This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/10/2020 at 08:25:48 (UTC).

Singleton v. Profrac Services, LLC

Case Summary

On 02/10/2020 Singleton filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against Profrac Services, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Ronald C. Griffin and David Counts. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    7:20-CV-00037

  • Filing Date:

    02/10/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Western District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Ronald C. Griffin

Presiding Judge

David Counts

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Garrekk Singleton

Defendant

Profrac Services, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Beatriz A. Sosa-Morris

Attorney at Sosa-Morris Neuman PLLC

5612 Chaucer Drive

Houston, TX 77005

Defendant Attorney

Russell D. Cawyer

Attorney at Kelly Hart & Hallman LLP

201 Main Street, Suite 2500

Fort Worth, TX 76102

 

Court Documents

7 #2

Proposed Order Defendant's Proposed Scheduling Order

7 #1

Proposed Order Plaintiff's Proposed Scheduling Order

#7

(#7) Rule 26(f) Discovery Report/Case Management Plan by Garrekk Singleton. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Plaintiff's Proposed Scheduling Order, #2 Proposed Order Defendant's Proposed Scheduling Order)(Sosa-Morris, Beatriz) (Entered: 04/03/2020)

#6

(#6) Order for Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order. Scheduling recommendations/proposed scheduling order due to the Court within thirty (30) days from the date of this order. Signed by Judge David Counts. (see) (Entered: 03/04/2020)

#5

(#5) ANSWER to #1 Complaint and Affirmative Defenses. Attorney Russell D. Cawyer added to party Profrac Services, LLC(pty:dft) by Profrac Services, LLC.(Cawyer, Russell) (Entered: 03/03/2020)

#4

(#4) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Ronald C. Griffin. Signed by Judge David Counts. (slt) (Entered: 02/11/2020)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to Profrac Services, LLC. (slt) (Entered: 02/11/2020)

#2

(#2) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Garrekk Singleton. (Sosa-Morris, Beatriz) (Entered: 02/11/2020)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit Consent Form

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-13190573). No Summons requested at this time, filed by Garrekk Singleton. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent Form, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Sosa-Morris, Beatriz) (Entered: 02/10/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Rule 26(f) Discovery Report/Case Management Plan by Garrekk Singleton. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Plaintiff's Proposed Scheduling Order, #2 Proposed Order Defendant's Proposed Scheduling Order)(Sosa-Morris, Beatriz) (Entered: 04/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Order for Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order. Scheduling recommendations/proposed scheduling order due to the Court within thirty (30) days from the date of this order. Signed by Judge David Counts. (see) (Entered: 03/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ANSWER to #1 Complaint and Affirmative Defenses. Attorney Russell D. Cawyer added to party Profrac Services, LLC(pty:dft) by Profrac Services, LLC.(Cawyer, Russell) (Entered: 03/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Ronald C. Griffin. Signed by Judge David Counts. (slt) (Entered: 02/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Profrac Services, LLC. (slt) (Entered: 02/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Garrekk Singleton. (Sosa-Morris, Beatriz) (Entered: 02/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge David Counts. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (slt) (Entered: 02/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-13190573). No Summons requested at this time, filed by Garrekk Singleton. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent Form, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Sosa-Morris, Beatriz) (Entered: 02/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Profrac Services, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Beatriz Sosa-Morris