#48) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Tyler B. Wilke ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number ASCDC-10542798) by Alexander Sink. Response to Motion due by 6/29/2022. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Application)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Swett, William) (Entered: 06/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#47) NOTICE of Appearance by Stephanie G Flynn on behalf of Carver Pump Company, Viking Pump, Inc., Warren Pumps, LLC (Flynn, Stephanie) (Entered: 06/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#46) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by ViacomCBS Inc..(Techman, Jennifer) (Entered: 06/03/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#45) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Flowserve US, Inc..(Montgomery, John) (Entered: 06/02/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#44) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Flowserve US, Inc..(Montgomery, John) (Entered: 06/02/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#43) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Warren Pumps, LLC.(Cherry, Nicolas) (Entered: 06/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#42) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Viking Pump, Inc..(Cherry, Nicolas) (Entered: 06/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#41) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Carver Pump Company.(Cherry, Nicolas) (Entered: 06/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#40) MEDIATION ORDER: Mediation Due by 11/28/2022, Signed by Honorable Bruce Howe Hendricks on 6/1/2022. (adic, ) (Entered: 06/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
27 More Docket Entries
  • 05/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Crane Co..(Sullivan, Tara) (Entered: 05/24/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Appearance by Deirdre Shelton McCool on behalf of Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, Anchor Darling Valve Company, Blackmer Pump Company, Weir Valves & Controls USA, Inc. (McCool, Deirdre) (Entered: 05/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by James B Glenn on behalf of Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, Anchor Darling Valve Company, Blackmer Pump Company, Weir Valves & Controls USA, Inc. (Glenn, James) (Entered: 05/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by G Mark Phillips on behalf of Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, Anchor Darling Valve Company, Blackmer Pump Company, Weir Valves & Controls USA, Inc. (Phillips, G) (Entered: 05/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Robert O Meriwether on behalf of Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, Anchor Darling Valve Company, Blackmer Pump Company, Weir Valves & Controls USA, Inc. (Meriwether, Robert) (Entered: 05/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Cameron Dane Berthelsen on behalf of John Crane Inc. (Berthelsen, Cameron) (Entered: 05/09/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by James H Elliott, Jr on behalf of John Crane Inc. (Elliott, James) (Entered: 05/09/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (adic, ) (Entered: 04/26/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Alexander Sink. (adic, ) (Entered: 04/26/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ASCDC-10458781.), filed by Alexander Sink. Service due by 7/25/2022. (adic, ) (Entered: 04/26/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BYRON JACKSON PUMP CO. is a litigant

Latest cases where ANCHOR DARLING VALVE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where Carver Pump Company is a litigant

Latest cases where VELAN VALVE CORP. is a litigant