This case was last updated from PACER on 07/16/2019 at 09:50:55 (UTC).

SINISCAL v. JOHNSON & JOHNSON et al

Case Summary

On 05/17/2019 SINISCAL filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against JOHNSON JOHNSON. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District. The Judges overseeing this case are Lois H. Goodman and Freda L. Wolfson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-12669

  • Filing Date:

    05/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New Jersey District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Lois H. Goodman

Presiding Judge

Freda L. Wolfson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MADELENE SINISCAL

Defendants

JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC.

JOHNSON & JOHNSON

PERSONAL CARE PRODUCTS COUNCIL ("PCPC")

In Re

JOHNSON & JOHNSON TALCUM POWDER PRODUCTS MARKETING, SALES PRACTICES AND PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JOHN J. DRISCOLL

Attorney at COUNSEL NOT ADMITTED TO USDC-NJ BAR

211 N. Broadway, 40Th Floor

St. Louis, MO 63102

Defendant Attorneys

SUSAN M. SHARKO

Attorney at DRINKER, BIDDLE & REATH, LLP

600 Campus Drive

Florham Park, NJ 07932-1047

SCOTT A. JAMES

Attorney at COUNSEL NOT ADMITTED TO USDC-NJ BAR

600 Travis Street, Suite 3400

Houston, TX 77002-2926

KATHLEEN A. FRAZIER

Attorney at COUNSEL NOT ADMITTED TO USDC-NJ BAR

600 Travis Ste 3400

Houston, TX 77002

JULIE LYNN TERSIGNI

Attorney at DRINKER BIDDLE & REATH LLP

600 Campus Drive

Florham Park, NJ 07932

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by KATHLEEN A. FRAZIER on behalf of JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC. (FRAZIER, KATHLEEN) (Entered: 06/05/2019)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by SUSAN M. SHARKO on behalf of JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC. (SHARKO, SUSAN) (Entered: 06/13/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC., PERSONAL CARE PRODUCTS COUNCIL ("PCPC") ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9675481) with JURY DEMAND, filed by MADELENE SINISCAL. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(DRISCOLL, JOHN) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

#2

(#2) SUMMONS ISSUED as to JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC., PERSONAL CARE PRODUCTS COUNCIL ("PCPC"). Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (jmh) (Entered: 05/20/2019)

#7

(#7) STIPULATION of Dismissal as to Defendant Personal Care Products Council by JOHNSON & JOHNSON TALCUM POWDER PRODUCTS MARKETING, SALES PRACTICES AND PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION. (DRISCOLL, JOHN) (Entered: 06/27/2019)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by SCOTT A. JAMES on behalf of JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC. (JAMES, SCOTT) (Entered: 06/05/2019)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by JULIE LYNN TERSIGNI on behalf of JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC. (TERSIGNI, JULIE) (Entered: 06/13/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) STIPULATION of Dismissal as to Defendant Personal Care Products Council by JOHNSON & JOHNSON TALCUM POWDER PRODUCTS MARKETING, SALES PRACTICES AND PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION. (DRISCOLL, JOHN) (Entered: 06/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Appearance by JULIE LYNN TERSIGNI on behalf of JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC. (TERSIGNI, JULIE) (Entered: 06/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Appearance by SUSAN M. SHARKO on behalf of JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC. (SHARKO, SUSAN) (Entered: 06/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Appearance by SCOTT A. JAMES on behalf of JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC. (JAMES, SCOTT) (Entered: 06/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Appearance by KATHLEEN A. FRAZIER on behalf of JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC. (FRAZIER, KATHLEEN) (Entered: 06/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • Member Case Direct File on 05/20/2019, for MDL 2738 Party JOHNSON & JOHNSON TALCUM POWDER PRODUCTS MARKETING, SALES PRACTICES AND PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION added. (jmh) (Entered: 05/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) SUMMONS ISSUED as to JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC., PERSONAL CARE PRODUCTS COUNCIL ("PCPC"). Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (jmh) (Entered: 05/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC., PERSONAL CARE PRODUCTS COUNCIL ("PCPC") ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9675481) with JURY DEMAND, filed by MADELENE SINISCAL. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(DRISCOLL, JOHN) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.