This case was last updated from PACER on 08/09/2021 at 08:52:38 (UTC).

Singleton v. Harris et al

Case Summary

On 06/10/2021 Singleton filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Harris. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arkansas Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Timothy L. Brooks. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:21-CV-05106

  • Filing Date:

    06/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Timothy L. Brooks

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Don Singleton

Defendants

J & S Exchange, Inc.

Otto Harris, Jr.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Robert L. Beard

Attorney at Rainwater, Holt & Sexton

6315 Ranch Drive, P.O. Box 17250

Little Rock, AR 72222

Gerald Adam Savoie

Attorney at Dudley DeBosier Injury Lawyers APLC

4300 Youree Drive, Suite 250

Shreveport, LA 71101

Defendant Attorneys

Joseph Barrett Deacon, Jr.

Attorney at Mayer LLP

2434 E. Joyce Blvd., Suite 6

Fayetteville, AR 72703

John Walker Williams

Attorney at Mayer LLP

2434 E. Joyce Blvd., Ste. 6

Fayetteville, AR 72703

 

Court Documents

#16

14 #2

Exhibit B

14 #1

Exhibit A

14 #14

Main Document

#13

#12

#11

#10

#9

#8

#7

#6

RESTRICTED

#5

#4

RESTRICTED

#3

RESTRICTED

#2

#1

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) NOTICE of Appearance by Gerald Adam Savoie on behalf of Don Singleton. (Savoie, Gerald) (Entered: 07/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) TEXT ONLY ORDER GRANTING #14 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. GERALD ADAM SAVOIE is directed to immediately register for Pro Hac Vice filer access through PACER and enter his appearance in this matter. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on July 29, 2021. (slc) (Entered: 07/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) MOTION for Attorney Gerald Adam Savoie to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV Application fee paid $ 100; receipt number AARWDC-2433859) by Don Singleton. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Beard, Robert) (Entered: 07/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Don Singleton. Otto Harris, Jr served on 6/18/2021, answer due 7/9/2021. (Beard, Robert) (Entered: 07/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) AFFIDAVIT of Service, filed by Don Singleton. J & S Exchange, Inc. served on 6/24/2021, answer due 7/15/2021. (Beard, Robert) (Entered: 07/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) AMENDED ANSWER to by Otto Harris, Jr, J & S Exchange, Inc.. (Deacon, Joseph) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by John Walker Williams on behalf of Otto Harris, Jr, J & S Exchange, Inc.. (Williams, John) (Entered: 07/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Hearing set for 9/15/2021 09:00 AM in Fayetteville -- 5th flr (Rm 509) before Honorable Timothy L. Brooks. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 8/13/2021. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on July 8, 2021. (slc) (Entered: 07/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ANSWER to #2 Complaint with Jury Demand by Otto Harris, Jr, J & S Exchange, Inc..(Deacon, Joseph) (Entered: 07/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Barrett Deacon, Jr on behalf of Otto Harris, Jr, J & S Exchange, Inc.. (Deacon, Joseph) (Entered: 06/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to Otto Harris, Jr, J & S Exchange, Inc. and returned to attorney or plaintiff for service. YOU MUST PRINT THIS ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH IS THE MAIN DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (lgd) (Entered: 06/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Magistrate Notice/Consent Form furnished. (lgd) (Entered: 06/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to J&S Exchange, Inc. for service of the following document: #2 Complaint. (Beard, Robert) (Entered: 06/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to Otto Harris, Jr. for service of the following document: #2 Complaint. (Beard, Robert) (Entered: 06/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Otto Harris, Jr, J & S Exchange, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AARWDC-2410021), filed by Don Singleton.(Beard, Robert) (Entered: 06/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by Don Singleton. Please proceed with filing your case initiating document(s).If the case initiating documents are not filed by Close of Business the next business day your case may be terminated. (lgd) (Entered: 06/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Robert L. Beard, Jr.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Gerald Adam Savoie